Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2785477

EP2785477 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR MACHINING A WORKPIECE CONSISTING OF METAL, PARTICULARLY FOR PRODUCING A CUP-SHAPED COMPONENT FOR THE AUTOMOBILE INDUSTRY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2014/41]DEVICE AND METHOD FOR MACHINING A WORKPIECE CONSISTING OF METAL, PARTICULARLY FOR PRODUCING A CUP-SHAPED COMPONENT FOR THE AUTOMOBILE INDUSTRY, AS WELL AS SUCH A WORKPIECE
[2016/46]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.04.2018
Database last updated on 21.10.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  28.04.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  04.04.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  21.03.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  06.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip23.11.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 26.12.2018  [2018/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ALLGAIER WERKE GmbH
Ulmer Strasse 75
73066 Uhingen / DE
[2014/41]
Inventor(s)01 / KÖNIG, Peter
Österbachstraße 17
73033 Göppingen / DE
02 / WOLF, Michael
Sommerweg 1
73066 Uhingen / DE
03 / LEHR, Ottmar
Barbarossastraße 9
73098 Rechberghausen / DE
04 / LEINMÜLLER, Klaus
Täferroter Straße 16
73574 Iggingen-Brainkofen / DE
05 / WAIDMANN, Dieter
Siedlerweg 8
73572 Heuchlingen / DE
 [2014/41]
Representative(s)Dr. Weitzel & Partner
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte mbB
Friedenstrasse 10
89522 Heidenheim / DE
[2014/41]
Application number, filing date13711617.418.03.2013
[2017/22]
WO2013EP55553
Priority number, dateDE2012100563522.03.2012         Original published format: DE102012005635
[2014/41]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013139731
Date:26.09.2013
Language:DE
[2013/39]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2785477
Date:08.10.2014
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.09.2013
[2014/41]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2785477
Date:31.05.2017
Language:DE
[2017/22]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP26.09.2013
ClassificationInternational:B21D22/22, B21D24/04, B21D24/10
[2014/41]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/41]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM BEARBEITEN EINES WERKSTÜCKES AUS METALL, INSBESONDERE ZUM HERSTELLEN EINES TOPFFÖRMIGEN BAUTEILS FÜR DIE AUTOMOBILINDUSTRIE[2016/46]
English:DEVICE AND METHOD FOR MACHINING A WORKPIECE CONSISTING OF METAL, PARTICULARLY FOR PRODUCING A CUP-SHAPED COMPONENT FOR THE AUTOMOBILE INDUSTRY[2016/46]
French:DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ POUR USINER UNE PIÈCE EN MÉTAL, EN PARTICULIER POUR FABRIQUER UN ÉLÉMENT EN FORME DE POT POUR L'INDUSTRIE AUTOMOBILE[2016/46]
Former [2014/41]VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM BEARBEITEN EINES WERKSTÜCKES AUS METALL, INSBESONDERE ZUM HERSTELLEN EINES TOPFFÖRMIGEN BAUTEILS FÜR DIE AUTOMOBILINDUSTRIE UND EIN SOLCHES WERKSTÜCK
Former [2014/41]DEVICE AND METHOD FOR MACHINING A WORKPIECE CONSISTING OF METAL, PARTICULARLY FOR PRODUCING A CUP-SHAPED COMPONENT FOR THE AUTOMOBILE INDUSTRY, AS WELL AS SUCH A WORKPIECE
Former [2014/41]DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ POUR USINER UNE PIÈCE EN MÉTAL, EN PARTICULIER POUR FABRIQUER UN ÉLÉMENT EN FORME DE POT POUR L'INDUSTRIE AUTOMOBILE ET PIÈCE CORRESPONDANTE
Entry into regional phase03.07.2014National basic fee paid 
03.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
03.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.06.2013Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
03.07.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/41]
12.08.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.11.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.10.2016Date of oral proceedings
28.10.2016Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
07.11.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.03.2017Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
10.03.2017Fee for grant paid
10.03.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
05.04.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.04.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  12.08.2015
Opposition(s)01.03.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/19]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
10.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
29.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipDK31.05.2017
EE31.05.2017
HR31.05.2017
LT31.05.2017
LV31.05.2017
MC31.05.2017
MT31.05.2017
SI31.05.2017
SM31.05.2017
BG31.08.2017
NO31.08.2017
GR01.09.2017
IS30.09.2017
[2018/52]
Former [2018/43]DK31.05.2017
EE31.05.2017
HR31.05.2017
LT31.05.2017
LV31.05.2017
MT31.05.2017
SI31.05.2017
SM31.05.2017
BG31.08.2017
NO31.08.2017
GR01.09.2017
IS30.09.2017
Former [2018/25]DK31.05.2017
EE31.05.2017
HR31.05.2017
LT31.05.2017
LV31.05.2017
SI31.05.2017
SM31.05.2017
BG31.08.2017
NO31.08.2017
GR01.09.2017
IS30.09.2017
Former [2018/13]DK31.05.2017
EE31.05.2017
HR31.05.2017
LT31.05.2017
LV31.05.2017
SM31.05.2017
BG31.08.2017
NO31.08.2017
GR01.09.2017
IS30.09.2017
Former [2018/09]DK31.05.2017
EE31.05.2017
HR31.05.2017
LT31.05.2017
LV31.05.2017
BG31.08.2017
NO31.08.2017
GR01.09.2017
IS30.09.2017
Former [2017/50]HR31.05.2017
LT31.05.2017
LV31.05.2017
BG31.08.2017
NO31.08.2017
GR01.09.2017
IS30.09.2017
Former [2017/49]HR31.05.2017
LT31.05.2017
NO31.08.2017
GR01.09.2017
IS30.09.2017
Cited inInternational search[XYI]US2008098789  (HORI YUICHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,6,7 * abstract * [Y] 4 [I] 3,5;
 [XYI]US2010064759  (KONDO KIYOHITO [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,6,7 * abstract * [Y] 4 [I] 3,5;
 [XAY]JP2011056573  (KEYLEX CORP) [X] 7 * abstract * [A] 1-3,5,6 [Y] 4;
 [XA]DE19724766  (FORSCHUNGSGES UMFORMTECHNIK [DE]) [X] 7 * abstract * [A] 1-6;
 [XPI]WO2012123583  (SCHULER PRESSEN GMBH [DE], et al) [XP] 1,2,6,7 * abstract * [I] 3-5
by applicantDE10254103
 DE2727174
 DE102007050581