Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2822402

EP2822402 - GELLED NUTRITIONAL COMPOSITION COMPRISING FREE AMINO ACIDS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2015/03]LIQUID NUTRITIONAL COMPOSITION COMPRISING FREE AMINO ACIDS
[2016/50]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.03.2018
Database last updated on 15.07.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  07.04.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  13.12.2016
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  18.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip23.11.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 26.12.2018  [2018/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
N.V. Nutricia
Eerste Stationsstraat 186
2712 HM Zoetermeer / NL
[N/P]
Former [2015/03]For all designated states
N.V. Nutricia
Eerste Stationsstraat 186
2712 HM Zoetermeer / NL
Inventor(s)01 / LYNCH, Andrew Sean
1 Olive Mount Villas
Liverpool L15 8LX / GB
02 / ANDERS, Simon David
100 Wavertree Boulevard
Liverpool L7 9PT / GB
 [2015/03]
Representative(s)V.O.
P.O. Box 87930
2508 DH Den Haag / NL
[2017/19]
Former [2015/03]Jansen, Cornelis Marinus
V.O.
Johan de Wittlaan 7
2517 JR Den Haag / NL
Application number, filing date13711144.908.03.2013
[2017/19]
WO2013NL50150
Priority number, dateWO2012NL5014709.03.2012         Original published format: PCT/NL2012/050147
[2015/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013133711
Date:12.09.2013
Language:EN
[2013/37]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2822402
Date:14.01.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.09.2013
[2015/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2822402
Date:10.05.2017
Language:EN
[2017/19]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP12.09.2013
ClassificationInternational:A61P3/00, A61K31/198, A61K31/723, A61K31/732, A61K31/736, A23L2/02, A23L2/66, A61K33/06, A23L33/00, A23L33/16, A23L33/175
[2016/50]
Former International [2015/03]A23L1/29, A23L1/304, A23L1/305, A61P3/00, A61K31/198, A61K31/723, A61K31/732, A61K31/736
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/03]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VORGELIERTE NÄHRSTOFFZUSAMMENSETZUNG MIT FREIEN AMINOSÄUREN[2016/50]
English:GELLED NUTRITIONAL COMPOSITION COMPRISING FREE AMINO ACIDS[2016/50]
French:COMPOSITION NUTRITIONNELLE GÉLIFIÉE COMPRENANT DES ACIDES AMINÉS LIBRES[2016/50]
Former [2015/03]FLÜSSIGE NÄHRSTOFFZUSAMMENSETZUNG MIT FREIEN AMINOSÄUREN
Former [2015/03]LIQUID NUTRITIONAL COMPOSITION COMPRISING FREE AMINO ACIDS
Former [2015/03]COMPOSITION NUTRITIONNELLE LIQUIDE COMPRENANT DES ACIDES AMINÉS LIBRES
Entry into regional phase10.09.2014National basic fee paid 
10.09.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
10.09.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.09.2014Examination requested  [2015/03]
20.04.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.06.2015Observations by third parties
17.08.2015Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1}
30.09.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.12.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.11.2016Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 16.11.2016
16.11.2016Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
14.12.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.03.2017Fee for grant paid
29.03.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
29.03.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  30.09.2015
Opposition(s)13.02.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/16]
Request for further processing for:Loss of rights: Claims
21.08.2015Request for further processing filed
21.08.2015Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
24.09.2015Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
29.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
28.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT10.05.2017
CZ10.05.2017
DK10.05.2017
EE10.05.2017
ES10.05.2017
FI10.05.2017
HR10.05.2017
IT10.05.2017
LT10.05.2017
LV10.05.2017
MC10.05.2017
PL10.05.2017
RO10.05.2017
RS10.05.2017
SE10.05.2017
SI10.05.2017
SK10.05.2017
SM10.05.2017
BG10.08.2017
NO10.08.2017
GR11.08.2017
IS10.09.2017
[2018/52]
Former [2018/25]AT10.05.2017
CZ10.05.2017
DK10.05.2017
EE10.05.2017
ES10.05.2017
FI10.05.2017
HR10.05.2017
IT10.05.2017
LT10.05.2017
LV10.05.2017
PL10.05.2017
RO10.05.2017
RS10.05.2017
SE10.05.2017
SI10.05.2017
SK10.05.2017
SM10.05.2017
BG10.08.2017
NO10.08.2017
GR11.08.2017
IS10.09.2017
Former [2018/11]AT10.05.2017
CZ10.05.2017
DK10.05.2017
EE10.05.2017
ES10.05.2017
FI10.05.2017
HR10.05.2017
IT10.05.2017
LT10.05.2017
LV10.05.2017
PL10.05.2017
RO10.05.2017
RS10.05.2017
SE10.05.2017
SK10.05.2017
SM10.05.2017
BG10.08.2017
NO10.08.2017
GR11.08.2017
IS10.09.2017
Former [2018/10]AT10.05.2017
CZ10.05.2017
DK10.05.2017
EE10.05.2017
ES10.05.2017
FI10.05.2017
HR10.05.2017
LT10.05.2017
LV10.05.2017
PL10.05.2017
RO10.05.2017
RS10.05.2017
SE10.05.2017
SK10.05.2017
BG10.08.2017
NO10.08.2017
GR11.08.2017
IS10.09.2017
Former [2018/09]AT10.05.2017
DK10.05.2017
EE10.05.2017
ES10.05.2017
FI10.05.2017
HR10.05.2017
LT10.05.2017
LV10.05.2017
PL10.05.2017
RS10.05.2017
SE10.05.2017
BG10.08.2017
NO10.08.2017
GR11.08.2017
IS10.09.2017
Former [2017/50]AT10.05.2017
ES10.05.2017
FI10.05.2017
HR10.05.2017
LT10.05.2017
LV10.05.2017
PL10.05.2017
RS10.05.2017
SE10.05.2017
BG10.08.2017
NO10.08.2017
GR11.08.2017
IS10.09.2017
Former [2017/49]AT10.05.2017
ES10.05.2017
FI10.05.2017
HR10.05.2017
LT10.05.2017
NO10.08.2017
GR11.08.2017
IS10.09.2017
Cited inInternational search[AD]US2006147495  (SULLIVAN IAN [GB], et al) [AD] 1-16 * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0025] * * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0052] *;
 [A]US2008021106  (PETIT ROBERT G II [US], et al) [A] 1-16 * paragraph [0047] - paragraph [0055]; example 1 * * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0044] *;
 [A]WO2005096845  (NUTRICIA NV [NL], et al) [A] 1-16 * page 3, line 13 - page 8, line 10 *;
 [A]US6506422  (MASSON GERARD [CH], et al) [A] 1-16 * column 6, line 17 - column 7, line 5; examples 1-3 *;
 [A]EP0747395  (CLINTEC NUTRITION CO [US]) [A] 1-16 * page 3, line 31 - page 6, line 35 *;
 [A]EP0614616  (CLINTEC NUTRITION CO [US]) [A] 1-16 * page 7, line 1 - page 10, line 44 *
ExaminationWO2008015374
 JP2009106217
    - "PRODUKTNAME // PZN Zutaten ALLERGENHINWEISE Packungsgröße Dosierung und Anwendung PKU SQUEEZIE // PZN 8468949 Wasser", (20160404), URL: http://api.gebrauchs.info/974f18e63eb8df811bcb8ada0d59bb1ai, (20160404), XP055262602
    - MEDPEX APOTHEKE, "PKU squeezie Gel 30x85 Gramm online bestellen - medpex Versandapotheke", (20160404), URL: http://www.medpex.de/pku-squeezie-gel-p8468949?q=PKU+sqeezie&pn=1&fs=89.48&fp=1&fop=1, (20160404), XP055262612
by applicantUS2006147495
other   - "NEW ADDITIONS TO VITAFLO'S PRODUCT RANGE", VITAFLO, (20120210), URL: HTTP://WWW.VITAFLO.CO.UK/BLOG/2012/02/, XP003035900