Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2815504

EP2815504 - 3D RF L-C FILTERS USING THROUGH GLASS VIAS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  30.03.2018
Database last updated on 13.11.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  14.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip30.03.2018Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 02.05.2018  [2018/18]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Qualcomm Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121 / US
[2014/52]
Inventor(s)01 / YUN, Changhan
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121 / US
02 / ZUO, Chengjie
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121 / US
03 / LO, Chi Shun
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121 / US
04 / KIM, Jonghae
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121 / US
05 / VELEZ, Mario F.
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121 / US
 [2014/52]
Representative(s)Dunlop, Hugh Christopher , et al
Maucher Jenkins
26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/52]Dunlop, Hugh Christopher , et al
RGC Jenkins & Co.
26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
Application number, filing date13709600.411.02.2013
WO2013US25620
Priority number, dateUS201261597953P13.02.2012         Original published format: US 201261597953 P
US20121341987614.03.2012         Original published format: US201213419876
[2014/52]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013122887
Date:22.08.2013
Language:EN
[2013/34]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2815504
Date:24.12.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.08.2013
[2014/52]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP22.08.2013
ClassificationInternational:H03H7/01, H03H7/09
[2014/52]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/52]
TitleGerman:3DRF-L-C-FILTER UNTER VERWENDUNG VON GLASDURCHKONTAKTIERUNGEN[2014/52]
English:3D RF L-C FILTERS USING THROUGH GLASS VIAS[2014/52]
French:FILTRES L-C RF 3D UTILISANT DES TROUS D'INTERCONNEXION À TRAVERS LE VERRE[2014/52]
Entry into regional phase01.08.2014National basic fee paid 
01.08.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
01.08.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.12.2013Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
01.08.2014Examination requested  [2014/52]
07.04.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
14.07.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.11.2017Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2018/18]
21.12.2017Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2018/18]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  14.07.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
08.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
07.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[XI]JPH0430615  (IKEDA TAKESHI) [X] 1,6,12,13,18 * abstract * * online translation * [I] 11;
 [XYI]US5461353  (EBERHARDT JOHN E [US]) [X] 1,2,6,7,12-14,18 * abstract * * figures 1-6 * * column 1, line 1 - column 4, line 11 * [Y] 3-5,8-10,15-17 [I] 11;
 [Y]WO2006088146  (TOKYO ELECTRON LTD [JP]; YAKABE MASAMI [JP]) [Y] 1,3-6,8-10,13,15-18 * abstract * * figures 1-3 *;
 [Y]US2011291786  (LI XIA [US] ET AL) [Y] 1,6,13,18-26 * abstract * * paragraph [0066] * * figure 10 *;
 [Y]JP2005347781  (AJINOMOTO KK) [Y] 5,10,17 * abstract * * figures 3-7 *;
 [X]US6493861  (LI YUAN-LIANG [US] ET AL) [X] 1,3,5,6,10,17,18 * abstract * * figures 3,18,27-28,29-30, *;
 [Y]JP2006311203  (TDK CORP) [Y] 1,6,13,18 * abstract *;
 [Y]WO2009128047  (NXP BV [NL]; TESSON OLIVIER [FR]) [Y] 1,3,6,13,18 * abstract * * figures 1-5,10-11 *
 [Y]  - SEUNGHYUN HWANG ET AL, "Thin-Film High-Rejection Filter Integration in Low-Loss Organic Substrate", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON COMPONENTS, PACKAGING AND MANUFACTURING TECHNOLOGY, IEEE, USA, (20110801), vol. 1, no. 8, doi:10.1109/TCPMT.2011.2142398, ISSN 2156-3950, pages 1160 - 1170, XP011389459 [Y] 19-26 * abstract * * figures 1,2,7,8,10 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TCPMT.2011.2142398