Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2826308

EP2826308 - APPARATUS AND METHOD OF INTER-RADIO ACCESS TECHNOLOGY MEASUREMENT SCHEDULING BASED ON AN UNDETECTED FREQUENCY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.01.2017
Database last updated on 16.11.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Qualcomm Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121 / US
[2015/04]
Inventor(s)01 / WANG, Fan
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121 / US
02 / KHAN, Uzma
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121 / US
03 / TAMBARAM KAILASAM, Sundaresan
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121 / US
04 / MANDADAPU, Krishna Rao
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121 / US
05 / HU, An-Swol Clement
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121 / US
 [2015/04]
Representative(s)Dunlop, Hugh Christopher , et al
Maucher Jenkins
26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2015/04]Dunlop, Hugh Christopher , et al
RGC Jenkins & Co.
26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
Application number, filing date13712106.714.03.2013
[2016/10]
WO2013US31270
Priority number, dateUS201261611356P15.03.2012         Original published format: US 201261611356 P
US20131376409411.02.2013         Original published format: US201313764094
[2015/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013138576
Date:19.09.2013
Language:EN
[2013/38]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2826308
Date:21.01.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.09.2013
[2015/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2826308
Date:09.03.2016
Language:EN
[2016/10]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP19.09.2013
ClassificationInternational:H04W36/30, H04W48/18, // H04W36/14, H04W36/00
[2015/36]
Former International [2015/04]H04W48/18, H04W36/00, H04W36/14, H04W36/30
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/04]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR PLANUNG EINER FUNKZUGANGSTECHNOLOGIENMESSUNG AUF BASIS EINER UNERKANNTEN FREQUENZ[2015/04]
English:APPARATUS AND METHOD OF INTER-RADIO ACCESS TECHNOLOGY MEASUREMENT SCHEDULING BASED ON AN UNDETECTED FREQUENCY[2015/04]
French:APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ DE PLANIFICATION DE MESURES ENTRE TECHNOLOGIES D'ACCÈS RADIO SUR LA BASE D'UNE FRÉQUENCE NON DÉTECTÉE[2015/04]
Entry into regional phase28.08.2014National basic fee paid 
28.08.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
28.08.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.08.2014Examination requested  [2015/04]
23.04.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.09.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.01.2016Fee for grant paid
14.01.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
14.01.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  09.09.2015
Opposition(s)12.12.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2017/07]
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU14.03.2013
AL09.03.2016
AT09.03.2016
BE09.03.2016
CY09.03.2016
CZ09.03.2016
DK09.03.2016
EE09.03.2016
ES09.03.2016
FI09.03.2016
HR09.03.2016
IT09.03.2016
LT09.03.2016
LV09.03.2016
MC09.03.2016
MK09.03.2016
NL09.03.2016
PL09.03.2016
RO09.03.2016
RS09.03.2016
SE09.03.2016
SI09.03.2016
SK09.03.2016
SM09.03.2016
TR09.03.2016
IE14.03.2016
LU14.03.2016
CH31.03.2016
LI31.03.2016
MT31.03.2016
BG09.06.2016
NO09.06.2016
GR10.06.2016
IS09.07.2016
PT11.07.2016
[2018/46]
Former [2018/45]HU14.03.2013
AT09.03.2016
BE09.03.2016
CY09.03.2016
CZ09.03.2016
DK09.03.2016
EE09.03.2016
ES09.03.2016
FI09.03.2016
HR09.03.2016
IT09.03.2016
LT09.03.2016
LV09.03.2016
MC09.03.2016
MK09.03.2016
NL09.03.2016
PL09.03.2016
RO09.03.2016
RS09.03.2016
SE09.03.2016
SI09.03.2016
SK09.03.2016
SM09.03.2016
TR09.03.2016
IE14.03.2016
LU14.03.2016
CH31.03.2016
LI31.03.2016
MT31.03.2016
BG09.06.2016
NO09.06.2016
GR10.06.2016
IS09.07.2016
PT11.07.2016
Former [2018/31]HU14.03.2013
AT09.03.2016
BE09.03.2016
CY09.03.2016
CZ09.03.2016
DK09.03.2016
EE09.03.2016
ES09.03.2016
FI09.03.2016
HR09.03.2016
IT09.03.2016
LT09.03.2016
LV09.03.2016
MC09.03.2016
MK09.03.2016
NL09.03.2016
PL09.03.2016
RO09.03.2016
RS09.03.2016
SE09.03.2016
SI09.03.2016
SK09.03.2016
SM09.03.2016
IE14.03.2016
LU14.03.2016
CH31.03.2016
LI31.03.2016
MT31.03.2016
BG09.06.2016
NO09.06.2016
GR10.06.2016
IS09.07.2016
PT11.07.2016
Former [2018/30]HU14.03.2013
AT09.03.2016
BE09.03.2016
CY09.03.2016
CZ09.03.2016
DK09.03.2016
EE09.03.2016
ES09.03.2016
FI09.03.2016
HR09.03.2016
IT09.03.2016
LT09.03.2016
LV09.03.2016
MC09.03.2016
MK09.03.2016
MT09.03.2016
NL09.03.2016
PL09.03.2016
RO09.03.2016
RS09.03.2016
SE09.03.2016
SI09.03.2016
SK09.03.2016
SM09.03.2016
IE14.03.2016
LU14.03.2016
CH31.03.2016
LI31.03.2016
BG09.06.2016
NO09.06.2016
GR10.06.2016
IS09.07.2016
PT11.07.2016
Former [2017/47]AT09.03.2016
BE09.03.2016
CZ09.03.2016
DK09.03.2016
EE09.03.2016
ES09.03.2016
FI09.03.2016
HR09.03.2016
IT09.03.2016
LT09.03.2016
LV09.03.2016
MT09.03.2016
NL09.03.2016
PL09.03.2016
RO09.03.2016
RS09.03.2016
SE09.03.2016
SI09.03.2016
SK09.03.2016
SM09.03.2016
IE14.03.2016
CH31.03.2016
LI31.03.2016
BG09.06.2016
NO09.06.2016
GR10.06.2016
IS09.07.2016
PT11.07.2016
Former [2017/37]AT09.03.2016
BE09.03.2016
CZ09.03.2016
DK09.03.2016
EE09.03.2016
ES09.03.2016
FI09.03.2016
HR09.03.2016
IT09.03.2016
LT09.03.2016
LV09.03.2016
NL09.03.2016
PL09.03.2016
RO09.03.2016
RS09.03.2016
SE09.03.2016
SI09.03.2016
SK09.03.2016
SM09.03.2016
IE14.03.2016
CH31.03.2016
LI31.03.2016
BG09.06.2016
NO09.06.2016
GR10.06.2016
IS09.07.2016
PT11.07.2016
Former [2017/19]AT09.03.2016
BE09.03.2016
CZ09.03.2016
DK09.03.2016
EE09.03.2016
ES09.03.2016
FI09.03.2016
HR09.03.2016
IT09.03.2016
LT09.03.2016
LV09.03.2016
NL09.03.2016
PL09.03.2016
RO09.03.2016
RS09.03.2016
SE09.03.2016
SK09.03.2016
SM09.03.2016
IE14.03.2016
CH31.03.2016
LI31.03.2016
BG09.06.2016
NO09.06.2016
GR10.06.2016
IS09.07.2016
PT11.07.2016
Former [2017/07]AT09.03.2016
BE09.03.2016
CZ09.03.2016
DK09.03.2016
EE09.03.2016
ES09.03.2016
FI09.03.2016
HR09.03.2016
IT09.03.2016
LT09.03.2016
LV09.03.2016
NL09.03.2016
PL09.03.2016
RO09.03.2016
RS09.03.2016
SE09.03.2016
SK09.03.2016
SM09.03.2016
IE14.03.2016
CH31.03.2016
LI31.03.2016
NO09.06.2016
GR10.06.2016
IS09.07.2016
PT11.07.2016
Former [2017/03]AT09.03.2016
BE09.03.2016
CZ09.03.2016
EE09.03.2016
ES09.03.2016
FI09.03.2016
HR09.03.2016
IT09.03.2016
LT09.03.2016
LV09.03.2016
NL09.03.2016
PL09.03.2016
RO09.03.2016
RS09.03.2016
SE09.03.2016
SK09.03.2016
SM09.03.2016
NO09.06.2016
GR10.06.2016
IS09.07.2016
PT11.07.2016
Former [2016/51]AT09.03.2016
CZ09.03.2016
EE09.03.2016
ES09.03.2016
FI09.03.2016
HR09.03.2016
LT09.03.2016
LV09.03.2016
NL09.03.2016
PL09.03.2016
RO09.03.2016
RS09.03.2016
SE09.03.2016
SK09.03.2016
SM09.03.2016
BE31.03.2016
NO09.06.2016
GR10.06.2016
IS09.07.2016
PT11.07.2016
Former [2016/50]AT09.03.2016
CZ09.03.2016
EE09.03.2016
ES09.03.2016
FI09.03.2016
HR09.03.2016
LT09.03.2016
LV09.03.2016
NL09.03.2016
PL09.03.2016
RO09.03.2016
RS09.03.2016
SE09.03.2016
SK09.03.2016
SM09.03.2016
BE31.03.2016
NO09.06.2016
GR10.06.2016
IS09.07.2016
Former [2016/49]EE09.03.2016
ES09.03.2016
FI09.03.2016
HR09.03.2016
LT09.03.2016
LV09.03.2016
NL09.03.2016
PL09.03.2016
RS09.03.2016
SE09.03.2016
BE31.03.2016
NO09.06.2016
GR10.06.2016
IS09.07.2016
Former [2016/48]ES09.03.2016
FI09.03.2016
HR09.03.2016
LT09.03.2016
LV09.03.2016
NL09.03.2016
PL09.03.2016
RS09.03.2016
SE09.03.2016
BE31.03.2016
NO09.06.2016
GR10.06.2016
IS09.07.2016
Former [2016/40]ES09.03.2016
FI09.03.2016
HR09.03.2016
LT09.03.2016
LV09.03.2016
NL09.03.2016
PL09.03.2016
RS09.03.2016
SE09.03.2016
BE31.03.2016
NO09.06.2016
GR10.06.2016
Former [2016/39]ES09.03.2016
FI09.03.2016
HR09.03.2016
LT09.03.2016
LV09.03.2016
PL09.03.2016
RS09.03.2016
SE09.03.2016
BE31.03.2016
NO09.06.2016
GR10.06.2016
Former [2016/36]ES09.03.2016
FI09.03.2016
HR09.03.2016
LT09.03.2016
PL09.03.2016
BE31.03.2016
NO09.06.2016
GR10.06.2016
Former [2016/35]ES09.03.2016
FI09.03.2016
HR09.03.2016
NO09.06.2016
GR10.06.2016
Cited inInternational search[A]WO2009054702  (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR], et al) [A] 1-22,34 * abstract * * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0091] - paragraph [0122] * * figure - *;
 [A]US2012052864  (SWAMINATHAN ARVIND [US], et al) [A] 1-22,34 * abstract * * paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0071] - paragraph [0091] * * figure - *;
 [A]US2004023634  (JEONG GIBONG [US], et al) [A] 1-22,34 * abstract * * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0050] * * figure - *;
 [A]EP1921880  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-22,34 * abstract * * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0056] - paragraph [0069] * * figure - *