Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2823029

EP2823029 - DETERGENT COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING GRAFT POLYMERS HAVING BROAD POLARITY DISTRIBUTIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  06.02.2017
Database last updated on 13.11.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.09.2018Refusal of applicationpublished on 24.10.2018  [2018/43]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Procter & Gamble Company
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US
[2015/03]
Inventor(s)01 / HULSKOTTER, Frank
Im Nonnengarten 11
67098 Bad Duerkheim / DE
02 / REES, Darren
167 Cloverfield
West Allotment
Newcastle Upon Tyne NE27 0BU / GB
03 / LOUGHNANE, Brian Joseph
F&HC INNOVATION CENTER
5299 Spring Grove Avenue
St. Bernard, Ohio 45217 / US
04 / EL-TOUFAILI, Faissal-Ali
An der Froschlache 19
67063 Ludwigshafen / DE
05 / DOBRAWA, Rainer Anton
Hunsrueckstrasse21
70469 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [2015/03]01 / HULSKOTTER, Frank
Im Nonnengarten 11
67098 Bad Duerkheim / DE
02 / REES, Darren
167 Cloverfield
West Allotment
Newcastle Upon Tyne NE27 0BU / GB
03 / LOUGHNANE, Brian Joseph
5516 Lake Michigan Drive
Fairfield, Ohio 45014 / US
04 / EL-TOUFAILI, Faissal-Ali
An der Froschlache 19
67063 Ludwigshafen / DE
05 / DOBRAWA, Rainer Anton
Hunsrueckstrasse21
70469 Stuttgart / DE
Representative(s)Peet, Jillian Wendy
Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Limited
Whitley Road
Longbenton
Newcastle upon Tyne
NE12 9TS / GB
[2015/03]
Application number, filing date13710756.108.03.2013
WO2013US29781
Priority number, dateUS201261608900P09.03.2012         Original published format: US 201261608900 P
[2015/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013134601
Date:12.09.2013
Language:EN
[2013/37]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2823029
Date:14.01.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.09.2013
[2015/03]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP12.09.2013
ClassificationInternational:C11D3/37
[2015/03]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/03]
TitleGerman:WASCHMITTELZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN MIT PFROPFPOLYMEREN MIT BREITEN POLARITÄTSVERTEILUNGEN[2015/03]
English:DETERGENT COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING GRAFT POLYMERS HAVING BROAD POLARITY DISTRIBUTIONS[2015/03]
French:COMPOSITIONS DÉTERGENTES COMPRENANT DES POLYMÈRES GREFFÉS AYANT UNE LARGE DISTRIBUTION DE POLARITÉ[2015/03]
Entry into regional phase06.08.2014National basic fee paid 
06.08.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
06.08.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.08.2014Examination requested  [2015/03]
09.04.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
22.09.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
04.05.2017Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
12.07.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.05.2018Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 21.06.2018
06.06.2018Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2018/43]
16.06.2018Application refused, date of legal effect [2018/43]
21.06.2018Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  22.09.2016
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
12.07.2017Request for further processing filed
12.07.2017Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
01.08.2017Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
08.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
07.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
13.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
Cited inInternational search[X]US2006270582  (BOECKH DIETER [DE] ET AL) [X] 1-12 * paragraphs [0010] , [0 11] , [0 16] , [0 69] , [0 98] , [0 17]; examples 1-3; claim - *;
 [XD]WO2007138053  (BASF AG [DE]; BOECKH DIETER [DE]; HERRERA TABOADA LIDCAY [BE]; KAVARNO) [XD] 1-12 * graft polymers 1 and 4;; examples 7-9; claims 1-13 *;
 [A]WO9522593  (UNILEVER PLC [GB]; UNILEVER NV [NL]) [A] 1-12 * example -; claim - *