Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2807301

EP2807301 - KNITTING METHOD FOR A FLAT KNITTING MACHINE AND FLAT KNITTING MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.11.2016
Database last updated on 21.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Steiger Participations SA
Route du Simplon 20
1895 Vionnaz / CH
[2014/49]
Inventor(s)01 / CHARNAVEL, François
Route des Bans 36
1921 MARTIGNY-CROIX / CH
02 / GALLEY, Emilien
Chemin du Petit Devin 18
1083 Mézières / CH
03 / MARTINS, Gabriel
Chemin Montaney 32
1892 Lavey-Village / CH
04 / PROST, Michel
Chemin du Vallon 53
1814 La Tour-de-Peilz / CH
 [2015/24]
Former [2014/49]01 / CHARNAVEL, François
Chemin d'Es-Cortaz 40
CH-1872 Troistorrents / CH
02 / GALLEY, Emilien
Chemin du Petit Devin 18
CH-1083 Mézières / CH
03 / MARTINS, Gabriel
Chemin Montaney 32
CH-1892 Lavey-Village / CH
04 / PROST, Michel
Chemin du Vallon 53
CH-1814 La Tour-de-Peilz / CH
Representative(s)Bugnion Genève
Bugnion S.A. Case Postale 375
1211 Genève 12 / CH
[2014/49]
Application number, filing date13710565.625.01.2013
[2016/01]
WO2013IB50648
Priority number, dateFR2012005076326.01.2012         Original published format: FR 1250763
[2014/49]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013111102
Date:01.08.2013
Language:EN
[2013/31]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2807301
Date:03.12.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.08.2013
[2014/49]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2807301
Date:30.12.2015
Language:EN
[2015/53]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP01.08.2013
ClassificationInternational:D04B7/20, D04B15/02
[2014/49]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/49]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:FLACHSTRICKVERFAHREN UND FLACHSTRICKMASCHINE[2015/38]
English:KNITTING METHOD FOR A FLAT KNITTING MACHINE AND FLAT KNITTING MACHINE[2014/49]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE TRICOTAGE POUR UN MÉTIER À TRICOTER RECTILIGNE ET MÉTIER À TRICOTER[2015/38]
Former [2014/49]STRICKMASCHINE FÜR FLACHSTRICKMASCHINE UND FLACHSTRICKMASCHINE
Former [2014/49]PROCÉDÉ DE TRICOTAGE POUR TRICOTEUSE RECTILIGNE, ET TRICOTEUSE RECTILIGNE
Entry into regional phase25.04.2014National basic fee paid 
25.04.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
25.04.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.04.2014Examination requested  [2014/49]
27.08.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.10.2015Fee for grant paid
30.10.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
30.10.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  27.08.2015
Opposition(s)03.10.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2016/49]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU25.01.2013
AL30.12.2015
AT30.12.2015
BE30.12.2015
BG30.12.2015
CY30.12.2015
CZ30.12.2015
DK30.12.2015
EE30.12.2015
ES30.12.2015
FI30.12.2015
HR30.12.2015
IT30.12.2015
LT30.12.2015
LV30.12.2015
MC30.12.2015
MK30.12.2015
NL30.12.2015
PL30.12.2015
RO30.12.2015
RS30.12.2015
SE30.12.2015
SI30.12.2015
SK30.12.2015
SM30.12.2015
TR30.12.2015
IE25.01.2016
LU25.01.2016
MT31.01.2016
FR29.02.2016
NO30.03.2016
GR31.03.2016
IS30.04.2016
PT02.05.2016
[2018/46]
Former [2018/45]HU25.01.2013
AT30.12.2015
BE30.12.2015
BG30.12.2015
CY30.12.2015
CZ30.12.2015
DK30.12.2015
EE30.12.2015
ES30.12.2015
FI30.12.2015
HR30.12.2015
IT30.12.2015
LT30.12.2015
LV30.12.2015
MC30.12.2015
MK30.12.2015
NL30.12.2015
PL30.12.2015
RO30.12.2015
RS30.12.2015
SE30.12.2015
SI30.12.2015
SK30.12.2015
SM30.12.2015
TR30.12.2015
IE25.01.2016
LU25.01.2016
MT31.01.2016
FR29.02.2016
NO30.03.2016
GR31.03.2016
IS30.04.2016
PT02.05.2016
Former [2018/38]HU25.01.2013
AT30.12.2015
BE30.12.2015
BG30.12.2015
CY30.12.2015
CZ30.12.2015
DK30.12.2015
EE30.12.2015
ES30.12.2015
FI30.12.2015
HR30.12.2015
IT30.12.2015
LT30.12.2015
LV30.12.2015
MC30.12.2015
MK30.12.2015
NL30.12.2015
PL30.12.2015
RO30.12.2015
RS30.12.2015
SE30.12.2015
SI30.12.2015
SK30.12.2015
SM30.12.2015
IE25.01.2016
LU25.01.2016
MT31.01.2016
FR29.02.2016
NO30.03.2016
GR31.03.2016
IS30.04.2016
PT02.05.2016
Former [2018/31]HU25.01.2013
AT30.12.2015
BE30.12.2015
CY30.12.2015
CZ30.12.2015
DK30.12.2015
EE30.12.2015
ES30.12.2015
FI30.12.2015
HR30.12.2015
IT30.12.2015
LT30.12.2015
LV30.12.2015
MC30.12.2015
MK30.12.2015
NL30.12.2015
PL30.12.2015
RO30.12.2015
RS30.12.2015
SE30.12.2015
SI30.12.2015
SK30.12.2015
SM30.12.2015
IE25.01.2016
LU25.01.2016
MT31.01.2016
FR29.02.2016
NO30.03.2016
GR31.03.2016
IS30.04.2016
PT02.05.2016
Former [2018/28]HU25.01.2013
AT30.12.2015
BE30.12.2015
CZ30.12.2015
DK30.12.2015
EE30.12.2015
ES30.12.2015
FI30.12.2015
HR30.12.2015
IT30.12.2015
LT30.12.2015
LV30.12.2015
MC30.12.2015
MK30.12.2015
MT30.12.2015
NL30.12.2015
PL30.12.2015
RO30.12.2015
RS30.12.2015
SE30.12.2015
SI30.12.2015
SK30.12.2015
SM30.12.2015
IE25.01.2016
LU25.01.2016
FR29.02.2016
NO30.03.2016
GR31.03.2016
IS30.04.2016
PT02.05.2016
Former [2017/47]AT30.12.2015
BE30.12.2015
CZ30.12.2015
DK30.12.2015
EE30.12.2015
ES30.12.2015
FI30.12.2015
HR30.12.2015
IT30.12.2015
LT30.12.2015
LV30.12.2015
MC30.12.2015
MT30.12.2015
NL30.12.2015
PL30.12.2015
RO30.12.2015
RS30.12.2015
SE30.12.2015
SI30.12.2015
SK30.12.2015
SM30.12.2015
IE25.01.2016
LU25.01.2016
FR29.02.2016
NO30.03.2016
GR31.03.2016
IS30.04.2016
PT02.05.2016
Former [2017/16]AT30.12.2015
BE30.12.2015
CZ30.12.2015
DK30.12.2015
EE30.12.2015
ES30.12.2015
FI30.12.2015
HR30.12.2015
IT30.12.2015
LT30.12.2015
LV30.12.2015
MC30.12.2015
NL30.12.2015
PL30.12.2015
RO30.12.2015
RS30.12.2015
SE30.12.2015
SI30.12.2015
SK30.12.2015
SM30.12.2015
IE25.01.2016
LU25.01.2016
FR29.02.2016
NO30.03.2016
GR31.03.2016
IS30.04.2016
PT02.05.2016
Former [2017/10]AT30.12.2015
BE30.12.2015
CZ30.12.2015
DK30.12.2015
EE30.12.2015
ES30.12.2015
FI30.12.2015
HR30.12.2015
IT30.12.2015
LT30.12.2015
LV30.12.2015
MC30.12.2015
NL30.12.2015
PL30.12.2015
RO30.12.2015
RS30.12.2015
SE30.12.2015
SK30.12.2015
SM30.12.2015
IE25.01.2016
LU25.01.2016
FR29.02.2016
NO30.03.2016
GR31.03.2016
IS30.04.2016
PT02.05.2016
Former [2017/07]AT30.12.2015
BE30.12.2015
CZ30.12.2015
DK30.12.2015
EE30.12.2015
ES30.12.2015
FI30.12.2015
HR30.12.2015
IT30.12.2015
LT30.12.2015
LV30.12.2015
MC30.12.2015
NL30.12.2015
PL30.12.2015
RO30.12.2015
RS30.12.2015
SE30.12.2015
SK30.12.2015
SM30.12.2015
IE25.01.2016
LU25.01.2016
NO30.03.2016
GR31.03.2016
IS30.04.2016
PT02.05.2016
Former [2017/03]AT30.12.2015
BE30.12.2015
CZ30.12.2015
DK30.12.2015
EE30.12.2015
ES30.12.2015
FI30.12.2015
HR30.12.2015
IT30.12.2015
LT30.12.2015
LV30.12.2015
MC30.12.2015
NL30.12.2015
PL30.12.2015
RO30.12.2015
RS30.12.2015
SE30.12.2015
SK30.12.2015
SM30.12.2015
LU25.01.2016
NO30.03.2016
GR31.03.2016
IS30.04.2016
PT02.05.2016
Former [2016/46]AT30.12.2015
CZ30.12.2015
DK30.12.2015
EE30.12.2015
ES30.12.2015
FI30.12.2015
HR30.12.2015
IT30.12.2015
LT30.12.2015
LV30.12.2015
MC30.12.2015
NL30.12.2015
PL30.12.2015
RO30.12.2015
RS30.12.2015
SE30.12.2015
SK30.12.2015
SM30.12.2015
LU25.01.2016
BE31.01.2016
NO30.03.2016
GR31.03.2016
IS30.04.2016
PT02.05.2016
Former [2016/42]AT30.12.2015
CZ30.12.2015
EE30.12.2015
ES30.12.2015
FI30.12.2015
HR30.12.2015
IT30.12.2015
LT30.12.2015
LV30.12.2015
MC30.12.2015
NL30.12.2015
PL30.12.2015
RO30.12.2015
RS30.12.2015
SE30.12.2015
SK30.12.2015
SM30.12.2015
LU25.01.2016
BE31.01.2016
NO30.03.2016
GR31.03.2016
IS30.04.2016
PT02.05.2016
Former [2016/39]AT30.12.2015
CZ30.12.2015
EE30.12.2015
ES30.12.2015
FI30.12.2015
HR30.12.2015
IT30.12.2015
LT30.12.2015
LV30.12.2015
NL30.12.2015
PL30.12.2015
RO30.12.2015
RS30.12.2015
SE30.12.2015
SK30.12.2015
SM30.12.2015
LU25.01.2016
BE31.01.2016
NO30.03.2016
GR31.03.2016
IS30.04.2016
PT02.05.2016
Former [2016/38]AT30.12.2015
CZ30.12.2015
EE30.12.2015
ES30.12.2015
FI30.12.2015
HR30.12.2015
IT30.12.2015
LT30.12.2015
LV30.12.2015
NL30.12.2015
PL30.12.2015
RO30.12.2015
RS30.12.2015
SE30.12.2015
SK30.12.2015
SM30.12.2015
BE31.01.2016
NO30.03.2016
GR31.03.2016
IS30.04.2016
PT02.05.2016
Former [2016/36]AT30.12.2015
CZ30.12.2015
EE30.12.2015
ES30.12.2015
FI30.12.2015
HR30.12.2015
IT30.12.2015
LT30.12.2015
LV30.12.2015
NL30.12.2015
PL30.12.2015
RO30.12.2015
RS30.12.2015
SE30.12.2015
SK30.12.2015
BE31.01.2016
NO30.03.2016
GR31.03.2016
Former [2016/35]CZ30.12.2015
ES30.12.2015
FI30.12.2015
HR30.12.2015
LT30.12.2015
LV30.12.2015
NL30.12.2015
RS30.12.2015
SE30.12.2015
BE31.01.2016
NO30.03.2016
GR31.03.2016
Former [2016/34]CZ30.12.2015
FI30.12.2015
HR30.12.2015
LT30.12.2015
LV30.12.2015
NL30.12.2015
RS30.12.2015
SE30.12.2015
BE31.01.2016
NO30.03.2016
GR31.03.2016
Former [2016/30]FI30.12.2015
HR30.12.2015
LT30.12.2015
LV30.12.2015
NL30.12.2015
RS30.12.2015
SE30.12.2015
BE31.01.2016
NO30.03.2016
GR31.03.2016
Former [2016/25]FI30.12.2015
HR30.12.2015
LT30.12.2015
LV30.12.2015
RS30.12.2015
SE30.12.2015
BE31.01.2016
NO30.03.2016
GR31.03.2016
Former [2016/24]FI30.12.2015
HR30.12.2015
LT30.12.2015
RS30.12.2015
SE30.12.2015
BE31.01.2016
NO30.03.2016
GR31.03.2016
Former [2016/23]HR30.12.2015
LT30.12.2015
RS30.12.2015
SE30.12.2015
NO30.03.2016
Former [2016/21]LT30.12.2015
NO30.03.2016
Former [2016/20]LT30.12.2015
Cited inInternational search[A]EP0362126  (STEIGER SA ATELIER CONSTR [CH]) [A] 1,8 * column 2, line 8 - column 4, line 14; figures 1-3; claims 1, 2 *;
 [A]FR1417908  (SCHIEBER UNIVERSAL MASCHF) [A] 1,8 * page 1, column 2, paragraph 6 - page 2, column 2, paragraph 1; figures 5-8; claim 1 *