Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2823667 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2823667



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 487
09.04.2019 Closing of application Search / examination 1
10.01.2019 Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) Search / examination 2
31.07.2018 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
31.07.2018 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
23.07.2018 Examination started Search / examination 1
26.04.2018 Notification regarding date of start of examination with possibility to withdraw Search / examination 1
14.12.2017 Request for oral proceedings Search / examination 5
19.09.2016 Document concerning representation Search / examination 2
30.03.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
30.03.2015 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
30.03.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 15
30.03.2015 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 1
30.03.2015 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 1
30.03.2015 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 1
30.03.2015 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 5
30.03.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
09.01.2015 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
09.01.2015 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
17.12.2014 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
16.10.2014 Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
14.10.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
14.10.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
14.10.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
14.10.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
16.09.2014 Annexes to the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 14
16.09.2014 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 15
01.08.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
01.08.2014 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
01.08.2014 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
16.07.2014 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
13.06.2014 Annex to International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 20
13.06.2014 International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
13.06.2014 International preliminary examination report - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 6
13.06.2014 International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
13.06.2014 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
13.06.2014 Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
13.03.2014 Written opinion PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
13.03.2014 Written opinion - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 4
13.03.2014 Written opinion - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
13.02.2014 Document concerning fees and payments PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
13.02.2014 PCT demand form PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
13.02.2014 PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims PCT Chapter 2 procedure 14
13.02.2014 PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims PCT Chapter 2 procedure 14
13.02.2014 Payment of fees and costs PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
13.02.2014 Reply to Form IPEA424 PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
13.02.2014 Reply to International Search Opinion PCT Chapter 2 procedure 6
11.02.2014 Notification of election of EPO Search / examination 1
16.01.2014 Free text PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
16.01.2014 Notification of receipt of demand PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
09.01.2014 Document concerning fees and payments PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
09.01.2014 Letter regarding PCTII procedure PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
09.01.2014 PCT demand form PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
09.01.2014 PCT demand form PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
09.01.2014 PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims PCT Chapter 2 procedure 14
09.01.2014 Payment of fees and costs PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
03.01.2014 Cover sheet for fax transmission PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
03.01.2014 Document concerning fees and payments PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
03.01.2014 PCT demand form PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
03.01.2014 PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims PCT Chapter 2 procedure 14
03.01.2014 Payment of fees and costs PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
01.10.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 58
01.10.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 74
12.09.2013 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
12.09.2013 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 61
28.08.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
28.08.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
28.08.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 6
20.03.2013 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
20.03.2013 Claims International Searching Authority 14
20.03.2013 Description International Searching Authority 32
20.03.2013 Document concerning representation International Searching Authority 1
20.03.2013 Drawings International Searching Authority 13