Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2825031

EP2825031 - MILKING PARLOR ARRANGEMENT WITH AN INNER ROBOT DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.04.2018
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  19.05.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  19.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip11.10.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AT
published on 13.11.2019  [2019/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GEA Farm Technologies GmbH
Siemensstrasse 25-27
59199 Bönen / DE
[2015/04]
Inventor(s)01 / KRONE, Otto
Kötterstrasse 22
49479 Ibbenbüren / DE
02 / SUHR, Olaf
Im Bulte 16a
59302 Oelde / DE
03 / MADER, Thomas
Portlandstrasse 91
33378 Rheda-Wiedenbrück / DE
04 / SCHULZE WARTENHORST, Bernhard
Droste-Hülshoff-Strasse 15
48231 Warendorf / DE
05 / SCHNEIDER, Erich
Bismarkstrasse 35
59229 Ahlen / DE
 [2015/04]
Representative(s)Kleine, Hubertus , et al
Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Am Zwinger 2
33602 Bielefeld / DE
[2017/25]
Former [2015/04]Kleine, Hubertus , et al
Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz
Am Zwinger 2
33602 Bielefeld / DE
Application number, filing date13712514.214.03.2013
[2017/25]
WO2013EP55265
Priority number, dateDE20121010213314.03.2012         Original published format: DE102012102133
[2015/04]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013135829
Date:19.09.2013
Language:DE
[2013/38]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2825031
Date:21.01.2015
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.09.2013
[2015/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2825031
Date:21.06.2017
Language:DE
[2017/25]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP19.09.2013
ClassificationInternational:A01K1/12
[2015/04]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/04]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:MELKSTANDANORDNUNG MIT EINER INNENROBOTERVORRICHTUNG[2015/04]
English:MILKING PARLOR ARRANGEMENT WITH AN INNER ROBOT DEVICE[2015/04]
French:INSTALLATION DE TRAITE COMPORTANT UN DISPOSITIF ROBOTIQUE INTERNE[2015/04]
Entry into regional phase14.10.2014National basic fee paid 
14.10.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
14.10.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.10.2014Examination requested  [2015/04]
18.05.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.12.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.04.2017Fee for grant paid
27.04.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
27.04.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  20.12.2016
Opposition(s)22.03.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/22]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
23.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
23.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCZ21.06.2017
DK21.06.2017
EE21.06.2017
ES21.06.2017
FI21.06.2017
HR21.06.2017
IT21.06.2017
LT21.06.2017
LV21.06.2017
MC21.06.2017
MT21.06.2017
NL21.06.2017
PL21.06.2017
RO21.06.2017
RS21.06.2017
SE21.06.2017
SI21.06.2017
SK21.06.2017
SM21.06.2017
BG21.09.2017
NO21.09.2017
GR22.09.2017
IS21.10.2017
AT14.03.2018
GB14.03.2018
IE14.03.2018
LU14.03.2018
[2019/46]
Former [2019/13]CZ21.06.2017
DK21.06.2017
EE21.06.2017
ES21.06.2017
FI21.06.2017
HR21.06.2017
IT21.06.2017
LT21.06.2017
LV21.06.2017
MC21.06.2017
MT21.06.2017
NL21.06.2017
PL21.06.2017
RO21.06.2017
RS21.06.2017
SE21.06.2017
SI21.06.2017
SK21.06.2017
SM21.06.2017
BG21.09.2017
NO21.09.2017
GR22.09.2017
IS21.10.2017
GB14.03.2018
IE14.03.2018
LU14.03.2018
Former [2019/09]CZ21.06.2017
DK21.06.2017
EE21.06.2017
ES21.06.2017
FI21.06.2017
HR21.06.2017
IT21.06.2017
LT21.06.2017
LV21.06.2017
MC21.06.2017
MT21.06.2017
NL21.06.2017
PL21.06.2017
RO21.06.2017
RS21.06.2017
SE21.06.2017
SI21.06.2017
SK21.06.2017
SM21.06.2017
BG21.09.2017
NO21.09.2017
GR22.09.2017
IS21.10.2017
IE14.03.2018
LU14.03.2018
Former [2019/04]CZ21.06.2017
DK21.06.2017
EE21.06.2017
ES21.06.2017
FI21.06.2017
HR21.06.2017
IT21.06.2017
LT21.06.2017
LV21.06.2017
MC21.06.2017
MT21.06.2017
NL21.06.2017
PL21.06.2017
RO21.06.2017
RS21.06.2017
SE21.06.2017
SI21.06.2017
SK21.06.2017
SM21.06.2017
BG21.09.2017
NO21.09.2017
GR22.09.2017
IS21.10.2017
LU14.03.2018
Former [2018/52]CZ21.06.2017
DK21.06.2017
EE21.06.2017
ES21.06.2017
FI21.06.2017
HR21.06.2017
IT21.06.2017
LT21.06.2017
LV21.06.2017
MC21.06.2017
MT21.06.2017
NL21.06.2017
PL21.06.2017
RO21.06.2017
RS21.06.2017
SE21.06.2017
SI21.06.2017
SK21.06.2017
SM21.06.2017
BG21.09.2017
NO21.09.2017
GR22.09.2017
IS21.10.2017
Former [2018/43]CZ21.06.2017
DK21.06.2017
EE21.06.2017
ES21.06.2017
FI21.06.2017
HR21.06.2017
IT21.06.2017
LT21.06.2017
LV21.06.2017
MT21.06.2017
NL21.06.2017
PL21.06.2017
RO21.06.2017
RS21.06.2017
SE21.06.2017
SI21.06.2017
SK21.06.2017
SM21.06.2017
BG21.09.2017
NO21.09.2017
GR22.09.2017
IS21.10.2017
Former [2018/39]CZ21.06.2017
DK21.06.2017
EE21.06.2017
ES21.06.2017
FI21.06.2017
HR21.06.2017
IT21.06.2017
LT21.06.2017
LV21.06.2017
NL21.06.2017
PL21.06.2017
RO21.06.2017
RS21.06.2017
SE21.06.2017
SI21.06.2017
SK21.06.2017
SM21.06.2017
BG21.09.2017
NO21.09.2017
GR22.09.2017
IS21.10.2017
Former [2018/21]CZ21.06.2017
DK21.06.2017
EE21.06.2017
ES21.06.2017
FI21.06.2017
HR21.06.2017
IT21.06.2017
LT21.06.2017
LV21.06.2017
NL21.06.2017
PL21.06.2017
RO21.06.2017
RS21.06.2017
SE21.06.2017
SK21.06.2017
SM21.06.2017
BG21.09.2017
NO21.09.2017
GR22.09.2017
IS21.10.2017
Former [2018/11]CZ21.06.2017
EE21.06.2017
ES21.06.2017
FI21.06.2017
HR21.06.2017
IT21.06.2017
LT21.06.2017
LV21.06.2017
NL21.06.2017
PL21.06.2017
RO21.06.2017
RS21.06.2017
SE21.06.2017
SK21.06.2017
SM21.06.2017
BG21.09.2017
NO21.09.2017
GR22.09.2017
IS21.10.2017
Former [2018/10]CZ21.06.2017
EE21.06.2017
FI21.06.2017
HR21.06.2017
LT21.06.2017
LV21.06.2017
NL21.06.2017
RO21.06.2017
RS21.06.2017
SE21.06.2017
SK21.06.2017
BG21.09.2017
NO21.09.2017
GR22.09.2017
Former [2018/09]EE21.06.2017
FI21.06.2017
HR21.06.2017
LT21.06.2017
LV21.06.2017
NL21.06.2017
RS21.06.2017
SE21.06.2017
BG21.09.2017
NO21.09.2017
GR22.09.2017
Former [2017/52]FI21.06.2017
HR21.06.2017
LT21.06.2017
LV21.06.2017
NL21.06.2017
RS21.06.2017
SE21.06.2017
BG21.09.2017
NO21.09.2017
GR22.09.2017
Former [2017/50]FI21.06.2017
HR21.06.2017
LT21.06.2017
LV21.06.2017
RS21.06.2017
SE21.06.2017
BG21.09.2017
NO21.09.2017
GR22.09.2017
Former [2017/49]FI21.06.2017
HR21.06.2017
LT21.06.2017
NO21.09.2017
GR22.09.2017
Cited inInternational search[A]US5596945  (VAN DER LELY CORNELIS [CH]) [A] 1-7,9,13-26 * column 5, line 63 - column 9, line 47; figures 5-12 *;
 [A]DE29522237U  (MAASLAND NV [NL]) [A] 1-6,8,9 * page 5, line 28 - page 13, line 32; figures 1-3 *;
 [A]WO9313651  (PROLION BV [NL]) [A] 1-3,13,14 * page 3, line 23 - page 9, line 3; figures 1-5 *