Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2834476

EP2834476 - A SOLAR THERMAL POWER PLANT AND A METHOD FOR OPERATING A SOLAR THERMAL POWER PLANT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2015/07]BACK-UP BOILER SYSTEM FOR A SOLAR THERMAL POWER PLANT BASED ON MOLTEN SALT TECHNOLOGY, A SOLAR THERMAL POWER PLANT AND A METHOD FOR OPERATING A SOLAR THERMAL POWER PLANT
[2019/36]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  10.01.2020
Database last updated on 25.01.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  16.09.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  07.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip10.01.2020(Expected) grantpublished on 12.02.2020 [2020/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Stamicarbon B.V. acting under the name of MT Innovation Center
Mercator 3
6135 KW Sittard / NL
For all designated states
ENEA - Agenzia Nazionale Per Le Nuove Tecnologie, L'Energia e Lo Sviluppo Economico Sostenibile
Lungotevere Thaon di Revel 76
00196 Roma / IT
[2015/07]
Inventor(s)01 / IAQUANIELLO, Gaetano
c/o Viale Castello della Magliana 75
I-00148 Rome / IT
02 / CAPOFERRI, Daniela
c/o Viale Castello della Magliana 75
I-00148 Rome / IT
03 / BARSI, Adriano
c/o Viale Castello della Magliana 75
I-00148 Rome / IT
04 / FABRIZI, Fabrizio
c/o Enea Agenzia Nazionale per le Nuove Tecnologie
l'Energia e lo Sviluppo Economico Sostenibile
Lungotevere Thaon di Revel 76
I-00196 Rome / IT
05 / GAGGIOLI, Walter
c/o Enea Agenzia Nazionale per le Nuove Tecnologie
l'Energia e lo Sviluppo Economico Sostenibile
Lungotevere Thaon di Revel 76
I-00196 Rome / IT
06 / GIACONIA, Alberto
c/o Enea Agenzia Nazionale per le Nuove Tecnologie
l'Energia e lo Sviluppo Economico Sostenibile
Lungotevere Thaon di Revel 76
I-00196 Rome / IT
07 / RINALDI, Luca
c/o Enea Agenzia Nazionale per le Nuove Tecnologie
l'Energia e lo Sviluppo Economico Sostenibile
Lungotevere Thaon di Revel 76
I-00196 Rome / IT
 [2015/07]
Representative(s)V.O.
P.O. Box 87930
2508 DH Den Haag / NL
[2020/07]
Former [2015/07]Jansen, Cornelis Marinus , et al
V.O.
Johan de Wittlaan 7
2517 JR Den Haag / NL
Application number, filing date13712386.519.03.2013
[2020/07]
WO2013NL50203
Priority number, dateEP2012016018719.03.2012         Original published format: EP 12160187
[2015/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013141704
Date:26.09.2013
Language:EN
[2013/39]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2834476
Date:11.02.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.09.2013
[2015/07]
Type: B1  Patent specification
No.:EP2834476
Date:12.02.2020
Language:EN
[2020/07]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP26.09.2013
ClassificationInternational:F01K3/24, F22B1/00, F22B1/02, F01K3/20, F01K3/22, F22B35/00, F22D1/00, F22G5/04
[2019/36]
Former International [2015/07]F01K3/24, F22B1/00, F22B1/02
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/07]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:SONNENWÄRMEKRAFTANLAGE UND VERFAHREN FÜR DEN BETRIEB EINER SONNENWÄRMEKRAFTANLAGE[2019/36]
English:A SOLAR THERMAL POWER PLANT AND A METHOD FOR OPERATING A SOLAR THERMAL POWER PLANT[2019/36]
French:CENTRALE THERMIQUE SOLAIRE ET PROCÉDÉ POUR FAIRE FONCTIONNER UNE CENTRALE THERMIQUE SOLAIRE[2019/36]
Former [2015/07]RESERVEBOILERSYSTEM FÜR EIN SONNENWÄRMEKRAFTWERK AUF DER BASIS VON SCHMELZSALZTECHNOLOGIE, SONNENWÄRMEKRAFTWERK UND VERFAHREN FÜR DEN BETRIEB EINES SONNENWÄRMEKRAFTWERKS
Former [2015/07]BACK-UP BOILER SYSTEM FOR A SOLAR THERMAL POWER PLANT BASED ON MOLTEN SALT TECHNOLOGY, A SOLAR THERMAL POWER PLANT AND A METHOD FOR OPERATING A SOLAR THERMAL POWER PLANT
Former [2015/07]SYSTÈME DE CHAUDIÈRE DE SECOURS POUR UNE CENTRALE HÉLIOTHERMIQUE UTILISANT LA TECHNOLOGIE DES SELS FONDUS, UNE CENTRALE HÉLIOTHERMIQUE ET UN PROCÉDÉ POUR FAIRE FONCTIONNER UNE CENTRALE HÉLIOTHERMIQUE
Entry into regional phase29.09.2014National basic fee paid 
29.09.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
29.09.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.09.2014Examination requested  [2015/07]
18.06.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
10.07.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.10.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.09.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.12.2019Fee for grant paid
27.12.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
27.12.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  10.07.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
29.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
28.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
28.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
19.02.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Cited inInternational search[XYI]US2009320828  (KOKETSU MASAHIKO [JP], et al) [X] 1,5-8,10-13,18-20 * paragraphs [0002] , [0003] , [0006] , [0061] - [0083] - [0089] - [0092]; figure - * [Y] 15-17 [I] 2-4,9,14;
 [XAI]EP1331366  (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]) [X] 1,5-13,18-20 * paragraphs [0017] , [0039] , [0040] , [0046] - [0049]; figures 6,10 * [A] 15,16 [I] 2-4;
 [XAI]US5247907  (LEE JING M [US], et al) [X] 1,5-8,10-13,18-20 * column 3, line 26 - column 5, line 41; figure - * [A] 15,16 [I] 2-4,9,14;
 [A]US2008127647  (LEITNER ARNOLD [US]) [A] 1-16,18 * paragraphs [0021] , [0039] - [0043] - [0046] - [0048] - [0050] , [0052]; figure - *;
 [XA]US2009125152  (SKOWRONSKI MARK JOSEPH [US], et al) [X] 18 * paragraphs [0007] , [0011] , [0014] , [0016] , [0018] , [0020] , [0043] - [0047] - [0049] , [0052] , [0058] , [0072]; figure - * [A] 1-7,13,15,16;
 [XAY]WO2010149614  (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) [X] 18-20 * page 3, line 20 - page 7, line 5 * * page 11, line 12 - page 18, line 7; figure - * [A] 1,5 [Y] 15,16;
 [YA]US2011048006  (CAP DANIEL P [US], et al) [Y] 17 * paragraphs [0008] - [0016]; figure - * [A] 1,15,18;
 [A]DE202008002599U  (FLAGSOL GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-16,18 * paragraphs [0002] - [0011] - [0013] , [0015] , [0018]; figure - *