Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2814735

EP2814735 - AIRCRAFT FOR VERTICAL TAKE-OFF AND LANDING WITH TWO WING ARRANGEMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  15.01.2016
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.01.2016Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 17.02.2016  [2016/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Reiter, Johannes
Überhülling 3
4663 Laakirchen / AT
[2014/52]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2014/52]
Representative(s)Dilg, Haeusler, Schindelmann Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH
Leonrodstrasse 58
80636 München / DE
[2014/52]
Application number, filing date13710309.913.02.2013
WO2013EP52903
Priority number, dateGB2012000244113.02.2012         Original published format: GB 201202441
GB2012001488721.08.2012         Original published format: GB 201214887
[2014/52]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013120912
Date:22.08.2013
Language:EN
[2013/34]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2814735
Date:24.12.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.08.2013
[2014/52]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP22.08.2013
ClassificationInternational:B64C29/02, B64C39/02, B64C29/00
[2014/52]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/52]
TitleGerman:FLUGZEUG FÜR SENKRECHTSTART UND -LANDUNG MIT ZWEI FLÜGELANORDNUNGEN[2014/52]
English:AIRCRAFT FOR VERTICAL TAKE-OFF AND LANDING WITH TWO WING ARRANGEMENTS[2014/52]
French:AÉRONEF POUR DÉCOLLAGE ET ATTERRISSAGE VERTICAL AVEC DEUX AGENCEMENTS D'AILES[2014/52]
Entry into regional phase15.09.2014National basic fee paid 
15.09.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
15.09.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.09.2014Examination requested  [2014/52]
20.04.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
10.09.2015Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2016/07]
07.10.2015Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2016/07]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
28.02.201503   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[XYI]US2749125  (REAM DONALD F) [X] 1-4,6,8-12,14,15,20 * figures 1-5, 12, 17, 18 * * column 3, line 30 - line 50 * * column 4, line 9 - line 18 * [Y] 13,16-19 [I] 5,7;
 [Y]US8083173  (ARLTON PAUL E [US], et al) [Y] 13,16-19 * figures 1, 2, 4, 6 *;
 [I]FR1225791  (M.A.J. CAMUS) [I] 1,20 * page 1, column r, paragraph 11 - page 2, column l, paragraph 1 * * figures 1, 2 *;
 [A]US2010025543  (KINSEY LLOYD E [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * figures 6A, 6B *;
 [A]US2328786  (CROWDER WILEY K) [A] 1-20 * figures 1-3 * * page 2, column l, line 31 - line 45 * * page 2, column r, line 5 - line 30 * * page 3, column l, line 61 - column r, line 53 *;
 [A]US5779900  (HOLM CHRISTOPHER E [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * abstract * * figures 1, 2 * * column 4, line 1 - line 6 * * column 5, line 38 - column 6, line 48 *;
 [A]US2444781  (LEONARD LLOYD H) [A] 1-20 * figure - *