Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2829206

EP2829206 - SYSTEM FOR SUPPLYING A PRESSURIZED LIQUID, METHOD FOR SUPPLYING A PRESSURIZED LIQUID USING SAID SYSTEM, AND MACHINE FOR PREPARING BEVERAGES THAT INCLUDES SAID SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.08.2017
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.09.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MT
published on 24.10.2018  [2018/43]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MINIMMA ESPRESSO, S.L.
Passeig Pere III n°24, 5è 1a
08242 Manresa / ES
[2015/05]
Inventor(s)01 / SAMSÓ BESORA, Xavier
C. Canó 4 2on 2a
E-08012 Barcelona / ES
02 / MARQUEZ ZAMORA, Ángel
C. Canó 4 2n.
E-08012 Barcelona / ES
 [2015/05]
Representative(s)Ponti & Partners, S.L.P
C. de Consell de Cent 322
08007 Barcelona / ES
[N/P]
Former [2016/40]Oficina Ponti, SLP
C. de Consell de Cent 322
08007 Barcelona / ES
Former [2015/05]Oficina Ponti, SLP
C. Consell de Cent, 322
08007 Barcelona / ES
Application number, filing date13712301.404.02.2013
[2016/40]
WO2013ES70059
Priority number, dateEP2012038204103.02.2012         Original published format: EP 12382041
[2015/05]
Filing languageES
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013113972
Date:08.08.2013
Language:ES
[2013/32]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2829206
Date:28.01.2015
Language:EN
[2015/05]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2829206
Date:05.10.2016
Language:EN
[2016/40]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP08.08.2013
ClassificationInternational:A47J31/36
[2015/05]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/05]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:SYSTEM ZUR ZUFÜHRUNG EINER DRUCKFLÜSSIGKEIT, VERFAHREN ZUR ZUFÜHRUNG EINER DRUCKFLÜSSIGKEIT MITHILFE DES BESAGTEN SYSTEMS SOWIE MASCHINE ZUR ZUBEREITUNG VON GETRÄNKEN MIT DEM BESAGTEN SYSTEM[2015/05]
English:SYSTEM FOR SUPPLYING A PRESSURIZED LIQUID, METHOD FOR SUPPLYING A PRESSURIZED LIQUID USING SAID SYSTEM, AND MACHINE FOR PREPARING BEVERAGES THAT INCLUDES SAID SYSTEM[2015/05]
French:SYSTÈME DE DISTRIBUTION DE LIQUIDE SOUS PRESSION, PROCÉDÉ DE DISTRIBUTION DE LIQUIDE SOUS PRESSION QUI UTILISE LEDIT SYSTÈME ET MACHINE DE PRÉPARATION DE BOISSONS QUI COMPREND LEDIT SYSTÈME[2015/05]
Entry into regional phase06.11.2014Translation filed 
05.08.2014National basic fee paid 
05.08.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
05.08.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDeletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2015/05]
05.08.2014Examination requested  [2015/05]
28.10.2014Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time  [2015/05]
14.12.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.04.2016Fee for grant paid
13.04.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
13.04.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  14.12.2015
Opposition(s)06.07.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/37]
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to file the translation
06.11.2014Request for further processing filed
06.11.2014Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
07.01.2015Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
29.08.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
28.02.201503   M06   Fee paid on   30.07.2015
29.02.201604   M06   Fee paid on   29.08.2016
Lapses during opposition  TooltipEE05.10.2016
FI05.10.2016
HR05.10.2016
LT05.10.2016
LV05.10.2016
MC05.10.2016
RO05.10.2016
RS05.10.2016
SE05.10.2016
SI05.10.2016
SK05.10.2016
SM05.10.2016
BG05.01.2017
NO05.01.2017
MT04.02.2017
IS05.02.2017
[2018/43]
Former [2017/52]EE05.10.2016
FI05.10.2016
HR05.10.2016
LT05.10.2016
LV05.10.2016
MC05.10.2016
RO05.10.2016
RS05.10.2016
SE05.10.2016
SI05.10.2016
SK05.10.2016
SM05.10.2016
BG05.01.2017
NO05.01.2017
IS05.02.2017
Former [2017/42]EE05.10.2016
FI05.10.2016
HR05.10.2016
LT05.10.2016
LV05.10.2016
MC05.10.2016
RO05.10.2016
RS05.10.2016
SE05.10.2016
SK05.10.2016
SM05.10.2016
BG05.01.2017
NO05.01.2017
IS05.02.2017
Former [2017/36]EE05.10.2016
FI05.10.2016
HR05.10.2016
LT05.10.2016
LV05.10.2016
RO05.10.2016
RS05.10.2016
SE05.10.2016
SK05.10.2016
NO05.01.2017
IS05.02.2017
Former [2017/26]FI05.10.2016
HR05.10.2016
LT05.10.2016
LV05.10.2016
RS05.10.2016
SE05.10.2016
NO05.01.2017
IS05.02.2017
Former [2017/12]LV05.10.2016
Cited inInternational search[AD]WO2010113116  (SAMSO BESORA XAVIER [ES]) [AD] 1-15 * page 8, line 16 - page 12, line 31; figure - *;
 [A]US2007227363  (VERNA RAFFAELLO [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0020] - [0029]; figure - *;
 [A]WO2007042893  (SGL ITALIA SRL [IT]; CORTESE VIRGINIO [IT]) [A] 1-15 * page 3, line 3 - page 10, line 3; figure - *;
 [A]GB842006  (WMF WUERTTEMBERG METALLWAREN) [A] 1-15 * page 2, line 1315 - page 5, line 25; figure - *;
 [A]US3269298  (GRUNDMANN JOHN F) [A] 1-15 * column 3, line 18 - column 9, line 12; figure - *;
 [A]WO2010092542  (BRIEL ELECTRODOMESTICOS [PT]; GOMES PEREIRA JORGE HUMBERTO [PT]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0010] - [0025]; figure - *
by applicantWO2010113116