blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2814735 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201380019843 EP13709050 EP13710309



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
WO2013120918Global Dossier 22.08.2013A1
Priority number Date
GB201202441 13.02.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2015232178Global Dossier 20.08.2015A1
Priority number Date
GB201214887 21.08.2012
WO2013EP52903 13.02.2013
GB201202441 13.02.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2015028155Global Dossier 29.01.2015A1
Priority number Date
WO2013EP52911 13.02.2013
GB201202441 13.02.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2814734Global Dossier 24.12.2014A1
Priority number Date
WO2013EP52911 13.02.2013
GB201202441 13.02.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN104470800Global Dossier 25.03.2015A
Priority number Date
WO2013EP52911 13.02.2013
GB201202441 13.02.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2814735Global Dossier 24.12.2014A1
Priority number Date
GB201214887 21.08.2012
WO2013EP52903 13.02.2013
GB201202441 13.02.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2864580 22.08.2013A1
Priority number Date
WO2013EP52911 13.02.2013
GB201202441 13.02.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EA201491528 30.01.2015A1
Priority number Date
GB201214887 21.08.2012
WO2013EP52903 13.02.2013
GB201202441 13.02.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EA201491529 30.04.2015A1
Priority number Date
WO2013EP52911 13.02.2013
GB201202441 13.02.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
GB201202441D 28.03.2012D0
Priority number Date
GB201202441 13.02.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
GB201214887D 03.10.2012D0
Priority number Date
GB201202441 13.02.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
IN7628DELNP2014 15.05.2015A
Priority number Date
WO2013EP52911 13.02.2013
GB201202441 13.02.2012
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2013120912Global Dossier 22.08.2013A1
Priority number Date
GB201214887 21.08.2012
GB201202441 13.02.2012