Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: WO2013132259

WO2013132259 - GRAPHENE AND GRAPHENE OXIDE AEROGELS/XEROGELS FOR CO2 CAPTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  06.11.2015
Database last updated on 25.03.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip06.11.2015PCT data prior to European publication 
06.11.2015Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 09.12.2015  [2015/50]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Bio Nano Centre Limited
338 Euston Road
London NW1 3BT / GB
For all designated states
King Abdulaziz University
PO Box 80203
Jeddah 21589 / SA
[N/P]
Inventor(s)01 / GALLASTEGUI, Ainara Garcia
Bio Nano Consulting
338 Euston Road
London Greater London NW1 3BT / GB
02 / SHAFFER, Milo
Department of Chemistry
Imperial College London
South Kensington Campus
London Greater London SW7 2AZ / GB
03 / ALYOUBI, Abdulrahman O
King Abdulaziz University
P.O. Box 80203
Jeddah 21859 / SA
04 / BASAHEL, Sulaiman
King Abdulaziz University
P.O. Box 80203
Jeddah 21859 / SA
[N/P]
Application number, filing date13711101.907.03.2013
WO2013GB50570
Priority number, dateGB2012000416909.03.2012         Original published format: GB 201204169
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013132259
Date:12.09.2013
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.09.2013
[2013/37]
International and Supplementary
search report(s)
International search report -
published on:
EP12.09.2013
ClassificationInternational:C01B31/04
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR 
TitleEnglish:GRAPHENE AND GRAPHENE OXIDE AEROGELS/XEROGELS FOR CO2 CAPTURE
French:AÉROGELS/XÉROGELS DE GRAPHÈNE ET D'OXYDE DE GRAPHÈNE POUR LA CAPTURE DE CO2
Examination proceduredeletedDeletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2015/23]
deletedDeletion: Application withdrawn by applicant  [2015/50]
10.10.2014Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2015/50]
15.07.2015Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time  [2015/50]
Public notificationsNOTING OF LOSS OF RIGHTS PURSUANT TO RULE 112 (1) EPC ( EPO FORM 1205A DATED 06-05-2015 )
The Bio Nano Centre Limited
338 Euston Road
London NW1 3BT / GB
[2015/29]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.201503   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[Y]US2011224376  (ZHAI LEI [US], et al) [Y] 1-56 * claims 1,8,9,13 * * abstract * * paragraphs [0003] , [0007] , [0010] , [0027] , [0034] , [0038] *;
 [A]US2012034442  (PAUZAUSKIE PETER J [US], et al) [A] 1,14,43-49 * claims 1,8,11,30-40,49,50 * * paragraphs [0004] , [0032] , [0041] , [0045] *;
 [YD]  - MEIS, N. N. A. H.; BITTER, J. H.; DE JONG K. P., "Support and size effects of activated hydrotalcites for precombusion CO2 capture", IND. ENG. CHEM. RES., (2010), vol. 49, pages 1229 - 1235, XP002699984 [YD] 1-56 * page 1230, left-hand column, "CNF-Supported Hydrotalcites" *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ie901114d
 [A]  - LATORRE-SANCHEZ M ET AL, "The synthesis of a hybrid graphene-nickel/manganese mixed oxide and its performance in lithium-ion batteries", CARBON FEBRUARY, ELSEVIER LTD GBR, (201202), vol. 50, no. 2, doi:10.1016/J.CARBON.2011.09.007, pages 518 - 525, XP002699985 [A] 1,14 * abstract * * page 519, left-hand column, "2. Experimental section" *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/J.CARBON.2011.09.007
 [A]  - MEIXIA LI ET AL, "Facile synthesis of NiAl-layered double hydroxide/graphene hybrid with enhanced electrochemical properties for detection of dopamine", NANOSCALE, ROYAL SOCIETY OF CHEMISTRY UK, (2011), vol. 3, no. 10, ISSN 2040-3364, pages 4240 - 4246, XP002699986 [A] 1,14 * abstract * * page 4241, "2. Experimental" *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/c1nr10592b
 [A]  - WORSLEY M A ET AL, "High surface area, sp2-cross-linked three-dimensional graphene monoliths", JOURNAL OF PHYSICAL CHEMISTRY LETTERS, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY USA, (20110421), vol. 2, no. 8, doi:10.1021/JZ200223X, pages 921 - 925, XP008163340 [A] 1,14,17,43 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jz200223x
 [A]  - LIN Y ET AL, "Superhydrophobic Functionalized Graphene Aerogels", A C S APPLIED MATERIALS AND INTERFACES, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, US, vol. 3, no. 7, doi:10.1021/AM200527J, ISSN 1944-8244, (20110727), pages 2200 - 2203, (20110629), XP008163355 [A] 1,14,17,43 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/am200527j
 [A]  - ORTRUD ASCHENBRENNER ET AL, "Adsorption of carbon dioxide on hydrotalcite-like compounds of different compositions", CHEMICAL ENGINEERING RESEARCH AND DESIGN, PART A, INSTITUTION OF CHEMICAL ENGINEERS, vol. 89, no. 9, doi:10.1016/J.CHERD.2010.09.019, ISSN 0263-8762, (20100930), pages 1711 - 1721, (20101007), XP028247999 [A] 1,44,45,48 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.cherd.2010.09.019
by applicant   US2006144227 A1 20060706
    - HALMANN, M. M.; STEINBERG, M., Greenhouse Gas Carbon Dioxide Mitigation: Science and Technology, LEWIS PUBLISHERS,
    - YU, K. M. K.; CURCIC, I.; GABRIEL, J.; TSANG, S. C. E., CHEM. SUS. CHEM., (2008), vol. 1, page 893,
    - YONG, Z.; MATA, V.; RODRIGUES, A. E., SEP. PURIF TECHNOL., (2002), vol. 26, page 195,
    - CHOI, S.; DRESE, J. H.; JONES, C. W., CHEM. SUS. CHEM., (2009), vol. 2, page 796,
    - WANG, Q.; LUO, J.; ZHONG, Z.; BORGNA, A., ENERGY ENVIRON. SCI., (2011), vol. 4, page 42,
    - HUFTON, J. R.; MAYORGA, S.; SIRCAR, S., AICHE JOURNAL., (1999), vol. 45, page 248,
    - DING, Y.; ALPAY, E., CHEM. ENG. SCI., (2000), vol. 55, page 3461,
    - DING, Y.; ALPAY E., CHEM. ENG. SCI., (2000), vol. 55, page 3929,
    - VAN SELOW, E. R.; COBDEN, P. D.; VERBRAEKEN, P. A.; HUFTON, J. R.; VAN DEN BRINK, R. W., IND, ENG. CHEM. RES., (2009), vol. 48, page 4184,
    - HUTSON, N. D.; ATTWOOD, B. C., ADSORPTION, (2008), vol. 14, page 781,
    - REIJERS, H. T. J.; VALSTER- SCHIERMEIER, S. E. A.; COBDEN, P. D.; VAN DEN BRICK R. W., IND. ENG. CHEM. RES., (2006), vol. 45, page 2522,
    - OLIVEIRA, E. L. G.; GRANDE, C. A.; RODRIGUES, A. E., SEP. PURIF. TECHNOL., (2008), vol. 62, page 137,
    - MEIS, N. N. A. H.; BITTER, J. H.; DE JONG K. P., IND. ENG. CHEM. RES., (2010), vol. 49, page 1229,
    - 0., MCGUIRE, P.; ALSAMAQ, S.; WANG, J.; SUPASITMONGKOL, S.; AI-DURI, B.; STYRING, P.; WOOD, J., CHEM. ENG. RES. DES., (2011), vol. 89, page 1711,
    - CHEN Y.; ZHANG X.; YU P.; Y. W. MA, CHEM. COMMUN., (2009), page 4527,
    - WANG L.; WANG D.; DONG X. Y.; ZHANG Z. J.; PEI X. F.; CHEN X. J., CHEM. COMMUN., (2011), vol. 47, pages 3556 - 3558,
    - GAO Z.; WANG J.; LI Z.; YANG W.; WANG B.; HOU M.; HE Y.; LIU Q.; MANN T.; YANG P., CHEM. MATER., (2011), vol. 23, pages 3509 - 3516,
    - WANG H. W.; HU Z. A.; CHANG Y. Q.; CHEN Y. L.; WU H. Y.; ZHANG Z. Y.; YANG Y. Y., J. MATER. CHEM., (2011), vol. 21, page 10504,
    - WU X. L.; WANG L.; CHEN C. L.; XU A. W.; WANG X. K., J. MATER. CHEM., (2011), vol. 21, pages 17353 - 17359,
    - WON II PARK W.; LEE C. H.; LEE J. M.; KIMB N. J.; YI G. C., NANOSCALE, (2011), vol. 3, page 3522,
    - WANG Y.; PENG W.; LIU L.; TANG M.; GAO F.; LI M., MICROCHIM ACTA, (2011), vol. 174, pages 41 - 46,
    - LI M.; ZHU J. E.; ZHANG L.; CHEN X.; ZHANG H.; ZHANG F.; XU S.; EVANSA D. G., NANOSCALE, (2011), vol. 3, page 4240,
    - LI H.; ZHU G.; LIU Z. H.; YANG Z.; WANG Z., CARBON, (2010), vol. 48, pages 4391 - 4396,
    - CHEN D.; WANG X.; LIU T.; WANG X.; LI J., APPLIED MATERIALS & INTERFACES, (2010), vol. 2, pages 2005 - 2010,
    - H. BAI; C. LI; X. L. WANG; G. Q. SHI, CHEM. COMMUN., (2010), vol. 46, pages 2376 - 2378,
    - S. Z. ZU; B. H. HAN, J. PHYS. CHEM. C, (2009), vol. 113, pages 13651 - 13657,
    - A. SATTI; P. LARPENT; Y. GUN'KO, CARBON, (2010), vol. 48, pages 3376 - 3381,
    - D. S. YU; L. M. DAI, J. PHYS. CHEM. LETT., (2010), vol. 1, pages 467 - 470,
    - L. HE; J. Q. LU; H. Q. JIANG, SMALL, (2009), vol. 5, pages 2802 - 2806,
    - X. CAO; Q. HE; W. SHI; B. LI; Z. ZENG; Y. SHI; Q. YAN; H. ZHANG, SMALL, (2011), vol. 7, page 1199,
    - M. A. WORSLEY; P. J. PAUZAUSKIE; T. Y. OLSON; J. BIENER; J. H. SATCHER; T. F. BAUMANN, J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (2010), vol. 132, pages 14067 - 14069,
    - Z. H. TANG; S. L. SHEN; J. ZHUANG; X. WANG, ANGEW. CHEM., INT. ED., (2010), vol. 49, pages 4603 - 4607,
    - X. JIANG; Y. MA; J. LI; Q. FAN; W. HUANG, J. PHYS. CHEM. C, (2010), vol. 114, page 22462,
    - F. LIU; T. S. SEO, ADV. FUNCT. MATER., (2010), vol. 20, pages 1930 - 1936,
    - Y. X. XU; K. X. SHENG; C. LI; G. Q. SHI, ACS NANO, (2010), vol. 4, pages 4324 - 4330,
    - W. CHEN; L.YAN, NANOSCALE, (2011), vol. 3, pages 3132 - 3137,
    - W. HUMMERS; R. OFFEMA, J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1958), vol. 80, page 1339,
    - W. F. CHEN; L. F. YAN; P. R. BANGAL, CARBON, (2010), vol. 48, pages 1146 - 1152,
    - L. YAN; Y. B. ZHENG; F. ZHAO; S. LI; X. GAO; B. XU; P. S. WEISS; Y. ZHAO, CHEM. SOC. REV., (2012), vol. 41, pages 97 - 114,
    - W. GAO; L. B. ALEMANY; L. J. CI; P. M. AJAYAN, NAT. CHEM., (2009), vol. 1, page 403,
    - W. CAI; R. D. PINER; F. J. STADERMANN; S. PARK; M. A. SHAIBAT; Y. ISHII; D. YANG; A. VELAMAKANNI; S. J. AN; M. STOLLER, SCIENCE, (2008), vol. 321, page 1815,
    - LIU C. ET AL., POLYMER, (2003), vol. 44, pages 7529 - 7532,
    - MOURAD, M. C. D.; MOKHTAR, M.; TUCKER, M. G.; BARNEY, E. R.; SMITH, R. L; ALYOUBI, A. 0.; BASAHEL, S. N.; SHAFFER, M. S. P.; SKIPP, J. MATER. CHEM., (2011), vol. 21, page 15479,
 WO2011GB52224