Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2823682

EP2823682 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR COMMUNICATING BETWEEN SMALL CELLS USING OVER-THE-AIR TRANSMISSIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  27.09.2019
Database last updated on 13.11.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  23.05.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  24.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip27.09.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 30.10.2019  [2019/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Qualcomm Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121 / US
[2015/03]
Inventor(s)01 / SINGH, Damanjit
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121 / US
02 / TINNAKORNSRISUPHAP, Peerapol
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121 / US
03 / YAVUZ, Mehmet
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121 / US
 [2015/03]
Representative(s)Dunlop, Hugh Christopher , et al
Maucher Jenkins
26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
[2019/44]
Former [2015/03]Dunlop, Hugh Christopher , et al
RGC Jenkins & Co.
26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
Application number, filing date13711528.308.03.2013
[2019/44]
WO2013US30025
Priority number, dateUS201261609227P09.03.2012         Original published format: US 201261609227 P
US20131378777806.03.2013         Original published format: US201313787778
[2015/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013134723
Date:12.09.2013
Language:EN
[2013/37]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2823682
Date:14.01.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.09.2013
[2015/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2823682
Date:30.10.2019
Language:EN
[2019/44]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP12.09.2013
ClassificationInternational:H04W72/04, // H04W36/00, H04W84/04, H04W92/20, H04W76/14
[2019/20]
Former International [2015/03]H04W72/04, H04W36/00, H04W76/02, H04W84/04, H04W92/20
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/03]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR KOMMUNIKATION ZWISCHEN KLEINEN ZELLEN UNTER VERWENDUNG VON ÜBERTRAGUNGEN ÜBER FUNK[2015/03]
English:METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR COMMUNICATING BETWEEN SMALL CELLS USING OVER-THE-AIR TRANSMISSIONS[2015/03]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME POUR UNE COMMUNICATION ENTRE DES PETITES CELLULES AU MOYEN DE TRANSMISSIONS EN LIAISON RADIO[2015/03]
Entry into regional phase27.08.2014National basic fee paid 
27.08.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
27.08.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.01.2014Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
27.08.2014Examination requested  [2015/03]
16.04.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
27.08.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.12.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.05.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.09.2019Fee for grant paid
20.09.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
20.09.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  27.08.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
08.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
07.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
08.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
08.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Cited inInternational search[XI]GB2480692  (TOSHIBA RES EUROP LTD [GB]) [X] 1-7,15-21,26-30,35-39 * abstract * * page 4, line 23 - page 10, line 6 * * page 11, lines 6-17 * * page 13, lines 1-27 * * page 14, line 16 - page 17, line 22 * * page 18, line 20 - page 19, line 15 * * page 22, lines 1-19 * * page 28, lines 3-10 * * page 37, lines 1-4 * * claims 1,2,5-7 * [I] 8-14,22-25,31-34,40-43;
 [XAI]US2011249642  (SONG OSOK [US], et al) [X] 1-3,15-19,26-28,35-37 * abstract * * paragraphs [0003] , [0008] , [0029] , [0030] , [0054] , [0058] , [0070] , [0077] - [0098] * * paragraphs [0109] - [0112]; claims 1,3-9,12,13 * [A] 12-14,23-25,32-34,41-43 [I] 4-11,20-22,29-31,38-40;
 [XAI]EP2161964  (NOKIA SIEMENS NETWORKS OY [FI]) [X] 1-3,16-19,26-28,35-37 * abstract * * paragraphs [0003] , [0005] - [0014] - [0022] , [0030] , [0037] , [0040] - [0042] - [0046] , [0061] , [0062]; claims 1-3,6,8 * [A] 12-15,23-25,32-34,41-43 [I] 4-11,20-22,29-31,38-40;
 [IA]WO2010049120  (NEC EUROPE LTD [DE], et al) [I] 1-5,7-10,15,16 * the whole document * [A] 6,11-14,23-25,32-34,41-43;
 [IA]WO2011044823  (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN], et al) [I] 1-11,15-22,26-31,35-40 * the whole document * [A] 12-14,23-25,32-34,41-43;
 [A]US2011028175  (CHANG SUNG CHEOL [KR], et al) [A] 1-43 * abstract * * paragraphs [0003] - [0014] - [0017] , [0032] , [0036] - [0048] * * paragraphs [0061] , [0075] , [0082] - [0084] - [0099]; claims 1,2 *;
 [A]US2010267408  (LEE NEUNG HYUNG [KR], et al) [A] 1-43 * abstract * * paragraphs [0019] - [0021] - [0034] , [0040] - [0043] - [0050] , [0061] , [0067] , [0069] , [0070] , [0075] , [0077] , [0080] , [0089] , [0098] *;
 [A]  - 3GPP, "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Radio Access Network; Evolved Universal Terrestrial Radio Access Network (E-UTRAN); X2 application protocol (X2AP) (Release 11)", 3GPP DRAFT; DRAFT_36423-B00, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20120302), XP050565945 [A] 1-43 * pages 13,14,18 * * pages 24,25 *