Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2813004

EP2813004 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR ENHANCING RESOURCE ALLOCATION FOR UPLINK MIMO COMMUNICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  15.08.2019
Database last updated on 20.11.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  03.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip15.08.2019New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Qualcomm Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121 / US
[2014/51]
Inventor(s)01 / ZHANG, Danlu
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121 / US
02 / SAMBHWANI, Sharad Deepak
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121 / US
03 / BHARADWAJ, Arjun
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121 / US
04 / AGARWAL, Ravi
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121 / US
05 / AKKARAKARAN, Sony J.
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121 / US
 [2014/51]
Representative(s)Dunlop, Hugh Christopher , et al
Maucher Jenkins
26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/51]Dunlop, Hugh Christopher , et al
RGC Jenkins & Co.
26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
Application number, filing date13710638.108.02.2013
WO2013US25338
Priority number, dateUS201261596682P08.02.2012         Original published format: US 201261596682 P
US201261612541P19.03.2012         Original published format: US 201261612541 P
US201261646241P11.05.2012         Original published format: US 201261646241 P
US20131376056106.02.2013         Original published format: US201313760561
[2014/51]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013119944
Date:15.08.2013
Language:EN
[2013/33]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2813004
Date:17.12.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.08.2013
[2014/51]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP15.08.2013
ClassificationInternational:H04B7/0413, H04L1/00, H04W72/12, H04L5/00
[2019/35]
Former International [2014/51]H04B7/04, H04L1/00, H04W72/12, H04W52/12, H04W52/14
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/51]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR VERBESSERUNG DER RESSOURCENZUWEISUNG FÜR UPLINK-MIMO-KOMMUNIKATION[2014/51]
English:METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR ENHANCING RESOURCE ALLOCATION FOR UPLINK MIMO COMMUNICATION[2014/51]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL POUR AMÉLIORER UNE ALLOCATION DE RESSOURCES POUR DES COMMUNICATIONS MIMO SUR LA LIAISON MONTANTE[2014/51]
Entry into regional phase08.07.2014National basic fee paid 
08.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
08.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/51]
05.02.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.11.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.03.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.11.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.03.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.08.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  03.11.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
08.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
07.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
07.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
08.02.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Cited inInternational search[A]WO2010051513  (INTERDIGITAL PATENT HOLDINGS [US], et al) [A] 3-6,10-13,17-20,24-27 * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0051] *;
 [X]US2010238825  (ZHANG DANLU [US], et al) [X] 29,32,35,38,41,44,47,50 * paragraphs [0008] , [0010] , [0029] , [0031] , [0077]; figures 2,4 *
 [XI]  - "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Radio Access Network; Uplink MIMO for HSPA (Release 11)", 3GPP STANDARD; 3GPP TR 25.871, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20110908), vol. RAN WG1, no. V2.0.0, pages 1 - 42, XP050553762 [X] 1,2,7-9,14-16,21-23,28 * pages 8-10,15 - page 17 * [I] 3-6,10-13,17-20,24-27
 [A]  - "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Radio Access Network; Medium Access Control (MAC) protocol specification (Release 10)", 3GPP STANDARD; 3GPP TS 25.321, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20110624), vol. RAN WG2, no. V10.3.0, pages 1 - 198, XP050553511 [A] 1-28 * pages 11,92,93 * * page 146 - page 155 *
 [XI]  - QUALCOMM INCORPORATED, "Uplink Power Control Design for UL MIMO", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-110133_UPLINK_POWER_CONTROL_DESIGN_UL_MIMO, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20110111), vol. RAN WG1, no. Dublin, Ireland; 20110117, XP050490088 [X] 29,30,32,33,35,36,38,39,41,42,44,45,47,48,50,51 * page 3 * [I] 31,34,37,40,43,46,49,52