blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2825497
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2015060199Global Dossier 05.03.2015A1
Priority number Date
GB201204387 12.03.2012
WO2013GB00099 08.03.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2825497Global Dossier 27.04.2016B1
EP2825497 21.01.2015A1
Priority number Date
GB201204387 12.03.2012
WO2013GB00099 08.03.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2866834 19.09.2013A1
Priority number Date
GB201204387 12.03.2012
WO2013GB00099 08.03.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
IN7333DELNP2014 24.04.2015A
Priority number Date
GB201204387 12.03.2012
WO2013GB00099 08.03.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2013136036Global Dossier 19.09.2013A1
Priority number Date
GB201204387 12.03.2012
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
GB201204387D 25.04.2012D0
Priority number Date
GB201204387 12.03.2012