Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2895480

EP2895480 - AMIDE DERIVATIVE AND USE OF THE SAME AS STABILITY INDEX OF A LULICONAZOLE PHARMACEUTICAL FORMULATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  18.07.2016
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.05.2019Deletion: Date of cancellation oral proceedings 
18.05.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Pola Pharma Inc.
8-9-5, Nishi-gotanda Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo 141-0031 / JP
For all designated states
Nihon Nohyaku Co., Ltd.
19-8, Kyobashi 1-chome
Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-8386 / JP
[2015/30]
Inventor(s)01 / MASUDA, Takaaki
c/o POLA PHARMA INC.
560 Kashio-cho
Totsuka-ku
Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 244-0812 / JP
02 / YAMAGUCHI, Hiroshi
c/o NIHON NOHYAKU CO. LTD.
19-8 Kyobashi 1-chome
Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-8386 / JP
 [2015/30]
Representative(s)Jones, Nicholas Andrew
Withers & Rogers LLP
4 More London Riverside
London, SE1 2AU / GB
[2015/30]
Application number, filing date13709572.519.02.2013
WO2013JP55025
Priority number, dateJP2012020269614.09.2012         Original published format: JP 2012202696
[2015/30]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014041825
Date:20.03.2014
Language:EN
[2014/12]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2895480
Date:22.07.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.03.2014
[2015/30]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP20.03.2014
ClassificationInternational:C07D409/06, A61K31/4178, A61P31/10
[2015/30]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/30]
TitleGerman:AMIDDERIVAT UND VERWENDUNG DAVON ALS STABILITÄTSINDEX EINER PHARMAZEUTISCHEN LULICONAZOLFORMULIERUNG[2015/30]
English:AMIDE DERIVATIVE AND USE OF THE SAME AS STABILITY INDEX OF A LULICONAZOLE PHARMACEUTICAL FORMULATION[2015/30]
French:DÉRIVÉ D'AMIDE ET UTILISATION DE CELUI-CI EN TANT QU'INDEX DE STABILITÉ D'UNE FORMULATION PHARMACEUTIQUE DE LULICONAZOLE[2015/30]
Entry into regional phase13.04.2015National basic fee paid 
13.04.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
13.04.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.04.2015Examination requested  [2015/30]
09.12.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
22.02.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.07.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.04.2017Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 28.04.2017
28.04.2017Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
30.05.2017Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
Appeal following examination28.07.2017Appeal received No.  T2486/17
09.10.2017Statement of grounds filed
11.02.2020Date of oral proceedings
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  22.02.2016
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.04.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
10.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
08.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
13.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
11.02.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Cited inInternational search[XI]WO2011155640  (POLA PHARMA INC [JP], et al) [X] 5-13 * claim -; table 1 * [I] 1-4;
 [XI]WO2010093992  (TOPICA PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al) [X] 5-13 * examples 5-7; claim -; tables 23-25 * [I] 1-4;
 [XDI]EP2005958  (NIHON NOHYAKU CO LTD [JP], et al) [XD] 5-13 * example -; claim - * [I] 1-4;
 [A]  - F.F. FLEMING ET AL., "Nitrile-Containing Pharmaceuticals: Efficacious Roles of teh Nitrile Pharmacophore", J. MED. CHEM., (20100830), vol. 53, doi:10.1021/jm100762r, pages 7902 - 7917, XP002695035 [A] 1-13 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm100762r
by applicantWO2007102241
 WO2007102242
 WO2007102243
 WO2009031642
 WO2009031643
 WO2009031644