Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2807157 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2807157



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 190
21.12.2016 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
08.12.2016 Closing of application Search / examination 1
05.09.2016 Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-payment of renewal fee) Search / examination 1
04.03.2016 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
09.03.2015 Confirmation of revocation of automatic debit order Search / examination 1
03.03.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
03.03.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
03.03.2015 Letter relating to the automatic debiting procedure Search / examination 1
05.11.2014 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
05.09.2014 Communication regarding comments on written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
03.09.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
03.09.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
03.09.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
03.09.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
13.08.2014 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 5
24.07.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
24.07.2014 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 5
24.07.2014 General authorisation Search / examination 3
24.07.2014 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 4
06.06.2014 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
20.08.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 78
01.08.2013 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
01.08.2013 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 67
03.06.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
03.06.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
03.06.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2