Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2807157


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
09.12.2016 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  11.01.2017  [2017/02]
04.09.2016 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
05.03.2016 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
05.04.2015 Change - extension states published on  06.05.2015  [2015/19]
21.01.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
31.10.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  03.12.2014  [2014/49]
31.10.2014 Request for examination filed published on  03.12.2014  [2014/49]
11.09.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
30.08.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
21.08.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
26.07.2014 Amendment by applicant
25.07.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
12.08.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
02.08.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
25.03.2013 PCT data prior to European publication