Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2828794

EP2828794 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR EVALUATING THE RESULTS OF EYE TRACKING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2015/05]METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR EVALUATING RESULTS OF GAZE DETECTION
[2016/31]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.11.2017
Database last updated on 17.06.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  02.12.2016
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  25.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip21.09.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MT
published on 24.10.2018  [2018/43]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SensoMotoric Instruments Gesellschaft für innovative Sensorik mbH
Warthestrasse 21
14513 Teltow / DE
[2015/05]
Inventor(s)01 / WILLIAMS, Denis
Waldemarstraße 44
13156 Berlin / DE
02 / HOFFMANN, Jan
Wendemarken 136
14532 Kleinmachnow / DE
 [2015/21]
Former [2015/05]01 / WILLIAMS, Denis
Waldemarstraße 44
13156 Berlin / DE
02 / HOFFMANN, Jan
Prinz-Handjery-Straße 9
14167 Berlin / DE
Representative(s)Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Joachimsthaler Straße 10-12
10719 Berlin / DE
[N/P]
Former [2017/01]Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Joachimsthaler Straße 12
10719 Berlin / DE
Former [2015/05]Pfenning, Meinig & Partner GbR
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Joachimstaler Strasse 12
10719 Berlin / DE
Application number, filing date13710873.421.03.2013
[2017/01]
WO2013EP55953
Priority number, dateEP2012016087822.03.2012         Original published format: EP 12160878
[2015/05]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013139919
Date:26.09.2013
Language:DE
[2013/39]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2828794
Date:28.01.2015
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.09.2013
[2015/05]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2828794
Date:04.01.2017
Language:DE
[2017/01]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP26.09.2013
ClassificationInternational:G06K9/00
[2015/05]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/05]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM AUSWERTEN VON ERGEBNISSEN EINER BLICKERFASSUNG[2015/05]
English:METHOD AND DEVICE FOR EVALUATING THE RESULTS OF EYE TRACKING[2016/31]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF D'ÉVALUATION DES RÉSULTATS D'UN ENREGISTREMENT DE VUE[2016/31]
Former [2015/05]METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR EVALUATING RESULTS OF GAZE DETECTION
Former [2015/05]PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DESTINÉS À ANALYSER LES RÉSULTATS D'UN SYSTÈME DE DÉTECTION DU REGARD
Entry into regional phase22.09.2014National basic fee paid 
22.09.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
22.09.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.09.2014Examination requested  [2015/05]
29.04.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
10.07.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.11.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.06.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
15.06.2016Date of oral proceedings
16.06.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.07.2016Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
13.07.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.11.2016Fee for grant paid
18.11.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
18.11.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP16199536.0  / EP3168783
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  10.07.2015
Opposition(s)05.10.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/50]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
24.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCZ04.01.2017
DK04.01.2017
EE04.01.2017
ES04.01.2017
FI04.01.2017
HR04.01.2017
IT04.01.2017
LT04.01.2017
LV04.01.2017
MC04.01.2017
MT04.01.2017
NL04.01.2017
PL04.01.2017
RO04.01.2017
RS04.01.2017
SE04.01.2017
SI04.01.2017
SK04.01.2017
SM04.01.2017
IE21.03.2017
LU21.03.2017
BE31.03.2017
CH31.03.2017
LI31.03.2017
BG04.04.2017
NO04.04.2017
GR05.04.2017
IS04.05.2017
PT04.05.2017
[2018/43]
Former [2018/24]CZ04.01.2017
DK04.01.2017
EE04.01.2017
ES04.01.2017
FI04.01.2017
HR04.01.2017
IT04.01.2017
LT04.01.2017
LV04.01.2017
MC04.01.2017
NL04.01.2017
PL04.01.2017
RO04.01.2017
RS04.01.2017
SE04.01.2017
SI04.01.2017
SK04.01.2017
SM04.01.2017
IE21.03.2017
LU21.03.2017
BE31.03.2017
CH31.03.2017
LI31.03.2017
BG04.04.2017
NO04.04.2017
GR05.04.2017
IS04.05.2017
PT04.05.2017
Former [2018/13]CZ04.01.2017
DK04.01.2017
EE04.01.2017
ES04.01.2017
FI04.01.2017
HR04.01.2017
IT04.01.2017
LT04.01.2017
LV04.01.2017
MC04.01.2017
NL04.01.2017
PL04.01.2017
RO04.01.2017
RS04.01.2017
SE04.01.2017
SI04.01.2017
SK04.01.2017
SM04.01.2017
IE21.03.2017
LU21.03.2017
CH31.03.2017
LI31.03.2017
BG04.04.2017
NO04.04.2017
GR05.04.2017
IS04.05.2017
PT04.05.2017
Former [2018/10]CZ04.01.2017
DK04.01.2017
EE04.01.2017
ES04.01.2017
FI04.01.2017
HR04.01.2017
IT04.01.2017
LT04.01.2017
LV04.01.2017
MC04.01.2017
NL04.01.2017
PL04.01.2017
RO04.01.2017
RS04.01.2017
SE04.01.2017
SK04.01.2017
SM04.01.2017
LU21.03.2017
BG04.04.2017
NO04.04.2017
GR05.04.2017
IS04.05.2017
PT04.05.2017
Former [2017/51]CZ04.01.2017
DK04.01.2017
EE04.01.2017
ES04.01.2017
FI04.01.2017
HR04.01.2017
IT04.01.2017
LT04.01.2017
LV04.01.2017
MC04.01.2017
NL04.01.2017
PL04.01.2017
RO04.01.2017
RS04.01.2017
SE04.01.2017
SK04.01.2017
SM04.01.2017
BG04.04.2017
NO04.04.2017
GR05.04.2017
IS04.05.2017
PT04.05.2017
Former [2017/50]CZ04.01.2017
DK04.01.2017
EE04.01.2017
ES04.01.2017
FI04.01.2017
HR04.01.2017
IT04.01.2017
LT04.01.2017
LV04.01.2017
MC04.01.2017
NL04.01.2017
PL04.01.2017
RO04.01.2017
RS04.01.2017
SE04.01.2017
SK04.01.2017
BG04.04.2017
NO04.04.2017
GR05.04.2017
IS04.05.2017
PT04.05.2017
Former [2017/49]CZ04.01.2017
EE04.01.2017
ES04.01.2017
FI04.01.2017
HR04.01.2017
IT04.01.2017
LT04.01.2017
LV04.01.2017
NL04.01.2017
PL04.01.2017
RO04.01.2017
RS04.01.2017
SE04.01.2017
SK04.01.2017
BG04.04.2017
NO04.04.2017
GR05.04.2017
IS04.05.2017
PT04.05.2017
Former [2017/48]CZ04.01.2017
ES04.01.2017
FI04.01.2017
HR04.01.2017
LT04.01.2017
LV04.01.2017
NL04.01.2017
PL04.01.2017
RS04.01.2017
SE04.01.2017
BG04.04.2017
NO04.04.2017
GR05.04.2017
IS04.05.2017
PT04.05.2017
Former [2017/40]ES04.01.2017
FI04.01.2017
HR04.01.2017
LT04.01.2017
LV04.01.2017
NL04.01.2017
PL04.01.2017
RS04.01.2017
SE04.01.2017
BG04.04.2017
NO04.04.2017
GR05.04.2017
IS04.05.2017
PT04.05.2017
Cited inInternational search[X]  - R. VAN DER LANS ET AL., "Competitive Brand Salience", MARKETING SCIENCE, (200809), vol. 27, no. 5, doi:10.1287/mksc1070.0327, ISSN 0732-2399, pages 922 - 931, XP002683199 [X] 1-17 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1287/mksc.1070.0327
 [X]  - RAJASHEKAR U ET AL, "GAFFE: A Gaze-Attentive Fixation Finding Engine", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON IMAGE PROCESSING, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (20080401), vol. 17, no. 4, doi:10.1109/TIP.2008.917218, ISSN 1057-7149, pages 564 - 573, XP011225204 [X] 1-3,5,9,10,17 * page 564 - page 570; figures 2,4 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TIP.2008.917218
 [X]  - HENNESSEY C ET AL, "Fixation Precision in High-Speed Noncontact Eye-Gaze Tracking", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON SYSTEMS, MAN AND CYBERNETICS. PART B:CYBERNETICS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (20080401), vol. 38, no. 2, doi:10.1109/TSMCB.2007.911378, ISSN 1083-4419, pages 289 - 298, XP011344902 [X] 1,5,9,17 * page 295 - page 297; figures 7,8 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TSMCB.2007.911378
 [X]  - Michael Letchford, "Eye tracking in shopper insights - how does it work?", (20100906), Insights in Retail, URL: http://www.insightsinretail.com/biometrics-in-consumer-research/eye-tracking-does-it-improve-shopper-insights/, (20120911), XP002683200 [X] 1,9 * page 1 - page 2; figure 1 *
 [A]  - CONSTANTIN A. ROTHKOPF AND JEFF B. PELZ, "Head movement estimation for wearable eye tracker", ACM, 2 PENN PLAZA, SUITE 701 - NEW YORK USA, (20040101), pages 123 - 129, XP040174042 [A] 1,4,8,9,14 * pages 123,126 - page 127; figure 3 *
 [A]  - WEDEL, M. AND PIETERS, R., "Eye Fixations on Advertisements and Memory for Brands: A Model and Findings", MARKETING SCIENCE, (200010), vol. 19, no. 4, doi:10.1287/mksc.19.4.297.11794, ISSN 0732-2399, pages 297 - 312, XP008161856 [A] 1-17 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1287/mksc.19.4.297.11794
by applicantUS6711293