Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2823667 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201380012868 EP13711527



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR101564652BGlobal Dossier 30.10.2015B1
KR20140136491 28.11.2014A
Priority number Date
US201313783712 04.03.2013
US201261609217 09.03.2012
WO2013US30022 08.03.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP5893767BGlobal Dossier 23.03.2016B2
JP2015511084 13.04.2015A
Priority number Date
US201313783712 04.03.2013
US201261609217 09.03.2012
WO2013US30022 08.03.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN104160743BGlobal Dossier 24.08.2016B
CN104160743 19.11.2014A
Priority number Date
US201313783712 04.03.2013
US201261609217 09.03.2012
WO2013US30022 08.03.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2823667Global Dossier 14.01.2015A1
Priority number Date
US201313783712 04.03.2013
US201261609217 09.03.2012
WO2013US30022 08.03.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2013134720Global Dossier 12.09.2013A1
Priority number Date
US201313783712 04.03.2013
US201261609217 09.03.2012
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US8989760Global Dossier 24.03.2015B2
US2013237202 12.09.2013A1
Priority number Date
US201313783712 04.03.2013
US201261609217 09.03.2012