Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2828240

EP2828240 - COMPOUNDS FOR A CONTROLLED RELEASE OF ACTIVE PERFUMING MOLECULES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.09.2019
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  28.09.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  23.08.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  29.05.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  01.03.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  24.03.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip24.01.2020Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IE
published on 26.02.2020 [2020/09]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Firmenich SA
1, route des Jeunes
P.O. Box 239
1211 Geneva 8 / CH
[2018/44]
Former [2015/05]For all designated states
Firmenich SA
1, route des Jeunes
P.O. Box 239
1211 Geneva 8 / CH
Inventor(s)01 / FANKHAUSER, Peter
Firmenich SA
1, route des Jeunes
CH-1211 Geneva 8 / CH
02 / HERRMANN, Andreas
Firmenich SA
1, route des Jeunes
CH-1211 Geneva 8 / CH
03 / MADDALENA, Umberto
Firmenich SA
1, route des Jeunes
CH-1211 Geneva 8 / CH
04 / TRACHSEL, Alain
Firmenich SA
1, route des Jeunes
CH-1211 Geneva 8 / CH
05 / SHEN, Youqing
Department of Chemical and Biochemical Engineering
Zhejiang University
Hangzhou, Zhejiang 310027 / CN
 [2018/44]
Former [2015/05]01 / FANKHAUSER, Peter
Firmenich SA
1 route des Jeunes
CH-1211 Geneva 8 / CH
02 / HERRMANN, Andreas
Firmenich SA
1 route des Jeunes
CH-1211 Geneva 8 / CH
03 / MADDALENA, Umberto
Firmenich SA
1 route des Jeunes
CH-1211 Geneva 8 / CH
04 / TRACHSEL, Alain
Firmenich SA
1route des Jeunes
CH-1211 Geneva 8 / CH
05 / SHEN, Youqing
Department of Chemical and Biochemical Engineering
Zhejiang University
Hangzhou Zhejiang 310027 / CN
Representative(s)Rupp, Christian
Mitscherlich PartmbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Sonnenstraße 33
80331 München / DE
[2018/44]
Former [2015/05]Carina, Riccardo Filippo
FIRMENICH SA
Legal Dept., IP Group
Route des Jeunes, 1
P.O. Box 239
1211 Geneva 8 / CH
Application number, filing date13710405.519.03.2013
[2018/44]
WO2013EP55641
Priority number, dateEP2012016025320.03.2012         Original published format: EP 12160253
[2015/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013139766
Date:26.09.2013
Language:EN
[2013/39]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2828240
Date:28.01.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.09.2013
[2015/05]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2828240
Date:31.10.2018
Language:EN
[2018/44]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP26.09.2013
ClassificationInternational:C07C323/52, C07C323/60, C07C323/61, C07F7/18, C11B9/00, C11D3/50
[2015/05]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/05]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERBINDUNGEN ZUR KONTROLLIERTEN FREISETZUNG AKTIVER PARFÜM-MOLEKÜLE[2018/07]
English:COMPOUNDS FOR A CONTROLLED RELEASE OF ACTIVE PERFUMING MOLECULES[2015/05]
French:COMPOSÉS POUR LIBÉRATION CONTRÔLÉE DE MOLÉCULES ACTIVES PARFUMANTS[2018/07]
Former [2015/05]VERBINDUNGEN ZUR KONTROLLIERTEN FREISETZUNG AKTIVER DUFTSTOFFMOLEKÜLE
Former [2015/05]COMPOSÉS POUR UNE LIBÉRATION CONTRÔLÉE DE MOLÉCULES PARFUMANTES ACTIVES
Entry into regional phase20.10.2014National basic fee paid 
20.10.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
20.10.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.10.2014Examination requested  [2015/05]
14.04.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
22.03.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.07.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.08.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
02.10.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.03.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.05.2018Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
11.06.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
17.07.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.08.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.09.2018Fee for grant paid
20.09.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
20.09.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  22.03.2017
Opposition(s)01.08.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/41]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
31.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
31.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
03.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL31.10.2018
AT31.10.2018
CZ31.10.2018
DK31.10.2018
EE31.10.2018
ES31.10.2018
FI31.10.2018
HR31.10.2018
IT31.10.2018
LT31.10.2018
LV31.10.2018
MC31.10.2018
NL31.10.2018
PL31.10.2018
RO31.10.2018
RS31.10.2018
SE31.10.2018
SI31.10.2018
SK31.10.2018
SM31.10.2018
BG31.01.2019
NO31.01.2019
GR01.02.2019
IS28.02.2019
PT01.03.2019
IE19.03.2019
LU19.03.2019
[2020/09]
Former [2020/01]AL31.10.2018
AT31.10.2018
CZ31.10.2018
DK31.10.2018
EE31.10.2018
ES31.10.2018
FI31.10.2018
HR31.10.2018
IT31.10.2018
LT31.10.2018
LV31.10.2018
MC31.10.2018
NL31.10.2018
PL31.10.2018
RO31.10.2018
RS31.10.2018
SE31.10.2018
SI31.10.2018
SK31.10.2018
SM31.10.2018
BG31.01.2019
NO31.01.2019
GR01.02.2019
IS28.02.2019
PT01.03.2019
LU19.03.2019
Former [2019/50]AL31.10.2018
AT31.10.2018
CZ31.10.2018
DK31.10.2018
EE31.10.2018
ES31.10.2018
FI31.10.2018
HR31.10.2018
IT31.10.2018
LT31.10.2018
LV31.10.2018
MC31.10.2018
NL31.10.2018
PL31.10.2018
RO31.10.2018
RS31.10.2018
SE31.10.2018
SI31.10.2018
SK31.10.2018
SM31.10.2018
BG31.01.2019
NO31.01.2019
GR01.02.2019
IS28.02.2019
PT01.03.2019
Former [2019/46]AL31.10.2018
AT31.10.2018
CZ31.10.2018
DK31.10.2018
EE31.10.2018
ES31.10.2018
FI31.10.2018
HR31.10.2018
IT31.10.2018
LT31.10.2018
LV31.10.2018
MC31.10.2018
NL31.10.2018
PL31.10.2018
RO31.10.2018
RS31.10.2018
SE31.10.2018
SK31.10.2018
SM31.10.2018
BG31.01.2019
NO31.01.2019
GR01.02.2019
IS28.02.2019
PT01.03.2019
Former [2019/40]AL31.10.2018
AT31.10.2018
CZ31.10.2018
DK31.10.2018
EE31.10.2018
ES31.10.2018
FI31.10.2018
HR31.10.2018
IT31.10.2018
LT31.10.2018
LV31.10.2018
NL31.10.2018
PL31.10.2018
RO31.10.2018
RS31.10.2018
SE31.10.2018
SK31.10.2018
SM31.10.2018
BG31.01.2019
NO31.01.2019
GR01.02.2019
IS28.02.2019
PT01.03.2019
Former [2019/37]AL31.10.2018
AT31.10.2018
CZ31.10.2018
DK31.10.2018
EE31.10.2018
ES31.10.2018
FI31.10.2018
HR31.10.2018
IT31.10.2018
LT31.10.2018
LV31.10.2018
NL31.10.2018
PL31.10.2018
RO31.10.2018
RS31.10.2018
SE31.10.2018
SM31.10.2018
BG31.01.2019
NO31.01.2019
GR01.02.2019
IS28.02.2019
PT01.03.2019
Former [2019/35]AL31.10.2018
AT31.10.2018
CZ31.10.2018
DK31.10.2018
ES31.10.2018
FI31.10.2018
HR31.10.2018
IT31.10.2018
LT31.10.2018
LV31.10.2018
NL31.10.2018
PL31.10.2018
RS31.10.2018
SE31.10.2018
BG31.01.2019
NO31.01.2019
GR01.02.2019
IS28.02.2019
PT01.03.2019
Former [2019/34]AL31.10.2018
AT31.10.2018
DK31.10.2018
ES31.10.2018
FI31.10.2018
HR31.10.2018
IT31.10.2018
LT31.10.2018
LV31.10.2018
NL31.10.2018
PL31.10.2018
RS31.10.2018
SE31.10.2018
BG31.01.2019
NO31.01.2019
GR01.02.2019
IS28.02.2019
PT01.03.2019
Former [2019/26]AL31.10.2018
AT31.10.2018
ES31.10.2018
FI31.10.2018
HR31.10.2018
LT31.10.2018
LV31.10.2018
NL31.10.2018
PL31.10.2018
RS31.10.2018
SE31.10.2018
BG31.01.2019
NO31.01.2019
GR01.02.2019
IS28.02.2019
PT01.03.2019
Former [2019/25]AT31.10.2018
ES31.10.2018
FI31.10.2018
HR31.10.2018
LT31.10.2018
LV31.10.2018
NL31.10.2018
PL31.10.2018
RS31.10.2018
SE31.10.2018
BG31.01.2019
NO31.01.2019
GR01.02.2019
IS28.02.2019
Former [2019/24]AT31.10.2018
ES31.10.2018
FI31.10.2018
HR31.10.2018
LT31.10.2018
LV31.10.2018
NL31.10.2018
PL31.10.2018
SE31.10.2018
BG31.01.2019
NO31.01.2019
GR01.02.2019
IS28.02.2019
Former [2019/23]AT31.10.2018
ES31.10.2018
FI31.10.2018
HR31.10.2018
LT31.10.2018
LV31.10.2018
NL31.10.2018
PL31.10.2018
BG31.01.2019
NO31.01.2019
IS28.02.2019
Former [2019/22]FI31.10.2018
LT31.10.2018
PL31.10.2018
BG31.01.2019
NO31.01.2019
IS28.02.2019
Former [2019/21]FI31.10.2018
LT31.10.2018
NO31.01.2019
IS28.02.2019
Former [2019/20]LT31.10.2018
NO31.01.2019
Cited inInternational search[XD]WO03029188  (BASF AG [DE], et al) [XD] 8 * page 36; table 1; compound 52 *;
 [XD]US4665174  (MINAI MASAYOSHI [JP], et al) [XD] 1,3,5-11 * abstract * * column 3, lines 6-7 * * column 22; example 54 *;
 [YD]WO03049666  (FIRMENICH & CIE [CH], et al) [YD] 1-11 * abstract *;
 [Y]WO2008044178  (FIRMENICH & CIE [CH], et al) [Y] 1-11 * abstract *;
 [X]DE2717087  (CIBA GEIGY AG) [X] 8 * page 32; example 6 *;
 [XD]WO2007014409  (NABRIVA THERAPEUTICS FORSCHUNG [AT], et al) [XD] 8 * page 18; compound 1B *;
 [A]GB1323467  (GIVAUDAN & CIE SA) [A] 1-11 * page 1, column 2 * * page 2, column 2, lines 40-54 * * page 4; example 7 *
 [XD]  - YONGHAI HUI ET AL., "Highly Enantioselective Conjugate Addition of Thioglycolate to Chalcones Catalyzed by Lanthanum: Low Catalyst Loading and Remarkable Chiral Amplification", ANGEWANDTE CHEMIE INTERNATIONAL EDITION, (2010), vol. 49, no. 25, doi:10.1002/anie.201000105, ISSN 1433-7851, pages 4290 - 4293, XP055034327 [XD] 8 * Supporting Information *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/anie.201000105
    [ ] - YONGHAI HUI ET AL, "Highly Enantioselective Conjugate Addition of Thioglycolate to Chalcones Catalyzed by Lanthanum: Low Catalyst Loading and Remarkable Chiral Amplification. Supporting Information", ANGEWANDTE CHEMIE INTERNATIONAL EDITION, (2010), vol. 49, no. 25, doi:10.1002/anie.201000105, ISSN 1433-7851, pages S1 - S52, XP055034330 [ ] * pages S16-S17; compounds 3ab, 5a, 5b * * reaction scheme; page S18, paragraph 6 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/anie.201000105
 [Y]  - BERTHIER, D.L. ET AL., "Influence of the Backbone Structure on the Release of Bioactive Volatiles from Maleic Acid-Based Polymer Conjugates", BIOCONJUGATE CHEMISTRY, (2010), vol. 21, no. 11, doi:10.1021/bc100223s, ISSN 1043-1802, pages 2000 - 2012, XP055034586 [Y] 1-11 * abstract * * Schemes 1, 2; page 2001 * * Schemes 3-5; page 2004 - page 2005 * * page 2010, column 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bc100223s
 [Y]  - FEHR, C. ET AL., "Aldols by Michael Addition: Application of the retro-Michael Addition to the Slow Release of Enones", HELVETICA CHIMICA ACTA, (2005), vol. 88, no. 12, doi:10.1002/hlca.200590252, ISSN 0018-019X, pages 3128 - 3136, XP055034584 [Y] 1-11 * abstract * * page 3131, paragraph 2 * * Scheme 5; page 3132, paragraph l *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/hlca.200590252
 [X]  - AURICH, H.G. ET AL., "1,3-Dipolare Cycloaddition von Dinitronen - Bildung tricyclischer Dimerer", ZEITSCHRIFT FUR NATURFORSCHUNG, TEIL B: ANORGANISCHE CHEMIE, ORGANISCHE CHEMIE, VERLAG DER ZEITSCHRIFT FUR NATURFORSCHUNG. TUBINGEN, DE, (1994), vol. 49, no. 7, ISSN 0932-0776, pages 963 - 969, XP009169545 [X] 8 * reaction scheme; page 964, column 1; compound 5 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1515/znb-1994-0719
 [X]  - ESTERBAUER, H., "Kinetics of the reaction of sulfhydryl compounds with alpha,beta-unsaturated aldehydes in an aqueous system", MONATSHEFTE FÜR CHEMIE - CHEMICAL MONTHLY, (1970), vol. 101, no. 3, doi:10.1007/BF00909898, ISSN 0026-9247, pages 782 - 810, XP055062647 [X] 8 * abstract * * page 784; examples 1,3; table 1 * * page 806; table 5 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF00909898
 [X]  - RANU, B.C. ET AL., "Surface-mediated solid phase reaction: Dramatic improvement of Michael reaction on the surface of alumina", TETRAHEDRON, vol. 48, no. 7, doi:10.1016/S0040-4020(01)90794-X, ISSN 0040-4020, (1992), pages 1327 - 1332, (19920101), XP026608050 [X] 8 * page 1328 - page 1329; table 1; compounds 7,10,14 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0040-4020(01)90794-X
 [X]  - OHATA, K. ET AL., "Synthesis and biological activity of enantiomeric pairs of 5-vinylthiolactomycin congeners", BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY LETTERS, (2007), vol. 17, no. 14, doi:10.1016/J.BMCL.2007.04.067, ISSN 0960-894X, pages 4070 - 4074, XP022120013 [X] 8 * Scheme 1; page 4071; compounds 9a,9b,9c *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bmcl.2007.04.067
by applicantWO03029188
 US4665174
 US140
 WO2007014409
 WO03049666
 WO9734986
 WO2012113756
 US4137180
 US5236615
 EP0799885
    - E. MOUNTAUDON ET AL., HELV. CHIM. ACTA, (2000), vol. 83, page 616
    - X. FENG ET AL., ANGEW. CHEM. INT. ED., (2010), vol. 49, page 4290
    - E. V. SIRAZIEVA ET AL., CHEM. NAT. COMPD., (2006), vol. 42, page 693
    - "Hydrokolloide: Stabilisatoren, Dickungs- und Geliermittel", H. SCHERZ, Schriftenreihe Lebensmittelchemie, Lebensmittelqualitdt, BEHR'S VERLAG GMBH & CO., (1996), vol. 2
    - Ullman's Encyclopedia of Industrial Chemistry, (1987), vol. A8, pages 315 - 448
    - ULLMAN'S ENCYCLOPEDIA OF INDUSTRIAL CHEMISTRY, (1994), vol. A25, pages 747 - 817
    - "Powdered Detergents", SHOWELL, Surfactant Science Series, MARCEL DEKKER, (1988), vol. 71