Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP2807157

Designated contracting statesAL 
AT 
BE 
BG 
CH 
CY 
CZ 
DE 
DK 
EE 
ES 
FI 
FR 
GB 
GR 
HR 
HU 
IE 
IS 
IT 
LI 
LT 
LU 
LV 
MC 
MK 
MT 
NL 
NO 
PL 
PT 
RO 
RS 
SE 
SI 
SK 
SM 
TR 
Examination procedure05.09.2016Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2017/02]
Entry into regional phase27.08.2014National basic fee paid 
27.08.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
27.08.2014Examination fee paid 
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.01.201604   M06   Not yet paid
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:03.12.2014 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:20140827
 
Event date:03.12.2014 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A1
Designated State(s):AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR
 
Event date:06.05.2015 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)
 
Event date:11.01.2017 
Event description:APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN
Effective DATE:20160802