Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2822447

EP2822447 - EYE SURGICAL LIGHTING UNIT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.04.2019
Database last updated on 11.12.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  15.05.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  27.04.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  23.03.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  14.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip15.11.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 18.12.2019 [2019/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
D.O.R.C. Dutch Ophthalmic Research Center (International) B.V.
Scheijdelveweg 2
3214 VN Zuidland / NL
[2015/03]
Inventor(s)01 / VIJFVINKEL, Gerrit Jan
Scheijdelveweg 2
NL-3214 VN Zuidland / NL
 [2015/03]
Representative(s)V.O.
P.O. Box 87930
2508 DH Den Haag / NL
[2018/23]
Former [2015/03]Jansen, Cornelis Marinus , et al
V.O.
Johan de Wittlaan 7
2517 JR Den Haag / NL
Application number, filing date13711147.211.03.2013
[2018/23]
WO2013NL50156
Priority number, dateNL2012200845509.03.2012         Original published format: NL 2008455
[2015/03]
Filing languageNL
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013133717
Date:12.09.2013
Language:EN
[2013/37]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2822447
Date:14.01.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.09.2013
[2015/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2822447
Date:06.06.2018
Language:EN
[2018/23]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP12.09.2013
ClassificationInternational:A61B3/00, A61B90/30
[2017/47]
Former International [2015/03]A61B1/07, A61B3/00, A61B5/00, A61B19/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/03]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:AUGENCHIRURGISCHE BELEUCHTUNGSEINHEIT[2015/03]
English:EYE SURGICAL LIGHTING UNIT[2015/03]
French:UNITÉ D'ÉCLAIRAGE CHIRURGICAL DE L'OEIL[2017/50]
Former [2015/03]UNITÉ D'ÉCLAIRAGE CHIRURGICAL DE L' OEIL
Entry into regional phase08.10.2014National basic fee paid 
08.10.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
08.10.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.10.2014Examination requested  [2015/03]
02.06.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
15.11.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.03.2018Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
13.03.2018Fee for grant paid
13.03.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
26.04.2018Information about intention to grant a patent
26.04.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  15.11.2017
Opposition(s)07.03.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/20]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
29.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
28.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
28.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL06.06.2018
AT06.06.2018
CY06.06.2018
CZ06.06.2018
DK06.06.2018
EE06.06.2018
ES06.06.2018
FI06.06.2018
HR06.06.2018
LT06.06.2018
LV06.06.2018
MC06.06.2018
PL06.06.2018
RO06.06.2018
RS06.06.2018
SE06.06.2018
SI06.06.2018
SK06.06.2018
SM06.06.2018
BG06.09.2018
NO06.09.2018
GR07.09.2018
IS06.10.2018
[2019/51]
Former [2019/46]AT06.06.2018
CY06.06.2018
CZ06.06.2018
DK06.06.2018
EE06.06.2018
ES06.06.2018
FI06.06.2018
HR06.06.2018
LT06.06.2018
LV06.06.2018
MC06.06.2018
PL06.06.2018
RO06.06.2018
RS06.06.2018
SE06.06.2018
SI06.06.2018
SK06.06.2018
SM06.06.2018
BG06.09.2018
NO06.09.2018
GR07.09.2018
IS06.10.2018
Former [2019/26]AT06.06.2018
CY06.06.2018
CZ06.06.2018
DK06.06.2018
EE06.06.2018
ES06.06.2018
FI06.06.2018
HR06.06.2018
LT06.06.2018
LV06.06.2018
PL06.06.2018
RO06.06.2018
RS06.06.2018
SE06.06.2018
SI06.06.2018
SK06.06.2018
SM06.06.2018
BG06.09.2018
NO06.09.2018
GR07.09.2018
IS06.10.2018
Former [2019/11]AT06.06.2018
CY06.06.2018
CZ06.06.2018
EE06.06.2018
ES06.06.2018
FI06.06.2018
HR06.06.2018
LT06.06.2018
LV06.06.2018
PL06.06.2018
RO06.06.2018
RS06.06.2018
SE06.06.2018
SK06.06.2018
SM06.06.2018
BG06.09.2018
NO06.09.2018
GR07.09.2018
IS06.10.2018
Former [2019/10]AT06.06.2018
CY06.06.2018
CZ06.06.2018
EE06.06.2018
ES06.06.2018
FI06.06.2018
HR06.06.2018
LT06.06.2018
LV06.06.2018
PL06.06.2018
RO06.06.2018
RS06.06.2018
SE06.06.2018
SK06.06.2018
BG06.09.2018
NO06.09.2018
GR07.09.2018
IS06.10.2018
Former [2019/09]CY06.06.2018
EE06.06.2018
ES06.06.2018
FI06.06.2018
HR06.06.2018
LT06.06.2018
LV06.06.2018
RS06.06.2018
SE06.06.2018
BG06.09.2018
NO06.09.2018
GR07.09.2018
IS06.10.2018
Former [2019/08]CY06.06.2018
ES06.06.2018
FI06.06.2018
HR06.06.2018
LT06.06.2018
LV06.06.2018
RS06.06.2018
SE06.06.2018
BG06.09.2018
NO06.09.2018
GR07.09.2018
IS06.10.2018
Former [2018/52]CY06.06.2018
ES06.06.2018
FI06.06.2018
HR06.06.2018
LT06.06.2018
LV06.06.2018
RS06.06.2018
SE06.06.2018
BG06.09.2018
NO06.09.2018
GR07.09.2018
Former [2018/51]CY06.06.2018
ES06.06.2018
FI06.06.2018
HR06.06.2018
LT06.06.2018
LV06.06.2018
RS06.06.2018
SE06.06.2018
BG06.09.2018
NO06.09.2018
Former [2018/50]CY06.06.2018
ES06.06.2018
FI06.06.2018
HR06.06.2018
LT06.06.2018
SE06.06.2018
BG06.09.2018
NO06.09.2018
Former [2018/49]CY06.06.2018
ES06.06.2018
FI06.06.2018
LT06.06.2018
SE06.06.2018
BG06.09.2018
NO06.09.2018
Former [2018/47]ES06.06.2018
FI06.06.2018
LT06.06.2018
NO06.09.2018
Cited inInternational search[YD]EP1844705  (D O R C DUTCH OPHTHALMIC RES C [NL]) [YD] 1-8 * the whole document *;
 [YD]US2011245787  (ZICA MICHAEL A [US], et al) [YD] 1-8 * paragraphs [0004] , [0014] *;
 [A]US2007255264  (HICKINGBOTHAM DYSON [US]) [A] 1-8 * paragraph [0006] *
by applicantEP1844705
 US2011245787