Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2828865

EP2828865 - WIRELESS POWER TRANSFER APPARATUS AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  27.04.2018
Database last updated on 21.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip03.11.2019New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
WiTricity Corporation
57 Water Street
Watertown, MA 02472 / US
[2019/15]
Former [2015/05]For all designated states
Qualcomm Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US
Inventor(s)01 / KEELING, Nicholas A.
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
02 / VAN BOHEEMEN, Edward
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
03 / KISSIN, Michael
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
04 / BEAVER, Jonathan
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
 [2015/05]
Representative(s)Tomkins & Co
5 Dartmouth Road
Dublin 6 / IE
[N/P]
Former [2015/05]Roche, Dermot , et al
Tomkins & Co.
5 Dartmouth Road
Dublin 6 / IE
Application number, filing date13712010.106.03.2013
WO2013US29376
Priority number, dateUS201261613392P20.03.2012         Original published format: US 201261613392 P
US20121367144707.11.2012         Original published format: US201213671447
[2015/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013142064
Date:26.09.2013
Language:EN
[2013/39]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2828865
Date:28.01.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.09.2013
[2015/05]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP26.09.2013
ClassificationInternational:H01F27/02, H01F38/14
[2015/05]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/05]
TitleGerman:DRAHTLOSE STROMÜBERTRAGUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG[2015/05]
English:WIRELESS POWER TRANSFER APPARATUS AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURE[2015/05]
French:APPAREIL DE TRANSFERT DE PUISSANCE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION[2015/05]
Entry into regional phase19.08.2014National basic fee paid 
19.08.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
19.08.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.08.2014Examination requested  [2015/05]
28.04.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.05.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.09.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.11.2019Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  03.05.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
08.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
07.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
08.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.201907   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[XI]US2008129246  (MORITA KATSUAKI [JP] ET AL) [X] 1-6,8-20,22-26 * abstract * * paragraph [0092] - paragraph [0098]; figures 12-14 * [I] 7,21;
 [XI]DE102006025458  (SEW EURODRIVE GMBH & CO [DE]) [X] 1-4,6-15,17-19,21,23,24,26 * abstract * * paragraph [0085] - paragraph [0090]; figures 6,10,11; claims 1-4 * [I] 5,16,20,22,25;
 [A]DE102010050935  (SEW EURODRIVE GMBH & CO [DE]) [A] 1-26 * abstract * * figures 1-4; claim 1 *