Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2823667

EP2823667 - METHODS AND APPARATUSES FOR USING LOW- POWER ACCESS POINTS TO IDENTIFY TRAFFIC CONGESTION ZONES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  12.04.2019
Database last updated on 18.11.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  27.07.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip12.04.2019Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 15.05.2019  [2019/20]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Qualcomm Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121 / US
[2015/03]
Inventor(s)01 / TOKGOZ, Yeliz
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121 / US
02 / YAVUZ, Mehmet
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121 / US
03 / MESHKATI, Farhad
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121 / US
04 / TINNAKORNSRISUPHAP, Peerapol
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121 / US
 [2015/03]
Representative(s)Dunlop, Hugh Christopher , et al
Maucher Jenkins
26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2015/03]Dunlop, Hugh Christopher , et al
RGC Jenkins & Co.
26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
Application number, filing date13711527.508.03.2013
WO2013US30022
Priority number, dateUS201261609217P09.03.2012         Original published format: US 201261609217 P
US20131378371204.03.2013         Original published format: US201313783712
[2015/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013134720
Date:12.09.2013
Language:EN
[2013/37]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2823667
Date:14.01.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.09.2013
[2015/03]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP12.09.2013
ClassificationInternational:H04W28/08, H04W84/04
[2015/03]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/03]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNGEN ZUR VERWENDUNG VON NIEDRIGLEISTUNGSZUGANGSPUNKTEN ZUR IDENTIFIZIERUNG VON VERKEHRSSTAUZONEN[2015/03]
English:METHODS AND APPARATUSES FOR USING LOW- POWER ACCESS POINTS TO IDENTIFY TRAFFIC CONGESTION ZONES[2015/03]
French:PROCÉDÉS ET APPAREILS POUR L'UTILISATION DE POINTS D'ACCÈS DE FAIBLE PUISSANCE POUR IDENTIFIER DES ZONES DE CONGESTION DE LA CIRCULATION[2015/03]
Entry into regional phase01.08.2014National basic fee paid 
01.08.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
01.08.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.01.2014Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
01.08.2014Examination requested  [2015/03]
30.03.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
31.07.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.12.2018Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2019/20]
10.01.2019Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2019/20]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  31.07.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
08.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
07.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
08.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
Cited inInternational search[XI]EP1895801  (NOKIA SIEMENS NETWORKS GMBH [DE]) [X] 27,29,31-33,36,38,40-42,45,47,49,50,52,54-60,63-68,71-80 * column 7, lines 27-40 * * column 7, lines 52-56 * * column 8, line 32 - column 10, line 14 * * figures 8, 10, 13a * [I] 1-26,28,30,34,35,37,39,43,44,46,48,51,53,61,62,69,70;
 [I]US2010254319  (KARAOGUZ JEYHAN [US] ET AL) [I] 1-80 * abstract * * paragraph [0002] * * paragraphs [0014] - [0019] * * paragraph [0023] * * paragraph [0027] * * paragraphs [0037] - [0045] * * paragraph [0047] * * figures 1,3,4,5 *;
 [A]US2010124930  (ANDREWS JEFFREY G [US] ET AL) [A] 1-80 * abstract * * paragraph [0002] * * paragraphs [0055] - [0056] * * paragraph [0081] * * figures 1,4 *;
 [A]US2009046665  (ROBSON JULIUS [FR] ET AL) [A] 1-80 * abstract * * paragraphs [0026] - [0057] * * paragraph [0068] * * figures 1,3 *