Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2825399

EP2825399 - THICK TREAD FOR CIVIL ENGINEERING TYRES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.02.2017
Database last updated on 19.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Compagnie Générale des Etablissements Michelin
12 Cours Sablon
63000 Clermont-Ferrand / FR
For all designated states
MICHELIN Recherche et Technique S.A.
Route Louis Braille 10
1763 Granges-Paccot / CH
[2015/04]
Inventor(s)01 / CHAUVIN, Dominique
Manufacture Française des Pneumatiques Michelin
23 place des Carmes-Dechaux
DGD/LG/PI-F35-LADOUX
F-63040 Clermont-Ferrand Cedex 9 / FR
 [2015/04]
Representative(s)Diernaz, Christian
Manufacture Française des
Pneumatiques Michelin
CBS/CORP/J/PI - F35 - Ladoux
23, place des Carmes-Déchaux
63040 Clermont-Ferrand Cedex 9 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2015/04]Diernaz, Christian
M. F. P. Michelin
23, place des Carmes Dechaux
DGD/PI-F35-Ladoux
63040 Clermont-Ferrand Cedex 09 / FR
Application number, filing date13710980.722.02.2013
[2016/16]
WO2013EP53537
Priority number, dateFR2012005236815.03.2012         Original published format: FR 1252368
[2015/04]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013135473
Date:19.09.2013
Language:FR
[2013/38]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2825399
Date:21.01.2015
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.09.2013
[2015/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2825399
Date:20.04.2016
Language:FR
[2016/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP19.09.2013
ClassificationInternational:B60C11/04, B60C11/13
[2015/04]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/04]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:DICKE LAUFFLÄCHE FÜR REIFEN ZIVILER BAUFAHRZEUGE[2015/04]
English:THICK TREAD FOR CIVIL ENGINEERING TYRES[2015/04]
French:BANDE DE ROULEMENT DE GRANDE ÉPAISSEUR POUR PNEU DE GÉNIE CIVIL[2015/04]
Entry into regional phase15.10.2014National basic fee paid 
15.10.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
15.10.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.10.2014Examination requested  [2015/04]
30.11.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.02.2016Fee for grant paid
05.02.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
05.02.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  30.11.2015
Opposition(s)23.01.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/13]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
29.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL20.04.2016
AT20.04.2016
CZ20.04.2016
DK20.04.2016
EE20.04.2016
ES20.04.2016
FI20.04.2016
HR20.04.2016
IT20.04.2016
LT20.04.2016
LV20.04.2016
MC20.04.2016
MT20.04.2016
PL20.04.2016
RO20.04.2016
RS20.04.2016
SE20.04.2016
SI20.04.2016
SK20.04.2016
SM20.04.2016
NO20.07.2016
GR21.07.2016
PT22.08.2016
[2018/46]
Former [2018/43]AT20.04.2016
CZ20.04.2016
DK20.04.2016
EE20.04.2016
ES20.04.2016
FI20.04.2016
HR20.04.2016
IT20.04.2016
LT20.04.2016
LV20.04.2016
MC20.04.2016
MT20.04.2016
PL20.04.2016
RO20.04.2016
RS20.04.2016
SE20.04.2016
SI20.04.2016
SK20.04.2016
SM20.04.2016
NO20.07.2016
GR21.07.2016
PT22.08.2016
Former [2017/48]AT20.04.2016
CZ20.04.2016
DK20.04.2016
EE20.04.2016
ES20.04.2016
FI20.04.2016
HR20.04.2016
IT20.04.2016
LT20.04.2016
LV20.04.2016
MC20.04.2016
PL20.04.2016
RO20.04.2016
RS20.04.2016
SE20.04.2016
SI20.04.2016
SK20.04.2016
SM20.04.2016
NO20.07.2016
GR21.07.2016
PT22.08.2016
Former [2017/37]AT20.04.2016
CZ20.04.2016
DK20.04.2016
EE20.04.2016
ES20.04.2016
FI20.04.2016
HR20.04.2016
IT20.04.2016
LT20.04.2016
LV20.04.2016
PL20.04.2016
RO20.04.2016
RS20.04.2016
SE20.04.2016
SI20.04.2016
SK20.04.2016
SM20.04.2016
NO20.07.2016
GR21.07.2016
PT22.08.2016
Former [2017/11]AT20.04.2016
CZ20.04.2016
DK20.04.2016
EE20.04.2016
ES20.04.2016
FI20.04.2016
HR20.04.2016
IT20.04.2016
LT20.04.2016
LV20.04.2016
PL20.04.2016
RO20.04.2016
RS20.04.2016
SE20.04.2016
SK20.04.2016
SM20.04.2016
NO20.07.2016
GR21.07.2016
PT22.08.2016
Former [2017/10]AT20.04.2016
CZ20.04.2016
DK20.04.2016
EE20.04.2016
ES20.04.2016
FI20.04.2016
HR20.04.2016
IT20.04.2016
LT20.04.2016
LV20.04.2016
PL20.04.2016
RO20.04.2016
RS20.04.2016
SE20.04.2016
SK20.04.2016
NO20.07.2016
GR21.07.2016
PT22.08.2016
Former [2017/09]AT20.04.2016
CZ20.04.2016
DK20.04.2016
EE20.04.2016
ES20.04.2016
FI20.04.2016
HR20.04.2016
IT20.04.2016
LT20.04.2016
LV20.04.2016
PL20.04.2016
RO20.04.2016
RS20.04.2016
SE20.04.2016
NO20.07.2016
GR21.07.2016
PT22.08.2016
Former [2017/07]AT20.04.2016
DK20.04.2016
ES20.04.2016
FI20.04.2016
HR20.04.2016
IT20.04.2016
LT20.04.2016
LV20.04.2016
PL20.04.2016
RS20.04.2016
SE20.04.2016
NO20.07.2016
GR21.07.2016
PT22.08.2016
Former [2017/04]AT20.04.2016
ES20.04.2016
FI20.04.2016
HR20.04.2016
IT20.04.2016
LT20.04.2016
LV20.04.2016
PL20.04.2016
RS20.04.2016
SE20.04.2016
NO20.07.2016
GR21.07.2016
PT22.08.2016
Former [2016/52]AT20.04.2016
ES20.04.2016
FI20.04.2016
HR20.04.2016
LT20.04.2016
LV20.04.2016
PL20.04.2016
RS20.04.2016
SE20.04.2016
NO20.07.2016
GR21.07.2016
PT22.08.2016
Former [2016/51]AT20.04.2016
ES20.04.2016
FI20.04.2016
HR20.04.2016
LT20.04.2016
LV20.04.2016
PL20.04.2016
RS20.04.2016
NO20.07.2016
GR21.07.2016
PT22.08.2016
Former [2016/50]AT20.04.2016
ES20.04.2016
FI20.04.2016
HR20.04.2016
LT20.04.2016
LV20.04.2016
PL20.04.2016
RS20.04.2016
NO20.07.2016
Former [2016/49]FI20.04.2016
LT20.04.2016
PL20.04.2016
NO20.07.2016
Former [2016/46]LT20.04.2016
NO20.07.2016
Cited inInternational search[A]EP1759890  (BRIDGESTONE CORP [JP]) [A] 1 * figures 1-8 *;
 [AD]US4320790  (CORNER MICHAEL R, et al) [AD] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP1454768  (CONTINENTAL AG [DE]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0018]; figure 1 *;
 [A]FR2961744  (MICHELIN SOC TECH [FR], et al) [A] 1 * paragraph [0063]; figure 3 *
by applicantUS4320790