Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2825497

EP2825497 - ORDER PICKERS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.03.2017
Database last updated on 17.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LANDOLL ACQUISITION LLC
1900 North Street
Marysville KS 66508 / US
[2016/14]
Former [2015/04]For all designated states
Translift Bendi Limited
Unit 22 Padgets Lane South Moons Moat Redditch
Worcestershire B98 0RB / GB
Inventor(s)01 / OVERFIELD, Paul David
Hanson House, Mill Lane
Drakes Broughton, Worcestershire WR10 2AF / GB
02 / BROWN, Simon Mark
The Bridges House
London Lane
Tardebigge, Worcestershire B60 3AG / GB
 [2015/04]
Representative(s)Williams Powell
11 Staple Inn
London WC1V 7QH / GB
[N/P]
Former [2015/04]Watts, Peter Graham
Anthony Cundy & Co.
39/41 South Drive
Sutton Coldfield
West Midlands B75 7TE / GB
Application number, filing date13710514.408.03.2013
[2016/17]
WO2013GB00099
Priority number, dateGB2012000438712.03.2012         Original published format: GB 201204387
[2015/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013136036
Date:19.09.2013
Language:EN
[2013/38]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2825497
Date:21.01.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.09.2013
[2015/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2825497
Date:27.04.2016
Language:EN
[2016/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP19.09.2013
ClassificationInternational:B66F9/075, B66F11/04, B66F9/10
[2015/30]
Former International [2015/04]B66F9/10
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/04]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:BESTELLUNGSAUFNEHMER[2015/04]
English:ORDER PICKERS[2015/04]
French:PRÉPARATEURS DE COMMANDE[2015/04]
Entry into regional phase29.09.2014National basic fee paid 
29.09.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
29.09.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.09.2014Examination requested  [2015/04]
11.03.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
01.09.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.12.2015Fee for grant paid
21.12.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
21.12.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  01.09.2015
Opposition(s)30.01.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/14]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
09.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL27.04.2016
AT27.04.2016
BE27.04.2016
CZ27.04.2016
DK27.04.2016
EE27.04.2016
ES27.04.2016
FI27.04.2016
HR27.04.2016
IT27.04.2016
LT27.04.2016
LV27.04.2016
MC27.04.2016
NL27.04.2016
PL27.04.2016
RO27.04.2016
RS27.04.2016
SE27.04.2016
SI27.04.2016
SK27.04.2016
SM27.04.2016
NO27.07.2016
GR28.07.2016
PT29.08.2016
[2018/46]
Former [2018/01]AT27.04.2016
BE27.04.2016
CZ27.04.2016
DK27.04.2016
EE27.04.2016
ES27.04.2016
FI27.04.2016
HR27.04.2016
IT27.04.2016
LT27.04.2016
LV27.04.2016
MC27.04.2016
NL27.04.2016
PL27.04.2016
RO27.04.2016
RS27.04.2016
SE27.04.2016
SI27.04.2016
SK27.04.2016
SM27.04.2016
NO27.07.2016
GR28.07.2016
PT29.08.2016
Former [2017/37]AT27.04.2016
BE27.04.2016
CZ27.04.2016
DK27.04.2016
EE27.04.2016
ES27.04.2016
FI27.04.2016
HR27.04.2016
IT27.04.2016
LT27.04.2016
LV27.04.2016
NL27.04.2016
PL27.04.2016
RO27.04.2016
RS27.04.2016
SE27.04.2016
SI27.04.2016
SK27.04.2016
SM27.04.2016
NO27.07.2016
GR28.07.2016
PT29.08.2016
Former [2017/11]AT27.04.2016
BE27.04.2016
CZ27.04.2016
DK27.04.2016
EE27.04.2016
ES27.04.2016
FI27.04.2016
HR27.04.2016
IT27.04.2016
LT27.04.2016
LV27.04.2016
NL27.04.2016
PL27.04.2016
RO27.04.2016
RS27.04.2016
SE27.04.2016
SK27.04.2016
SM27.04.2016
NO27.07.2016
GR28.07.2016
PT29.08.2016
Former [2017/10]AT27.04.2016
BE27.04.2016
CZ27.04.2016
DK27.04.2016
EE27.04.2016
ES27.04.2016
FI27.04.2016
HR27.04.2016
IT27.04.2016
LT27.04.2016
LV27.04.2016
NL27.04.2016
PL27.04.2016
RO27.04.2016
RS27.04.2016
SE27.04.2016
SK27.04.2016
NO27.07.2016
GR28.07.2016
PT29.08.2016
Former [2017/09]AT27.04.2016
BE27.04.2016
CZ27.04.2016
DK27.04.2016
EE27.04.2016
ES27.04.2016
FI27.04.2016
HR27.04.2016
IT27.04.2016
LT27.04.2016
LV27.04.2016
NL27.04.2016
PL27.04.2016
RO27.04.2016
RS27.04.2016
SE27.04.2016
NO27.07.2016
GR28.07.2016
PT29.08.2016
Former [2017/07]AT27.04.2016
BE27.04.2016
DK27.04.2016
ES27.04.2016
FI27.04.2016
HR27.04.2016
IT27.04.2016
LT27.04.2016
LV27.04.2016
NL27.04.2016
PL27.04.2016
RS27.04.2016
SE27.04.2016
NO27.07.2016
GR28.07.2016
PT29.08.2016
Former [2017/03]AT27.04.2016
BE27.04.2016
ES27.04.2016
FI27.04.2016
HR27.04.2016
IT27.04.2016
LT27.04.2016
LV27.04.2016
NL27.04.2016
PL27.04.2016
RS27.04.2016
SE27.04.2016
NO27.07.2016
GR28.07.2016
PT29.08.2016
Former [2016/52]AT27.04.2016
ES27.04.2016
FI27.04.2016
HR27.04.2016
LT27.04.2016
LV27.04.2016
NL27.04.2016
PL27.04.2016
RS27.04.2016
SE27.04.2016
NO27.07.2016
GR28.07.2016
PT29.08.2016
Former [2016/51]AT27.04.2016
ES27.04.2016
FI27.04.2016
HR27.04.2016
LT27.04.2016
LV27.04.2016
NL27.04.2016
PL27.04.2016
RS27.04.2016
NO27.07.2016
GR28.07.2016
PT29.08.2016
Former [2016/50]AT27.04.2016
ES27.04.2016
FI27.04.2016
HR27.04.2016
LT27.04.2016
LV27.04.2016
NL27.04.2016
PL27.04.2016
RS27.04.2016
NO27.07.2016
Former [2016/49]FI27.04.2016
LT27.04.2016
NL27.04.2016
PL27.04.2016
NO27.07.2016
Former [2016/46]LT27.04.2016
NL27.04.2016
NO27.07.2016
Former [2016/44]NL27.04.2016
Cited inInternational search[Y]EP1314634  (TRANSLIFT ENGINEERING LTD [GB]) [Y] 1-6 * the whole document *;
 [Y]JPH08169694  (KOMATSU FORKLIFT) [Y] 1-6 * abstract *;
 [A]DE19817564  (STILL WAGNER GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]DE19749679  (STEINBOCK BOSS GMBH FOERDERTEC [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]DE202004007099U  (THEUERKAUF CHRISTIAN [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract *