Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2828535

EP2828535 - SUCTION UNIT AND SUCTION MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  24.10.2019
Database last updated on 13.11.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  19.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip24.10.2019New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Alfred Kärcher SE & Co. KG
Alfred-Kärcher-Strasse 28-40
71364 Winnenden / DE
[2018/34]
Former [2015/05]For all designated states
Alfred Kärcher GmbH & Co. KG
Alfred-Kärcher-Strasse 28-40
71364 Winnenden / DE
Inventor(s)01 / TREITZ, Felix
Hirschstrasse 10
73663 Berglen / DE
02 / EBERT, Florian
Fritz-Reuter-Strasse 23
70193 Stuttgart / DE
03 / DIEHL, Ralph
Bebelstrasse 8
73666 Baltmannsweiler / DE
04 / ZERRER, Thomas
Rolandstrasse 7
73663 Berglen / DE
 [2015/26]
Former [2015/05]01 / TREITZ, Felix
Ob der Hecke 11
71364 Winnenden / DE
02 / EBERT, Florian
Fritz-Reuter-Strasse 23
70193 Stuttgart / DE
03 / DIEHL, Ralph
Bebelstrasse 8
73666 Baltmannsweiler / DE
04 / ZERRER, Thomas
Rolandstrasse 7
73663 Berglen / DE
Representative(s)Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Uhlandstrasse 14c
70182 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [2015/05]Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Patentanwälte
Uhlandstrasse 14c
70182 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date13711653.920.03.2013
WO2013EP55786
Priority number, dateDE20121010249322.03.2012         Original published format: DE102012102493
[2015/05]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013139838
Date:26.09.2013
Language:DE
[2013/39]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2828535
Date:28.01.2015
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.09.2013
[2015/05]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP26.09.2013
ClassificationInternational:F04D29/66
[2015/05]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/05]
TitleGerman:SAUGAGGREGAT UND SAUGMASCHINE[2015/05]
English:SUCTION UNIT AND SUCTION MACHINE[2015/05]
French:UNITÉ D'ASPIRATION ET MACHINE D'ASPIRATION[2015/05]
Entry into regional phase13.08.2014National basic fee paid 
13.08.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
13.08.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.08.2014Examination requested  [2015/05]
12.05.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
17.10.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.02.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.10.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  17.10.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
24.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
29.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
27.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
25.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Cited inInternational search[X]US2884185  (DOLAN FRANCIS D) [X] 1-60 * the whole document * * figure 1 *;
 [X]EP0803224  (ELECTROLUX AB [SE]) [X] 1-60 * the whole document * * column 3, lines 10-17; figure 4 *;
 [X]JP2004279779  (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP, et al) [X] 1-60 * abstract * * figure 1 *;
 [X]US4617034  (IKEZAKI KATSUJI [JP], et al) [X] 1-60 * figures 4-6 *;
 [X]EP1726244  (SAMSUNG KWANGJU ELECTRONICS CO [KR]) [X] 1-60 * figure 2 *
by applicantUS5622485
 US4088424
 DE3023630
 EP1404203
 DE60007159T