Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2828656

EP2828656 - METHOD FOR MONITORING HIV SPECIFIC T CELL RESPONSES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  16.08.2019
Database last updated on 21.10.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  28.03.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  09.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.08.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Fundació Privada Institut de Recerca de la SIDA-Caixa
Hospital Universitari Germans Trias i Pujol Carretera de Canyet, s/n
08916 Badalona / ES
[2018/13]
Former [2015/05]For all designated states
LABORATORIOS DEL DR. ESTEVE, S.A.
Av. Mare de Déu de Montserrat, 221
08041 Barcelona / ES
For all designated states
Fundació Privada Institut de Recerca de la SIDA-Caixa
Hospital Universitari Germans Trias i Pujol Carretera de Canyet, s/n
08916 Badalona / ES
For all designated states
Institució Catalana de Recerca i Estudis Avançats
Passeig Lluís Companys, 23
08010 Barcelona / ES
Inventor(s)01 / RUIZ RIOL, Marta
Vilafranca de Penedes 1, 1º 1ª
E-17320 Tossa de Mar / ES
02 / BRANDER, Christian
Can Bruguera 3-5
Esc A
Bj 1a
E-08391 Tiana / ES
03 / IBARRONDO, Javier
11006 Rhoda Way
Culver City, California 90230 / US
 [2019/37]
Former [2015/05]01 / RUIZ RIOL, Marta
Plaza Aragón 40
3º 2ª
E-08915 Badalona / ES
02 / BRANDER, Christian
Can Bruguera 3-5
Esc A
Bj 1a
E-08391 Tiana / ES
03 / IBARRONDO, Javier
11006 Rhoda Way
Culver City, California 90230 / US
Representative(s)ABG Intellectual Property Law, S.L.
Avenida de Burgos, 16D
Edificio Euromor
28036 Madrid / ES
[2019/38]
Former [2015/05]ABG Patentes, S.L.
Avenida de Burgos, 16D
Edificio Euromor
28036 Madrid / ES
Application number, filing date13711681.022.03.2013
[2019/38]
WO2013EP56110
Priority number, dateEP2012038210923.03.2012         Original published format: EP 12382109
US201261615038P23.03.2012         Original published format: US 201261615038 P
[2015/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013139972
Date:26.09.2013
Language:EN
[2013/39]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2828656
Date:28.01.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.09.2013
[2015/05]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2828656
Date:18.09.2019
Language:EN
[2019/38]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP26.09.2013
ClassificationInternational:G01N33/50, G01N33/569
[2015/05]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/05]
Extension statesBA07.10.2014
ME07.10.2014
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR ÜBERWACHUNG HIV-SPEZIFISCHER T-ZELL-ANTWORTEN[2015/05]
English:METHOD FOR MONITORING HIV SPECIFIC T CELL RESPONSES[2015/05]
French:PROCÉDÉ PERMETTANT DE SURVEILLER LES RÉPONSES DES LYMPHOCYTES T SPÉCIFIQUES DU VIH[2019/16]
Former [2015/05]PROCÉDÉ POUR SURVEILLER DES RÉPONSES DE LYMPHOCYTES T SPÉCIFIQUES DU VIH
Entry into regional phase07.10.2014National basic fee paid 
07.10.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
07.10.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.10.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
07.10.2014Examination requested  [2015/05]
04.12.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
27.05.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.08.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.01.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.04.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.08.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.11.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.03.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.03.2019Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 11.03.2019
11.03.2019Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
29.03.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.08.2019Fee for grant paid
06.08.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
06.08.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  04.12.2015
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
04.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
06.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
06.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
06.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Cited inInternational search[XY]  - M. RICHMOND ET AL, "Epitope Mapping of HIV-Specific CD8+ T Cell Responses by Multiple Immunological Readouts Reveals Distinct Specificities Defined by Function", JOURNAL OF VIROLOGY, (20110201), vol. 85, no. 3, doi:10.1128/JVI.01707-10, ISSN 0022-538X, pages 1275 - 1286, XP055045478 [X] 1-11,14,22 * abstract * * page 1276, column 1, lines 25-27 * * page 1276, column 1, line 38 - page 1276, column 2, line 5 * * page 1276, column 2, lines 6-10 * * page 1277, column 2, line 5 - page 1278, column 1, line 13 * [Y] 12,13,15-21,23-29

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/JVI.01707-10
 [XI]  - BETTS MICHAEL R ET AL, "HIV nonprogressors preferentially maintain highly functional HIV-specific CD8(+) T cells", BLOOD, AMERICAN SOCIETY OF HEMATOLOGY, US, vol. 107, no. 12, doi:10.1182/BLOOD-2005-12-4818, ISSN 0006-4971, (20060615), pages 4781 - 4789, (20060207), XP002565549 [X] 1-3,5-11,14,22 * page 4781, column 2, lines 15-22 * * page 4782, column 1, lines 49-60 * * page 4783, column 1, line 40 - page 4783, column 2, line 25 * * page 4783, column 2, lines 48-51 * * page 4782, column 1, lines 41-42 * * figures 1-2 * * page 4782, column 1, lines 2-7 * * page 4783, column 2, line 65 - page 4785, column 2, line 15 * [I] 4,12,13,15-21,23-29

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1182/blood-2005-12-4818
 [XI]  - FATEMA A. LEGRAND ET AL, "Strong HIV-1-Specific T Cell Responses in HIV-1-Exposed Uninfected Infants and Neonates Revealed after Regulatory T Cell Removal", PLOS ONE, (20060101), vol. 1, no. 1, doi:10.1371/journal.pone.0000102, ISSN 1932-6203, pages 1 - 10, XP055045479 [X] 1-3,5-11,14,22 * page 2, column 1, line 56 - page 3, column 2, line 3 * * page 2, column 1, lines 57-59 * * page 2, column 2, lines 60-63 * * page 3, column 1, lines 10-17 * * page 6, column 2, lines 1-6 * * page 5, column 2, line 5 - page 6, column 2, line 21 * * figures 2-3 * [I] 4,12,13,15-21,23-29

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pone.0000102
 [XY]  - PRATIP K. CHATTOPADHYAY ET AL, "Good cell, bad cell: Flow cytometry reveals T-cell subsets important in HIV disease", CYTOMETRY PART A, (20100701), vol. 77A, no. 7, doi:10.1002/cyto.a.20905, ISSN 1552-4922, pages 614 - 622, XP055045480 [X] 1-3,5-11,14,22 * abstract * * page 618, column 1, line 18 - page 618, column 2, line 29 * * page 620, column 1, lines 28-33 * [Y] 4,12,13,15-21,23-29

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/cyto.a.20905
 [XY]  - PETER W. HUNT ET AL, "A Low T Regulatory Cell Response May Contribute to Both Viral Control and Generalized Immune Activation in HIV Controllers", PLOS ONE, (20110101), vol. 6, no. 1, doi:10.1371/journal.pone.0015924, ISSN 1932-6203, pages 1 - 10, XP055045482 [X] 1-3,5-11,14,22 * abstract * * page 2, column 1, lines 16-20 * * page 3, column 2, lines 8-10 * * page 8, column 1, lines 1-26 * [Y] 4,12,13,15-21,23-29

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pone.0015924
 [XY]  - PAULINE MEIJ ET AL, "Identification and prevalence of CD8+ T-cell responses directed against Epstein-Barr virus-encoded latent membrane protein 1 and latent membrane protein 2", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF CANCER, (20020501), vol. 99, no. 1, doi:10.1002/ijc.10309, ISSN 0020-7136, pages 93 - 99, XP055063518 [X] 1-3,5-11,14,22 * abstract * * page 93, column 1, line 34 - page 94, column 1, line 2 * * page 94, column 1, lines 19-50 * * page 94, column 2, lines 14-17 * * page 97, column 1, lines 5-9 * [Y] 4,12,13,15-21,23-29

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/ijc.10309
 [XY]  - J. D. LUNEMANN ET AL, "EBNA1-specific T cells from patients with multiple sclerosis cross react with myelin antigens and co-produce IFN- and IL-2", BLOOD, (20080728), vol. 107, no. 12, doi:10.1084/jem.20031598, ISSN 0006-4971, pages 4781 - 1773, XP055063557 [X] 1-3,5-11,14,22 * abstract * * page 1765, column 1, lines 31-36 * * page 1765, column 1, lines 48-53 * * page 1765, column 2, lines 10-16 * * page 1766, column 1, lines 1-3 * * page 1766, column 2, lines 5-19 * * page 1769, column 1, lines 37-48 * * page 1769, column 2, lines 27-30 * * page 1770, column 2, line 30 - page 1771, column 1, line 3 * [Y] 4,12,13,15-21,23-29

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1084/jem.20072397
 [XY]  - W. ZHOU ET AL, "Impact of donor CMV status on viral infection and reconstitution of multifunction CMV-specific T cells in CMV-positive transplant recipients", BLOOD, (20090618), vol. 113, no. 25, doi:10.1182/blood-2009-02-203307, ISSN 0006-4971, pages 6465 - 6476, XP055045483 [X] 1-3,5-11,14,22 * abstract * * page 6466, column 1, lines 1-7 * * page 6466, column 1, line 38 - page 6466, column 2, line 2 * * page 6469, column 1, lines 3-5 * * page 6470, column 2, lines 4-6 * * page 6473, column 2, lines 35-38 * [Y] 4,12,13,15-21,23-29

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1182/blood-2009-02-203307
 [Y]  - KOLLS J K ET AL, "The role of Th17 cytokines in primary mucosal immunity", CYTOKINE AND GROWTH FACTOR REVIEWS, ELSEVIER LTD, GB, vol. 21, no. 6, ISSN 1359-6101, (20101201), pages 443 - 448, (20101201), XP027543806 [Y] 1-29 * abstract * * page 443, column 1, line 8 - page 443, column 2, line 8 * * page 444, column 1, lines 12-15 * * page 444, column 1, lines 21-24 * * page 444, column 2, lines 11-14 * * page 445, column 1, lines 7-10 * * page 445, column 1, line 59 - page 445, column 2, line 4 * * page 445, column 2, lines 51-57 * * page 445, column 2, lines 63-66 * * page 446, column 1, lines 33-44 *
 [YD]  - NICOLE FRAHM ET AL, "Increased sequence diversity coverage improves detection of HIV-specific T cell responses.", THE JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, (20071101), vol. 179, no. 10, ISSN 0022-1767, pages 6638 - 6650, XP055045486 [YD] 1-29 * abstract * * page 6638, column 2, lines 7-24 * * page 6639, column 2, lines 45-54 * * page 6639, column 2, lines 67-70 * * page 6641, column 1, lines 15-20 * * page 6643, column 1, lines 1-2 * * page 6643, column 2, lines 5-14 * * page 6646, column 1, lines 16-21 * * page 6646, column 2, lines 19-25 * * page 6646, column 2, lines 30-32 * * page 6647, column 2, lines 7-12 * * page 6648, column 2, lines 5-10 * * page 6648, column 2, lines 50-55 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.4049/jimmunol.179.10.6638
 [YD]  - BRANDER C ET AL., "Capturing viral diversity for in-vitro test reagents and HIV vaccine immunogen design", CURR. OPIN. HIV AIDS, (2007), vol. 2, no. 3, doi:10.1097/COH.0b013e3280f3bfe2, pages 183 - 188, XP009164948 [YD] 1-29 * page 186, column 1, lines 15-20 * * page 186, column 1, lines 39-45 * * page 186, column 1, line 56 - page 186, column 2, line 5 * * page 186, column 2, lines 15-28 * * page 187, column 2, lines 14-21 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1097/COH.0b013e3280f3bfe2
Examination   - LAURIE LAMOREAUX ET AL, "Intracellular cytokine optimization and standard operating procedure", NATURE PROTOCOLS, GB, (20061101), vol. 1, no. 3, doi:10.1038/nprot.2006.268, ISSN 1754-2189, pages 1507 - 1516, XP055296298

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nprot.2006.268
by applicant   - BRANDER C ET AL., CURR. OPIN. IMMUNOL., (2006), vol. 18, no. 4, pages 430 - 437
    - GASCHEN B ET AL., SCIENCE, (2002), vol. 296, pages 2354 - 2360
    - YUSIM K ET AL., J. VIROL., (2002), vol. 76, no. 17, pages 8757 - 8768
    - FRAHM N ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (2007), vol. 179, pages 6638 - 6650
    - ADLER M ET AL., BRIT. MED. J., (1987), vol. 294, pages 1145 - 1147
    - BEYRER, C. ET AL., J.INFECT.DIS., (1999), vol. 79, pages 59 - 68
    - DEEKS S ET AL., IMMUNITY, (2007), vol. 27, pages 406 - 416
    - FERRE A ET AL., BLOOD, (2009), vol. 113, no. 17, pages 3978 - 3989
    - LAMOREAUX, L., NAT PROTOC., (2006), vol. 1, pages 1507 - 1516