Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2828535 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2828535



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 428
25.10.2019 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
25.10.2019 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
25.10.2019 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
25.10.2019 Text intended for grant Search / examination 62
25.10.2019 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 62
27.02.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
27.02.2019 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 7
27.02.2019 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 6
27.02.2019 Claims Search / examination 7
27.02.2019 Description Search / examination 6
27.02.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
27.02.2019 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
17.10.2018 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
17.10.2018 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
11.10.2018 Examination started Search / examination 1
19.07.2018 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 2
16.07.2018 Notification regarding date of start of examination with possibility to withdraw Search / examination 1
16.07.2018 Request for change of name - applicant Search / examination 5
20.08.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
20.08.2015 Statement of non-availability of priority search results Search / examination 1
06.07.2015 Document concerning representation Search / examination 3
03.07.2015 Invitation to file a copy of search results(priority) Search / examination 1
18.05.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
18.05.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
18.05.2015 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
12.05.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
12.05.2015 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 7
12.05.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 10
12.05.2015 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 5
12.05.2015 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 5
12.05.2015 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 4
12.05.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
09.03.2015 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
16.02.2015 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
08.01.2015 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
13.11.2014 Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
27.10.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
27.10.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
27.10.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
27.10.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
08.10.2014 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 6
13.08.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
13.08.2014 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
30.07.2014 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
05.11.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 39
26.09.2013 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
26.09.2013 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
26.09.2013 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 64
26.07.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
26.07.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
26.07.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
20.03.2013 (Electronic) Receipt PCT receiving Office 2
20.03.2013 Abstract PCT receiving Office 1
20.03.2013 Claims PCT receiving Office 10
20.03.2013 Description PCT receiving Office 40
20.03.2013 Drawings PCT receiving Office 12