Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2806939

EP2806939 - MICRONEEDLE ADAPTER FOR DOSED DRUG DELIVERY DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  01.12.2017
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  31.08.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip01.12.2017Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 03.01.2018  [2018/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nanopass Technologies Ltd.
Golda Meir 3 Park Hamada
74036 Nes Ziona / IL
[2014/49]
Inventor(s)01 / LEVIN, Yotam
5B Savion ST.
74201 Nes Ziona / IL
02 / YESHURUN, Yehoshua
17 Avshalom St.
34403 Haifa. / IL
03 / AGIAN, Nadav
73 Hayarmuch St.
4030001 Kfar Yona / IL
04 / PANGA, Barak
Meshek 74
99795 Moshav Ptahia / IL
05 / SEFI, Yoel
DN Merom Hagalil
13845 Kibbutz Malkia / IL
06 / ADMATI, Gal
DN Ashkelon.
79175 Kibbutz Dorot / IL
 [2014/49]
Representative(s)Becker Kurig Straus
Patentanwälte
Bavariastrasse 7
80336 München / DE
[2014/49]
Application number, filing date13710039.224.01.2013
WO2013IB50617
Priority number, dateUS201261589882P24.01.2012         Original published format: US 201261589882 P
US201261598364P14.02.2012         Original published format: US 201261598364 P
[2014/49]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2013111087
Date:01.08.2013
Language:EN
[2013/31]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2806939
Date:03.12.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.08.2013
[2014/49]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP31.10.2013
ClassificationInternational:A61M37/00, A61M5/24
[2014/49]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/49]
TitleGerman:MIKRONADELADAPTER FÜR VORRICHTUNGEN ZUR DOSIERTEN ARZNEIMITTELABGABE[2014/49]
English:MICRONEEDLE ADAPTER FOR DOSED DRUG DELIVERY DEVICES[2014/49]
French:ADAPTATEUR DE MICRO-AIGUILLE POUR DISPOSITIFS D'ADMINISTRATION DE MÉDICAMENT DOSIFIÉ[2014/49]
Entry into regional phase09.07.2014National basic fee paid 
09.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
09.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.07.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/49]
01.08.2017Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2018/01]
29.08.2017Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2018/01]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
15.07.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.01.201503   M06   Fee paid on   31.07.2015
31.01.201604   M06   Fee paid on   15.07.2016
31.01.201705   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[XD]US2011282298  (AGIAN NADAV [IL] ET AL) [XD] 1-6,13,14 * page 1, paragraph 1 - page 4, paragraph 54; figures 1-7B *
by applicantUS2003050602
 US2003181863
 US6533949
 WO03074102
 WO2005049107
 US2005209566
 US6503231
 US7998119
 US2005163711