Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2815380

EP2815380 - IMAGE RESOLUTION ENHANCEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.03.2019
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  23.03.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  15.11.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  06.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip15.11.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 18.12.2019  [2019/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips N.V.
High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
[2018/17]
Former [2014/52]For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips N.V.
High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
Inventor(s)01 / LAMASH, Yechiel
c/o High Tech Campus 44
NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
02 / GOSHEN, Liran
c/o High Tech Campus 44
NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
 [2014/52]
Representative(s)Steffen, Thomas
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards
High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
[2018/17]
Former [2014/52]Steffen, Thomas
Philips
Intellectual Property & Standards
P.O. Box 220
5600 AE Eindhoven / NL
Application number, filing date13711958.230.01.2013
[2018/17]
WO2013IB50785
Priority number, dateUS201261598366P14.02.2012         Original published format: US 201261598366 P
[2014/52]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013121312
Date:22.08.2013
Language:EN
[2013/34]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2815380
Date:24.12.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.08.2013
[2014/52]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2815380
Date:25.04.2018
Language:EN
[2018/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP22.08.2013
ClassificationInternational:G06T3/40
[2014/52]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/52]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:BILDAUFLÖSUNGSERHÖHUNG[2014/52]
English:IMAGE RESOLUTION ENHANCEMENT[2014/52]
French:AMÉLIORATION DE RÉSOLUTION D'IMAGE[2014/52]
Entry into regional phase15.09.2014National basic fee paid 
15.09.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
15.09.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.09.2014Examination requested  [2014/52]
26.01.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
27.07.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
04.02.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.05.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.09.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.05.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.09.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.11.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.03.2018Fee for grant paid
16.03.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
16.03.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  27.07.2015
Opposition(s)28.01.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/14]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
01.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
31.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
31.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL25.04.2018
AT25.04.2018
CZ25.04.2018
DK25.04.2018
EE25.04.2018
ES25.04.2018
FI25.04.2018
HR25.04.2018
IT25.04.2018
LT25.04.2018
LV25.04.2018
MC25.04.2018
NL25.04.2018
PL25.04.2018
RO25.04.2018
RS25.04.2018
SE25.04.2018
SI25.04.2018
SK25.04.2018
SM25.04.2018
BG25.07.2018
NO25.07.2018
GR26.07.2018
PT27.08.2018
[2019/51]
Former [2019/40]AT25.04.2018
CZ25.04.2018
DK25.04.2018
EE25.04.2018
ES25.04.2018
FI25.04.2018
HR25.04.2018
IT25.04.2018
LT25.04.2018
LV25.04.2018
MC25.04.2018
NL25.04.2018
PL25.04.2018
RO25.04.2018
RS25.04.2018
SE25.04.2018
SI25.04.2018
SK25.04.2018
SM25.04.2018
BG25.07.2018
NO25.07.2018
GR26.07.2018
PT27.08.2018
Former [2019/26]AT25.04.2018
CZ25.04.2018
DK25.04.2018
EE25.04.2018
ES25.04.2018
FI25.04.2018
HR25.04.2018
IT25.04.2018
LT25.04.2018
LV25.04.2018
NL25.04.2018
PL25.04.2018
RO25.04.2018
RS25.04.2018
SE25.04.2018
SI25.04.2018
SK25.04.2018
SM25.04.2018
BG25.07.2018
NO25.07.2018
GR26.07.2018
PT27.08.2018
Former [2019/11]AT25.04.2018
CZ25.04.2018
DK25.04.2018
EE25.04.2018
ES25.04.2018
FI25.04.2018
HR25.04.2018
IT25.04.2018
LT25.04.2018
LV25.04.2018
NL25.04.2018
PL25.04.2018
RO25.04.2018
RS25.04.2018
SE25.04.2018
SK25.04.2018
SM25.04.2018
BG25.07.2018
NO25.07.2018
GR26.07.2018
PT27.08.2018
Former [2019/10]AT25.04.2018
CZ25.04.2018
DK25.04.2018
EE25.04.2018
ES25.04.2018
FI25.04.2018
HR25.04.2018
LT25.04.2018
LV25.04.2018
NL25.04.2018
PL25.04.2018
RO25.04.2018
RS25.04.2018
SE25.04.2018
SK25.04.2018
BG25.07.2018
NO25.07.2018
GR26.07.2018
PT27.08.2018
Former [2019/09]DK25.04.2018
EE25.04.2018
ES25.04.2018
FI25.04.2018
HR25.04.2018
LT25.04.2018
LV25.04.2018
NL25.04.2018
PL25.04.2018
RS25.04.2018
SE25.04.2018
BG25.07.2018
NO25.07.2018
GR26.07.2018
PT27.08.2018
Former [2019/08]DK25.04.2018
ES25.04.2018
FI25.04.2018
HR25.04.2018
LT25.04.2018
LV25.04.2018
NL25.04.2018
PL25.04.2018
RS25.04.2018
SE25.04.2018
BG25.07.2018
NO25.07.2018
GR26.07.2018
PT27.08.2018
Former [2019/03]ES25.04.2018
FI25.04.2018
HR25.04.2018
LT25.04.2018
LV25.04.2018
NL25.04.2018
PL25.04.2018
RS25.04.2018
SE25.04.2018
BG25.07.2018
NO25.07.2018
GR26.07.2018
PT27.08.2018
Former [2018/52]ES25.04.2018
FI25.04.2018
HR25.04.2018
LT25.04.2018
LV25.04.2018
NL25.04.2018
PL25.04.2018
RS25.04.2018
SE25.04.2018
BG25.07.2018
NO25.07.2018
GR26.07.2018
Former [2018/51]ES25.04.2018
FI25.04.2018
HR25.04.2018
LT25.04.2018
LV25.04.2018
NL25.04.2018
PL25.04.2018
RS25.04.2018
SE25.04.2018
BG25.07.2018
NO25.07.2018
Former [2018/50]ES25.04.2018
FI25.04.2018
HR25.04.2018
LT25.04.2018
NL25.04.2018
PL25.04.2018
SE25.04.2018
BG25.07.2018
NO25.07.2018
Former [2018/49]ES25.04.2018
FI25.04.2018
LT25.04.2018
NL25.04.2018
PL25.04.2018
SE25.04.2018
BG25.07.2018
NO25.07.2018
Former [2018/47]ES25.04.2018
FI25.04.2018
LT25.04.2018
NL25.04.2018
NO25.07.2018
Former [2018/43]NL25.04.2018
Cited inInternational search[A]WO2011037853  (ZIOSOFT INC [US]; MATSUMOTO KAZUHIKO [JP]) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *
 [Y]  - ROUSSEAU ET AL, "Registration-Based Approach for Reconstruction of High-Resolution In Utero Fetal MR Brain Images", ACADEMIC RADIOLOGY, RESTON, VA, US, (20060901), vol. 13, no. 9, pages 1072 - 1081, XP005621997 [Y] 1-20 * page 3, paragraph 4 - page 5, paragraph 2 * * page 6, paragraph 5; figure 7 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.acra.2006.05.003
 [Y]  - IRANI M ET AL, "IMPROVING RESOLUTION BY IMAGE REGISTRATION", CVGIP GRAPHICAL MODELS AND IMAGE PROCESSING, ACADEMIC PRESS, DULUTH, MA, US., (19910501), vol. 53, no. 3, pages 231 - 239, XP000200576 [Y] 1-20 * page 233, column l, paragraph 6 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/1049-9652(91)90045-L
 [A]  - DIEHL N, "OBJECT-ORIENTED MOTION ESTIMATION AND SEGMENTATION IN IMAGE SEQUENCES", SIGNAL PROCESSING. IMAGE COMMUNICATION, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, (19910201), vol. 3, no. 1, pages 23 - 56, XP000234779 [A] 1-20 * page 24, column l, paragraph 3 * * page 41, column r, paragraph 2; figures 12-1417-19 * * page 44, column r, paragraph 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0923-5965(91)90028-Z
 [A]  - CHIANG M-C ET AL, "Efficient Super-Resolution via Image Warping", IMAGE AND VISION COMPUTING, ELSEVIER, GUILDFORD, GB, (20000701), vol. 18, no. 10, pages 761 - 771, XP003012934 [A] 8 * page 764, column l, paragraph 1 - paragraph 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0262-8856(99)00044-X
 [A]  - HONGMEI ZHANG ET AL, "Super-Resolution Reconstruction of Deformable Tissue from Temporal Sequence of Ultrasound Images", ARTIFICIAL INTELLIGENCE AND COMPUTATIONAL INTELLIGENCE (AICI), 2010 INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20101023), ISBN 978-1-4244-8432-4, pages 337 - 342, XP031817205 [A] 1-20 * the whole document *
 [A]  - JOSE L RUBIO-GUIVERNAU ET AL, "Respiratory motion correction in PET with super-resolution techniques and non-rigid registration", NUCLEAR SCIENCE SYMPOSIUM CONFERENCE RECORD, 2007. NSS '07. IEEE., (20071001), pages 3560 - 3563, XP031206380 [A] 1-20 * the whole document *
 [A]  - GUORONG WU ET AL, Estimating the 4D Respiratory Lung Motion by Spatiotemporal Registration and Building Super-Resolution Image, MEDICAL IMAGE COMPUTING AND COMPUTER-ASSISTED INTERVENTION - MICCAI 2011, SPRINGER , HEIDELBERG, PAGE(S) 532 - 539, (20110918), XP019165623 [A] 1-20 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/978-3-642-23623-5_67
 [A]  - MCINERNEY T ET AL, "A DYNAMIC FINITE ELEMENT SURFACE MODEL FOR SEGMENTATION AND TRACKING IN MULTIDIMENSIONAL MEDICAL IMAGES WITH APPLICATION TO TO CARDIAC 4D IMAGE ANALYSIS", COMPUTERIZED MEDICAL IMAGING AND GRAPHICS, PERGAMON PRESS, NEW YORK, NY, US, (19950101), vol. 19, no. 1, pages 69 - 83, XP000934040 [A] 2-10,12-19 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0895-6111(94)00040-9
 [A]  - BORMAN S ET AL, "Spatial Resolution Enhancement of Low-Resolution Image Sequences: A Comprehensive Review with Directions for Future Research", INTERNET CITATION, (19980708), URL: http://www.seanborman.com/publications/SRreview.pdf, (19980708), XP002299310 [A] 1-20 * the whole document *
ExaminationWO2011037853
    - MANZKE R ET AL, "Automatic phase determination for retrospectively gated cardiac CT", MEDICAL PHYSICS, AIP, MELVILLE, NY, US, (20041122), vol. 31, no. 12, pages 3345 - 3362, XP012075107

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1118/1.1791351
    - BASCLE B ET AL, "MOTION DEBLURRING AND SUPER-RESOLUTION FROM AN IMAGE SEQUENCE", EUROPEAN CONFERENCE ON COMPUTER VISION, BERLIN, DE, (19960101), vol. 2, pages 573 - 582, XP008025986
    - KACHELRIESS MARC ET AL, "Electrocardiogram-correlated image reconstruction from subsecond spiral computed tomography scans of the heart", MEDICAL PHYSICS, AIP, MELVILLE, NY, US, (19981201), vol. 25, no. 12, pages 2417 - 2431, XP012010385

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1118/1.598453
    - RUAN S ET AL, "Three-dimensional motion and reconstruction of coronary arteries from biplane cineangiography", IMAGE AND VISION COMPUTING, ELSEVIER, GUILDFORD, GB, (19941201), vol. 12, no. 10, pages 683 - 689, XP024237720

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0262-8856(94)90043-4
    - REINERTSEN ET AL, "Validation of vessel-based registration for correction of brain shift", MEDICAL IMAGE ANALYSIS, OXFORD UNIVERSITY PRESS, OXFORD, GB, (20070630), vol. 11, no. 4, pages 374 - 388, XP022136642

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.media.2007.04.002