blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2814735


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
15.01.2016 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  17.02.2016  [2016/07]
06.10.2015 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
05.05.2015 Amendment by applicant
17.04.2015 Change - extension states published on  20.05.2015  [2015/21]
08.04.2015 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
21.11.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  24.12.2014  [2014/52]
21.11.2014 Request for examination filed published on  24.12.2014  [2014/52]
10.10.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
17.09.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
16.09.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
03.09.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
23.08.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
26.03.2013 PCT data prior to European publication