Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2812514

EP2812514 - SUSPENSION CONNECTOR SYSTEM CONFIGURED FOR USE WITH SUSPENDED SCAFFOLDING, AND RELATED METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.02.2018
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  03.03.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  24.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip28.09.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 31.10.2018  [2018/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Safway Services, LLC
N19 W24200 Riverwood Drive
Waukesha, WI 53188 / US
[2014/51]
Inventor(s)01 / GRUMBERG, Mathieu
47 Douglas Road
Delmar, NY 12054 / US
02 / SCRAFFORD, Roy
151 Willow Lane
Scotia, NY 12302 / US
 [2014/51]
Representative(s)Rupprecht, Kay
Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte
Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Widenmayerstraße 47
80538 München / DE
[2017/14]
Former [2014/51]Rupprecht, Kay
Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR
Widenmayerstraße 47
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date13710637.307.02.2013
[2017/14]
WO2013US25178
Priority number, dateUS201261596341P08.02.2012         Original published format: US 201261596341 P
[2014/51]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013119836
Date:15.08.2013
Language:EN
[2013/33]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2812514
Date:17.12.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.08.2013
[2014/51]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2812514
Date:05.04.2017
Language:EN
[2017/14]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP15.08.2013
ClassificationInternational:B23P11/00, F16M13/00, E04G3/30, E04G5/04, F16M13/02
[2016/40]
Former International [2014/51]E04G3/30, E04G5/04, E04G3/20
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/51]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:SUSPENSIONSVERBINDUNGSSYSTEM ZUR VERWENDUNG MIT EINER HÄNGEGERÜSTKONSTRUKTION UND ZUGEHÖRIGE VERFAHREN[2014/51]
English:SUSPENSION CONNECTOR SYSTEM CONFIGURED FOR USE WITH SUSPENDED SCAFFOLDING, AND RELATED METHODS[2014/51]
French:SYSTÈME RACCORD À SUSPENSION CONÇU POUR ÊTRE UTILISÉ AVEC ÉCHAFAUDAGE SUSPENDU, ET PROCÉDÉS CONNEXES[2014/51]
Entry into regional phase08.09.2014National basic fee paid 
08.09.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
08.09.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.09.2014Examination requested  [2014/51]
24.02.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.05.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.05.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.07.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.10.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.02.2017Fee for grant paid
22.02.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
22.02.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  04.05.2016
Opposition(s)08.01.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/11]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
26.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
27.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT05.04.2017
CZ05.04.2017
EE05.04.2017
ES05.04.2017
FI05.04.2017
HR05.04.2017
IT05.04.2017
LT05.04.2017
LV05.04.2017
MC05.04.2017
RO05.04.2017
RS05.04.2017
SI05.04.2017
SK05.04.2017
SM05.04.2017
BG05.07.2017
GR06.07.2017
IS05.08.2017
[2018/44]
Former [2018/25]AT05.04.2017
CZ05.04.2017
EE05.04.2017
ES05.04.2017
FI05.04.2017
HR05.04.2017
IT05.04.2017
LT05.04.2017
LV05.04.2017
RO05.04.2017
RS05.04.2017
SI05.04.2017
SK05.04.2017
SM05.04.2017
BG05.07.2017
GR06.07.2017
IS05.08.2017
Former [2018/11]AT05.04.2017
CZ05.04.2017
EE05.04.2017
ES05.04.2017
FI05.04.2017
HR05.04.2017
IT05.04.2017
LT05.04.2017
LV05.04.2017
RO05.04.2017
RS05.04.2017
SK05.04.2017
SM05.04.2017
BG05.07.2017
GR06.07.2017
IS05.08.2017
Former [2018/10]AT05.04.2017
CZ05.04.2017
EE05.04.2017
ES05.04.2017
FI05.04.2017
HR05.04.2017
LT05.04.2017
LV05.04.2017
RO05.04.2017
RS05.04.2017
SK05.04.2017
BG05.07.2017
GR06.07.2017
IS05.08.2017
Former [2018/09]AT05.04.2017
EE05.04.2017
ES05.04.2017
FI05.04.2017
HR05.04.2017
LT05.04.2017
LV05.04.2017
RS05.04.2017
BG05.07.2017
GR06.07.2017
IS05.08.2017
Former [2017/50]AT05.04.2017
ES05.04.2017
FI05.04.2017
HR05.04.2017
LT05.04.2017
LV05.04.2017
RS05.04.2017
BG05.07.2017
GR06.07.2017
IS05.08.2017
Former [2017/49]AT05.04.2017
ES05.04.2017
FI05.04.2017
HR05.04.2017
LT05.04.2017
GR06.07.2017
IS05.08.2017
Cited inInternational search[XA]WO8201026  (STAELLNINGSGRUPPEN GOETEBORG A [SE]; WALLTHER H [SE]) [X] 1-8,13-15,17,18 * page 2, line 19 - page 3, line 10; figures 1-5 * * page 3, line 28 - page 4, line 22 * * page 5, line 3 - line 9 * * page 5, line 23 - line 26 * * page 6, line 15 - line 20 * * page 8, line 24 - page 9, line 31 * * page 14, line 2 - line 15 * [A] 9-12,16,19-25;
 [X]GB1461651  (PETREN R) [X] 1,13 * page 2, line 50 - line 59; figure 3a * * page 2, line 109 - line 117 * * page 3, line 25 - line 26 * * page 3, line 71 - line 82 *;
 [A]US4421205  (VRANISH JOHN M [US] ET AL) [A] 1-25 * figure 2 *;
 [A]US2002066398  (PETSCHKE CHRISTIAN [DE] ET AL) [A] 1-25 * figure 2 *