Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2814503

EP2814503 - MODULATION OF FACTOR Xa INHIBITOR MEDIATED BLOOD LOSS BY PARTIAL AND TRANSIENT ADMINISTRATION OF ANTIDOTE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  19.01.2018
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  04.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip19.01.2018Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 21.02.2018  [2018/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Portola Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
270 East Grand Avenue Suite 22
South San Francisco, California 94080 / US
[2014/52]
Inventor(s)01 / HOLLENBACH, Stanley J.
450 Alta Vista Drive
South San Francisco, California 94080 / US
02 / LU, Genmin
1439 El Camino Real
Apt 9
Burlingame, California 94010 / US
03 / SINHA, Uma
808 Junipero Serra Boulevard
San Francisco, California 94127 / US
 [2014/52]
Representative(s)J A Kemp LLP
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/52]Srinivasan, Ravi Chandran
J A Kemp
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
Application number, filing date13709603.814.02.2013
WO2013US26212
Priority number, dateUS201261599821P16.02.2012         Original published format: US 201261599821 P
US201261682615P13.08.2012         Original published format: US 201261682615 P
US201261734269P06.12.2012         Original published format: US 201261734269 P
US201361756842P25.01.2013         Original published format: US 201361756842 P
US201361759571P01.02.2013         Original published format: US 201361759571 P
[2014/52]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013123248
Date:22.08.2013
Language:EN
[2013/34]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2814503
Date:24.12.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.08.2013
[2014/52]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP22.08.2013
ClassificationInternational:A61K38/48, C07K14/00, A61P7/04
[2014/52]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/52]
TitleGerman:MODULATION DES FAKTOR-XA-INHIBITOR-VERMITTELTEN BLUTVERLUSTES DURCH PARTIELLE UND TRANSIENTE VERABREICHUNG EINES GEGENMITTELS[2014/52]
English:MODULATION OF FACTOR Xa INHIBITOR MEDIATED BLOOD LOSS BY PARTIAL AND TRANSIENT ADMINISTRATION OF ANTIDOTE[2014/52]
French:MODULATION DE PERTE DE SANG INDUITE PAR INHIBITEUR DU FACTEUR XA AU MOYEN D'UNE ADMINISTRATION PARTIELLE ET TRANSITOIRE D'ANTIDOTE[2014/52]
Entry into regional phase15.09.2014National basic fee paid 
15.09.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
15.09.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.09.2014Examination requested  [2014/52]
17.04.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
15.06.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.10.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.01.2018Application withdrawn by applicant  [2018/08]
25.06.2018Date of oral proceedings
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  15.06.2016
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
22.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
17.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[XD]WO2011008885  (PORTOLA PHARM INC [US]; SINHA UMA [US]; LU GENMIN [US]; HUTCHALEELAHA) [XD] 1-40 * paragraphs [0010] , [0 11] , [0 94] , [0163] , [ 180] , [ 389] , [ 390]; figures 38, 40; examples 8-24, 28; claims 1-31; tables 9-12, 25; sequence 13 *;
 [AD]WO2010056765  (PORTOLA PHARM INC [US]; LU GENMIN [US]; SINHA UMA [US]) [AD] 1-40 * claim 1 *;
 [AP]  - HUTCHALEELAHA A ET AL, "Recombinant factor Xa inhibitor antidote (PRT064445) mediates reversal of anticoagulation through reduction of free drug concentration: a common mechanism for direct factor Xa inhibitors", EUROPEAN HEART JOURNAL, OXFORD UNIVERSITY PRESS, GB, FR, (20120829), vol. 33, no. Suppl.1, ISSN 0195-668X, page 496, XP009164811 [AP] 1-40 * abstract *
 [XP]  - HOLLENBACH STANLEY J ET AL, "PRT064445 but Not Recombinant Fviia Reverses Rivaroxaban Induced Anticoagulation As Measured by Reduction in Blood Loss in a Rabbit Liver Laceration Model", BLOOD, & 54TH ANNUAL MEETING AND EXPOSITION OF THE AMERICAN-SOCIETY-OF-HEMATOLOGY (ASH); ATLANTA, GA, USA; DECEMBER 08 -11, 2012, (201211), vol. 120, no. 21, page 3414, XP002698834 [XP] 1-40 * abstract *
by applicantUS2009098119
 US8153590
 US4683195
 WO2009042962
 WO2010056765
 WO2011008885
 US5440013
    - BIJSTERVELD, NR ET AL., CIRCULATION, (2002), vol. 106, pages 2550 - 2554
    - BIJSTERVELD, NR ET AL., BRITISH J. OF HAEMATOLOGY, vol. 2004, no. 124, pages 653 - 658
    - AUSUBEL ET AL.,, Current Protocols in Molecular Biology, (1987), vol. 30
    - HERBERT, J.M. ET AL., JPHARMACOL EXP THER., (1996), vol. 276, no. 3, pages 1030 - 8
    - TANIUCHI, Y. ET AL., THROMB HAEMOST., (1998), vol. 79, no. 3, pages 543 - 8
    - ERIKSSON, B.I., BLOOD, (2005), vol. 106, no. 11, page 1865
    - TURPIE, A.G., J. THROMB. HAEMOST., (2005), vol. 3, no. 11, pages 2479 - 86
    - HYLEK EM, CURR OPIN INVEST DRUGS, (2007), vol. 8, no. 9, pages 778 - 783
    - AGNELLI, G. ET AL., J. THROMB. HAEMOST., (2007), vol. 5, no. 4, pages 746 - 53
    - BERSHAD, SUAREZ NEUROCRIT CARE, (2010), vol. 12, pages 403 - 413
    - HRUBY, LIFE SCIENCES, (1982), vol. 31, pages 189 - 199
    - HRUBY ET AL., BIOCHEM J., (1990), vol. 268, pages 249 - 262
    - KAZRNIERSKI ET AL., J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1991), vol. 113, pages 2275 - 2283
    - KAZMIERSKI; HRUBY, TETRAHEDRON LETT., (1991), vol. 32, no. 41, pages 5769 - 5772
    - MIYAKE ET AL., J. TAKEDA RES. LABS., (1989), vol. 43, pages 53 - 76
    - ZECHEL ET AL., INT. J. PEP. PROTEIN RES., (1991), vol. 38, no. 2, pages 131 - 138
    - DHARANIPRAGADA ET AL., INT. J. PEP. PROTEIN RES., (1993), vol. 42, no. 1, pages 68 - 77
    - DHARANIPRAGADA ET AL., ACTA. CRYSTALLOGR. C., (1992), vol. 48, pages 1239 - 1241
    - KEMP ET AL., J. ORG. CHEM., (1985), vol. 50, pages 5834 - 5838
    - KEMP ET AL., TETRAHEDRON LCTT., (1988), vol. 29, pages 5081 - 5082
    - KCMP ET AL., TETRAHEDRON LETT., (1988), vol. 29, pages 5057 - 5060
    - KEMP ET AL., TETRAHEDRON LETT., (1988), vol. 29
    - KEMP ET AL., J. ORG. CHEM., (1989), vol. 54, pages 109 - 115
    - NAGAI; SATO, TETRAHEDRON LETT., vol. 26, pages 647 - 650
    - DIMAIO ET AL., J. CHEM. SOC. PCRKIN TRANS., (1989), page 1687
    - KAHN ET AL., TETRAHEDRON LETT., (1989), vol. 30, page 2317
    - CLONES ET AL., TETRAHEDRON LETT., (1988), vol. 29, pages 3853 - 3856
    - ZABROCKI ET AL., J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1988), vol. 110, pages 5875 - 5880
    - SAMANEN ET AL., INT. J. PROTEIN PEP. RES., (1990), vol. 35, pages 501 - 509
    - OLSON ET AL., J. AM. CHEM. SCI., (1990), vol. 112, pages 323 - 333
    - GARVEY ET AL., J. ORG. CHEM., (1990), vol. 56, page 436
    - DAHOFF ET AL., Atlas of Protein Sequence and Structure. 2 (ed., (1978), vol. 5, pages 345 - 352
    - JONES ET AL., COMPUT. APPL. BIOSCI., (1992), vol. 8, pages 275 - 282
    - GONNET ET AL., SCIENCE, (1992), vol. 256, pages 1443 - 1145
    - ADACH; HASEGAWA, J. MOL. EVOL., (1996), vol. 42, pages 459 - 468
    - HENIKOFF; HENIKOFF, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1992), vol. 89, pages 10915 - 10919
    - MULLER ET AL., MOL. BIOL. EVOL., (2002), vol. 19, pages 8 - 13