Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2822458

EP2822458 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR PROCESSING SIGNALS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.11.2017
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  25.11.2016
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  21.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip15.11.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 18.12.2019  [2019/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Twente Medical Systems International B.V.
Zutphenstraat 57
7575 EJ Oldenzaal / NL
[2015/03]
Inventor(s)01 / PEUSCHER, Jan Hendrik
Holzikweg 50
7542 PD Enschede / NL
 [2016/52]
Former [2015/03]01 / PEUSCHER, Jan Hendrik
Holzikweg 50
NL-7542 PD Enschede / NL
Representative(s)V.O.
P.O. Box 87930
2508 DH Den Haag / NL
[2016/52]
Former [2015/03]Jansen, Cornelis Marinus , et al
V.O.
Johan de Wittlaan 7
2517 JR Den Haag / NL
Application number, filing date13710620.901.03.2013
[2016/52]
WO2013NL50130
Priority number, dateNL2012200844109.03.2012         Original published format: NL 2008441
[2015/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013133697
Date:12.09.2013
Language:EN
[2013/37]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2822458
Date:14.01.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.09.2013
[2015/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2822458
Date:28.12.2016
Language:EN
[2016/52]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP12.09.2013
ClassificationInternational:A61B5/04, H03F3/45
[2015/03]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/03]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR SIGNALVERARBEITUNG[2015/03]
English:APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR PROCESSING SIGNALS[2015/03]
French:APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT DE SIGNAUX[2015/03]
Entry into regional phase08.10.2014National basic fee paid 
08.10.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
08.10.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.10.2014Examination requested  [2015/03]
23.04.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.05.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
26.05.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.07.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.11.2016Fee for grant paid
17.11.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
17.11.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  04.05.2016
Opposition(s)29.09.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/49]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
29.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU01.03.2013
AT28.12.2016
BE28.12.2016
CY28.12.2016
CZ28.12.2016
DK28.12.2016
EE28.12.2016
ES28.12.2016
FI28.12.2016
HR28.12.2016
IT28.12.2016
LT28.12.2016
LV28.12.2016
MC28.12.2016
MK28.12.2016
NL28.12.2016
PL28.12.2016
RO28.12.2016
RS28.12.2016
SE28.12.2016
SI28.12.2016
SK28.12.2016
SM28.12.2016
IE01.03.2017
LU01.03.2017
MT01.03.2017
BG28.03.2017
NO28.03.2017
GR29.03.2017
CH31.03.2017
LI31.03.2017
IS28.04.2017
PT28.04.2017
[2019/51]
Former [2019/47]HU01.03.2013
AT28.12.2016
BE28.12.2016
CY28.12.2016
CZ28.12.2016
DK28.12.2016
EE28.12.2016
ES28.12.2016
FI28.12.2016
HR28.12.2016
IT28.12.2016
LT28.12.2016
LV28.12.2016
MC28.12.2016
NL28.12.2016
PL28.12.2016
RO28.12.2016
RS28.12.2016
SE28.12.2016
SI28.12.2016
SK28.12.2016
SM28.12.2016
IE01.03.2017
LU01.03.2017
MT01.03.2017
BG28.03.2017
NO28.03.2017
GR29.03.2017
CH31.03.2017
LI31.03.2017
IS28.04.2017
PT28.04.2017
Former [2019/31]HU01.03.2013
AT28.12.2016
BE28.12.2016
CZ28.12.2016
DK28.12.2016
EE28.12.2016
ES28.12.2016
FI28.12.2016
HR28.12.2016
IT28.12.2016
LT28.12.2016
LV28.12.2016
MC28.12.2016
NL28.12.2016
PL28.12.2016
RO28.12.2016
RS28.12.2016
SE28.12.2016
SI28.12.2016
SK28.12.2016
SM28.12.2016
IE01.03.2017
LU01.03.2017
MT01.03.2017
BG28.03.2017
NO28.03.2017
GR29.03.2017
CH31.03.2017
LI31.03.2017
IS28.04.2017
PT28.04.2017
Former [2018/43]AT28.12.2016
BE28.12.2016
CZ28.12.2016
DK28.12.2016
EE28.12.2016
ES28.12.2016
FI28.12.2016
HR28.12.2016
IT28.12.2016
LT28.12.2016
LV28.12.2016
MC28.12.2016
NL28.12.2016
PL28.12.2016
RO28.12.2016
RS28.12.2016
SE28.12.2016
SI28.12.2016
SK28.12.2016
SM28.12.2016
IE01.03.2017
LU01.03.2017
MT01.03.2017
BG28.03.2017
NO28.03.2017
GR29.03.2017
CH31.03.2017
LI31.03.2017
IS28.04.2017
PT28.04.2017
Former [2018/13]AT28.12.2016
BE28.12.2016
CZ28.12.2016
DK28.12.2016
EE28.12.2016
ES28.12.2016
FI28.12.2016
HR28.12.2016
IT28.12.2016
LT28.12.2016
LV28.12.2016
MC28.12.2016
NL28.12.2016
PL28.12.2016
RO28.12.2016
RS28.12.2016
SE28.12.2016
SI28.12.2016
SK28.12.2016
SM28.12.2016
IE01.03.2017
LU01.03.2017
BG28.03.2017
NO28.03.2017
GR29.03.2017
CH31.03.2017
LI31.03.2017
IS28.04.2017
PT28.04.2017
Former [2018/10]AT28.12.2016
BE28.12.2016
CZ28.12.2016
DK28.12.2016
EE28.12.2016
ES28.12.2016
FI28.12.2016
HR28.12.2016
IT28.12.2016
LT28.12.2016
LV28.12.2016
MC28.12.2016
NL28.12.2016
PL28.12.2016
RO28.12.2016
RS28.12.2016
SE28.12.2016
SK28.12.2016
SM28.12.2016
LU01.03.2017
BG28.03.2017
NO28.03.2017
GR29.03.2017
IS28.04.2017
PT28.04.2017
Former [2018/01]AT28.12.2016
BE28.12.2016
CZ28.12.2016
DK28.12.2016
EE28.12.2016
ES28.12.2016
FI28.12.2016
HR28.12.2016
IT28.12.2016
LT28.12.2016
LV28.12.2016
MC28.12.2016
NL28.12.2016
PL28.12.2016
RO28.12.2016
RS28.12.2016
SE28.12.2016
SK28.12.2016
SM28.12.2016
BG28.03.2017
NO28.03.2017
GR29.03.2017
IS28.04.2017
PT28.04.2017
Former [2017/41]AT28.12.2016
BE28.12.2016
CZ28.12.2016
EE28.12.2016
ES28.12.2016
FI28.12.2016
HR28.12.2016
IT28.12.2016
LT28.12.2016
LV28.12.2016
NL28.12.2016
PL28.12.2016
RO28.12.2016
RS28.12.2016
SE28.12.2016
SK28.12.2016
SM28.12.2016
BG28.03.2017
NO28.03.2017
GR29.03.2017
IS28.04.2017
PT28.04.2017
Former [2017/36]BE28.12.2016
CZ28.12.2016
EE28.12.2016
ES28.12.2016
FI28.12.2016
HR28.12.2016
LT28.12.2016
LV28.12.2016
NL28.12.2016
PL28.12.2016
RO28.12.2016
RS28.12.2016
SE28.12.2016
SK28.12.2016
NO28.03.2017
GR29.03.2017
IS28.04.2017
Former [2017/34]CZ28.12.2016
FI28.12.2016
HR28.12.2016
LT28.12.2016
LV28.12.2016
NL28.12.2016
RS28.12.2016
SE28.12.2016
NO28.03.2017
GR29.03.2017
Former [2017/31]FI28.12.2016
HR28.12.2016
LT28.12.2016
LV28.12.2016
NL28.12.2016
RS28.12.2016
SE28.12.2016
NO28.03.2017
GR29.03.2017
Former [2017/28]FI28.12.2016
HR28.12.2016
LT28.12.2016
LV28.12.2016
RS28.12.2016
SE28.12.2016
NO28.03.2017
GR29.03.2017
Former [2017/12]LV28.12.2016
Cited inInternational search[I]WO2009017413  (TWENTE MEDICAL SYSTEMS INTERNA [NL], et al) [I] 1-17 * figures 4,5 * * page 10, line 17 - line 27 * * page 12, line 7 - line 13 * * page 13, line 27 - page 17, line 4 * * page 17, line 7 - line 8 *;
 [A]US5205294  (FLACH TERRY E [US], et al) [A] 1 * figure 5 * * column 9, line 43 - column 10, line 8 *;
 [A]WO2008080008  (EMOTIV SYSTEMS PTY LTD [AU], et al) [A] 1 * figure 1 * * paragraphs [0036] - [0038] *;
 [A]  - RIEGER R ET AL, "A bio-signal amplifier system with very-large dynamic-range", TENCON 2007 - 2007 IEEE REGION 10 CONFERENCE, IEEE, PI, (20071030), ISBN 978-1-4244-1271-6, pages 1 - 4, XP031226196 [A] 1 * figure 4 * * page 2 *
 [A]  - WJATSCHESLAW GALJAN ET AL, "Highly sensitive biomedical amplifier with CMRR calibration and DC-offset compensation", EUROCON 2009, EUROCON '09. IEEE, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20090518), ISBN 978-1-4244-3860-0, pages 152 - 155, XP031491839 [A] 1 * figure 1 * * page 153 *
by applicantWO2009017413
 US5205294
 WO2008080008
    - ROBERT RIEGER ET AL., "A Bio-Signal Amplifier System with Very-Large Dynamic-Range", TENCON 2007 IEEE REGION 10 CONFERENCE, IEEE, (20071030), pages 1 - 4, XP031201151
    - "Highly sensitive biomedical amplifier with CMRR calibration and DC-offset compensation", EUROCON 2009, IEEE, PISCATAWAY NJ USA, (20090518), pages 152 - 155