blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2814735 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2814735



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 233
27.01.2016 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
08.01.2016 Closing of application Search / examination 1
07.10.2015 Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-payment of renewal fee) Search / examination 1
20.04.2015 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 5
20.04.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 6
20.04.2015 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 6
07.04.2015 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
26.11.2014 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
10.10.2014 Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
15.09.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
15.09.2014 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
02.09.2014 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 6
27.06.2014 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
11.09.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 44
11.09.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 49
22.08.2013 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
22.08.2013 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 44
13.06.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
13.06.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
13.06.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 3
13.03.2013 Letter concerning fees and payments PCT receiving Office 1
13.03.2013 Payment of fees and costs PCT receiving Office 1
13.02.2013 (Electronic) Receipt PCT receiving Office 2
13.02.2013 Abstract PCT receiving Office 1
13.02.2013 Claims PCT receiving Office 6
13.02.2013 Description PCT receiving Office 32
13.02.2013 Drawings PCT receiving Office 5