Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2807157

EP2807157 - 5-MEMBERED HETEROARYLCARBOXAMIDE DERIVATIVES AS PLASMA KALLIKREIN INHIBITORS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  09.12.2016
Database last updated on 20.11.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip09.12.2016Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 11.01.2017  [2017/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Novartis AG
Lichtstrasse 35
4056 Basel / CH
[2014/49]
Inventor(s)01 / FLOHR, Stefanie
Novartis Pharma AG
Postfach
4002 Basel / CH
02 / MARKERT, Christian
Novartis Pharma AG
Postfach
4002 Basel / CH
03 / NAMOTO, Kenji
Novartis Pharma AG
Postfach
4002 Basel / CH
04 / PIRARD, Bernard
Novartis Pharma AG
Postfach
4002 Basel / CH
 [2014/49]
Representative(s)Woodcock-Bourne, Heather , et al
Novartis Pharma AG Patent Department Postfach
4002 Basel / CH
[2014/49]
Application number, filing date13710040.025.01.2013
WO2013IB50662
Priority number, dateUS201261591472P27.01.2012         Original published format: US 201261591472 P
[2014/49]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013111108
Date:01.08.2013
Language:EN
[2013/31]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2807157
Date:03.12.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.08.2013
[2014/49]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP01.08.2013
ClassificationInternational:C07D403/12, C07D401/14, C07D231/14, C07D401/06, C07D403/10, C07D403/14, A61P27/00
[2014/49]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/49]
TitleGerman:5-GLIEDRIGE HETEROACYLCARBONSÄUREAMIDERIVATE ALS PLASMAKALLIKREIN-INHIBITOREN[2014/49]
English:5-MEMBERED HETEROARYLCARBOXAMIDE DERIVATIVES AS PLASMA KALLIKREIN INHIBITORS[2014/49]
French:DÉRIVÉS HÉTÉROARYLCARBOXAMIDE À 5 CHAÎNONS COMME INHIBITEURS DE LA KALLIKRÉINE PLASMATIQUE[2014/49]
Entry into regional phase27.08.2014National basic fee paid 
27.08.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
27.08.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure24.07.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
27.08.2014Examination requested  [2014/49]
02.08.2016Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2017/02]
05.09.2016Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2017/02]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.01.201604   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[X]WO2010142801  (UNIV LEUVEN KATH [BE], et al) [X] 1,2,6,7,10 * compound D34 * * abstract *;
 [AD]WO2008016883  (ACTIVESITE PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al) [AD] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2011152533  (SINHA SUKANTO [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *
by applicantWO03076458
 WO2008016883
 WO2004078163
    - JA BERNSTEIN ET AL., EXPERT REV. CLIN. IMMUNOL., (2010), vol. 6, pages 29 - 39
    - UC NZEAKO ET AL., ARCH INTERN MED., (2001), vol. 161, pages 2417 - 2429
    - JA PHIPPS ET AL., HYPERTENSION, (2009), vol. 53, pages 175 - 181
    - C STORONI ET AL., JPET, (2006), vol. 318, pages 849 - 954
    - Remington's Pharmaceutical Sciences, MACK PRINTING COMPANY, (1990), pages 1289 - 1329
    - HOUBEN-WEYL, Methods of Organic Synthesis, THIEME, (1952), vol. 21
    - TETRAHEDRON, (2006), vol. 62, pages 6222 - 6227
    - SYNTHETIC COMMUNICATIONS, (1988), vol. 18, no. 3, pages 259 - 264
    - J. MED. CHEM., (1998), vol. 41, page 4466
    - GALLIMORE ET AL., THROMB RES, (1982), vol. 25, pages 293 - 298