Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2828825

EP2828825 - METHOD FOR DETERMINING THE GROUND PLANE BASED ON A DEPTH IMAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2015/05]METHOD OF DETERMINING A GROUND PLANE ON THE BASIS OF A DEPTH IMAGE
[2015/45]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.03.2017
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip23.08.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BG
published on 25.09.2019  [2019/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Commissariat à l'Énergie Atomique et aux Énergies Alternatives
25, Rue Leblanc
Bâtiment "Le Ponant D"
75015 Paris / FR
[2016/17]
Former [2015/05]For all designated states
Commissariat à l'Énergie Atomique et aux Énergies Alternatives
25, rue Leblanc
Bâtiment "Le Ponant D"
75015 Paris / FR
Inventor(s)01 / ALLEZARD, Nicolas
77 rue du Père Corentin
F-75014 Paris / FR
02 / HERVIEU, Alexandre
31 rue du Clos
F-75020 Paris / FR
03 / LUCAT, Laurent
Le champ du châtaignier
F-72550 Fay / FR
 [2015/05]
Representative(s)Hammes, Pierre
Marks & Clerk France
Immeuble Visium
22, avenue Aristide Briand
94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR
[N/P]
Former [2015/05]Hammes, Pierre
Marks & Clerk France
Immeuble Visium
22, avenue Aristide Briand
94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR
Application number, filing date13709900.815.03.2013
[2016/17]
WO2013EP55320
Priority number, dateFR2012005264523.03.2012         Original published format: FR 1252645
[2015/05]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013139684
Date:26.09.2013
Language:FR
[2013/39]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2828825
Date:28.01.2015
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.09.2013
[2015/05]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2828825
Date:27.04.2016
Language:FR
[2016/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP26.09.2013
ClassificationInternational:G06T7/00
[2015/05]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/05]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR BESTIMMUNG EINER GRUNDEBENE AUS EINEM TIEFENBILD[2015/45]
English:METHOD FOR DETERMINING THE GROUND PLANE BASED ON A DEPTH IMAGE[2015/45]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTERMINATION D'UN PLAN DU SOL À PARTIR D'UNE IMAGE DE PROFONDEUR[2015/05]
Former [2015/05]VERFAHREN ZUR BESTIMMUNG EINER GRUNDPLATTE AUF BASIS VON TIEFENBILDERN
Former [2015/05]METHOD OF DETERMINING A GROUND PLANE ON THE BASIS OF A DEPTH IMAGE
Entry into regional phase10.09.2014National basic fee paid 
10.09.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
10.09.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.09.2014Examination requested  [2015/05]
07.12.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.03.2016Fee for grant paid
03.03.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
03.03.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  07.12.2015
Opposition(s)30.01.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/14]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
26.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU15.03.2013
AL27.04.2016
AT27.04.2016
BG27.04.2016
CZ27.04.2016
DK27.04.2016
EE27.04.2016
FI27.04.2016
HR27.04.2016
LT27.04.2016
LV27.04.2016
MC27.04.2016
MT27.04.2016
NL27.04.2016
PL27.04.2016
RO27.04.2016
RS27.04.2016
SE27.04.2016
SI27.04.2016
SK27.04.2016
SM27.04.2016
NO27.07.2016
GR28.07.2016
PT29.08.2016
[2019/39]
Former [2019/31]HU15.03.2013
AL27.04.2016
AT27.04.2016
CZ27.04.2016
DK27.04.2016
EE27.04.2016
FI27.04.2016
HR27.04.2016
LT27.04.2016
LV27.04.2016
MC27.04.2016
MT27.04.2016
NL27.04.2016
PL27.04.2016
RO27.04.2016
RS27.04.2016
SE27.04.2016
SI27.04.2016
SK27.04.2016
SM27.04.2016
NO27.07.2016
GR28.07.2016
PT29.08.2016
Former [2018/46]AL27.04.2016
AT27.04.2016
CZ27.04.2016
DK27.04.2016
EE27.04.2016
FI27.04.2016
HR27.04.2016
LT27.04.2016
LV27.04.2016
MC27.04.2016
MT27.04.2016
NL27.04.2016
PL27.04.2016
RO27.04.2016
RS27.04.2016
SE27.04.2016
SI27.04.2016
SK27.04.2016
SM27.04.2016
NO27.07.2016
GR28.07.2016
PT29.08.2016
Former [2018/43]AT27.04.2016
CZ27.04.2016
DK27.04.2016
EE27.04.2016
FI27.04.2016
HR27.04.2016
LT27.04.2016
LV27.04.2016
MC27.04.2016
MT27.04.2016
NL27.04.2016
PL27.04.2016
RO27.04.2016
RS27.04.2016
SE27.04.2016
SI27.04.2016
SK27.04.2016
SM27.04.2016
NO27.07.2016
GR28.07.2016
PT29.08.2016
Former [2018/01]AT27.04.2016
CZ27.04.2016
DK27.04.2016
EE27.04.2016
FI27.04.2016
HR27.04.2016
LT27.04.2016
LV27.04.2016
MC27.04.2016
NL27.04.2016
PL27.04.2016
RO27.04.2016
RS27.04.2016
SE27.04.2016
SI27.04.2016
SK27.04.2016
SM27.04.2016
NO27.07.2016
GR28.07.2016
PT29.08.2016
Former [2017/37]AT27.04.2016
CZ27.04.2016
DK27.04.2016
EE27.04.2016
FI27.04.2016
HR27.04.2016
LT27.04.2016
LV27.04.2016
NL27.04.2016
PL27.04.2016
RO27.04.2016
RS27.04.2016
SE27.04.2016
SI27.04.2016
SK27.04.2016
SM27.04.2016
NO27.07.2016
GR28.07.2016
PT29.08.2016
Former [2017/11]AT27.04.2016
CZ27.04.2016
DK27.04.2016
EE27.04.2016
FI27.04.2016
HR27.04.2016
LT27.04.2016
LV27.04.2016
NL27.04.2016
PL27.04.2016
RO27.04.2016
RS27.04.2016
SE27.04.2016
SK27.04.2016
SM27.04.2016
NO27.07.2016
GR28.07.2016
PT29.08.2016
Former [2017/10]AT27.04.2016
CZ27.04.2016
DK27.04.2016
EE27.04.2016
FI27.04.2016
HR27.04.2016
LT27.04.2016
LV27.04.2016
NL27.04.2016
PL27.04.2016
RO27.04.2016
RS27.04.2016
SE27.04.2016
SK27.04.2016
NO27.07.2016
GR28.07.2016
PT29.08.2016
Former [2017/09]AT27.04.2016
CZ27.04.2016
DK27.04.2016
EE27.04.2016
FI27.04.2016
HR27.04.2016
LT27.04.2016
LV27.04.2016
NL27.04.2016
PL27.04.2016
RO27.04.2016
RS27.04.2016
SE27.04.2016
NO27.07.2016
GR28.07.2016
PT29.08.2016
Former [2017/07]AT27.04.2016
DK27.04.2016
FI27.04.2016
HR27.04.2016
LT27.04.2016
LV27.04.2016
NL27.04.2016
PL27.04.2016
RS27.04.2016
SE27.04.2016
NO27.07.2016
GR28.07.2016
PT29.08.2016
Former [2016/52]AT27.04.2016
FI27.04.2016
HR27.04.2016
LT27.04.2016
LV27.04.2016
NL27.04.2016
PL27.04.2016
RS27.04.2016
SE27.04.2016
NO27.07.2016
GR28.07.2016
PT29.08.2016
Former [2016/51]AT27.04.2016
FI27.04.2016
HR27.04.2016
LT27.04.2016
LV27.04.2016
NL27.04.2016
PL27.04.2016
RS27.04.2016
NO27.07.2016
GR28.07.2016
PT29.08.2016
Former [2016/50]AT27.04.2016
FI27.04.2016
HR27.04.2016
LT27.04.2016
LV27.04.2016
NL27.04.2016
PL27.04.2016
RS27.04.2016
NO27.07.2016
Former [2016/49]FI27.04.2016
LT27.04.2016
NL27.04.2016
PL27.04.2016
NO27.07.2016
Former [2016/46]LT27.04.2016
NL27.04.2016
NO27.07.2016
Former [2016/44]NL27.04.2016
Cited inInternational search[A]US7741961  (RAFII ABBAS [US], et al) [A] 1-18 * column 10, lines 32-57 *;
 [A]  - MOLTON N ET AL, "A stereo vision-based aid for the visually impaired", IMAGE AND VISION COMPUTING ELSEVIER NETHERLANDS, (19980403), vol. 16, no. 4, ISSN 0262-8856, pages 251 - 263, XP002689530 [A] 1-18 * abstract * * sections 3.1, 3.2 * * figures 6,7 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0262-8856(97)00087-5
 [A]  - ANGEL D SAPPA ET AL, Real Time Vehicle Pose Using On-Board Stereo Vision System, IMAGE ANALYSIS AND RECOGNITION LECTURE NOTES IN COMPUTER SCIENCE;;LNCS, SPRINGER, BERLIN, DE, PAGE(S) 205 - 216, (20060101), ISBN 978-3-540-44894-5, XP019043780 [A] 1-18 * abstract * * section 3 *
 [A]  - SE S ET AL, "Stereo vision-based obstacle detection for partially sighted people", COMPUTER VISION - ACCV '98. THIRD ASIAN CONFERENCE ON COMPUTER VISION. PROCEEDINGS SPRINGER-VERLAG BERLIN, GERMANY, (1997), vol. 1, ISBN 3-540-63930-6, page 152, XP002689531 [A] 1-18 * abstract * * section 4 *
 [A]  - ONIGA F ET AL, "Processing Dense Stereo Data Using Elevation Maps: Road Surface, Traffic Isle, and Obstacle Detection", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON VEHICULAR TECHNOLOGY, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (20100301), vol. 59, no. 3, ISSN 0018-9545, pages 1172 - 1182, XP011299067 [A] 1-18 * section VI *