Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2844482

EP2844482 - METHOD FOR ALIGNING AT LEAST TWO CYLINDERS IN A PARALLEL MANNER RELATIVE TO EACH OTHER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.03.2017
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.11.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 18.12.2019 [2019/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Windmöller & Hölscher KG
Münsterstrasse 50
49525 Lengerich/Westf. / DE
[2015/11]
Inventor(s)01 / KOBUSCH, Udo
Stirper Straße 28
49163 Bohmte / DE
02 / EHRENBERG, Rainer
Ginsterweg 2A
49205 Hasbergen / DE
03 / HÖWELMEYER, Uwe
Keplerstraße 28
49477 Ibbenbüren / DE
04 / WESTHOF, Frank
Mettinger Straße 16
49509 Recke / DE
05 / KRÜMPELMANN, Martin
Eduard-Lagemann-Straße 22
49525 Lengerich / DE
06 / GUNSCHERA, Frank
Im Erlengrund 16
49078 Osnabrück / DE
 [2015/11]
Representative(s)(deleted)
...
[2016/20]
Former [2015/11]Vogel, Andreas , et al
Bals & Vogel Universitätsstrasse 142
44799 Bochum / DE
Application number, filing date13712530.822.03.2013
[2016/20]
WO2013EP56132
Priority number, dateDE20121010385302.05.2012         Original published format: DE102012103853
[2015/11]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013164132
Date:07.11.2013
Language:DE
[2013/45]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2844482
Date:11.03.2015
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.11.2013
[2015/11]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2844482
Date:18.05.2016
Language:DE
[2016/20]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP07.11.2013
ClassificationInternational:B41F31/30, B41F31/32, B41F13/30, B41F13/38, B41F30/00, B23P19/04, B23P19/10
[2015/43]
Former International [2015/11]B41F31/30, B41F31/32, B41F13/30, B41F13/38, B41F30/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/11]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN FÜR DIE PARALLELE AUSRICHTUNG VON WENIGSTENS ZWEI ZYLINDERN ZUEINANDER[2015/11]
English:METHOD FOR ALIGNING AT LEAST TWO CYLINDERS IN A PARALLEL MANNER RELATIVE TO EACH OTHER[2015/11]
French:PROCÉDÉ PERMETTANT D'ALIGNER AU MOINS DEUX CYLINDRES PARALLÈLEMENT L'UN À L'AUTRE[2015/11]
Entry into regional phase02.12.2014National basic fee paid 
02.12.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
02.12.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.01.2014Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
02.12.2014Examination requested  [2015/11]
19.10.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.11.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.03.2016Fee for grant paid
03.03.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
03.03.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  19.10.2015
Opposition(s)21.02.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
24.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU22.03.2013
AL18.05.2016
BG18.05.2016
CY18.05.2016
CZ18.05.2016
DK18.05.2016
EE18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
MC18.05.2016
MK18.05.2016
MT18.05.2016
NL18.05.2016
PL18.05.2016
RO18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
SE18.05.2016
SI18.05.2016
SK18.05.2016
SM18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
[2019/51]
Former [2019/47]HU22.03.2013
AL18.05.2016
BG18.05.2016
CY18.05.2016
CZ18.05.2016
DK18.05.2016
EE18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
MC18.05.2016
MT18.05.2016
NL18.05.2016
PL18.05.2016
RO18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
SE18.05.2016
SI18.05.2016
SK18.05.2016
SM18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
Former [2019/39]HU22.03.2013
AL18.05.2016
BG18.05.2016
CZ18.05.2016
DK18.05.2016
EE18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
MC18.05.2016
MT18.05.2016
NL18.05.2016
PL18.05.2016
RO18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
SE18.05.2016
SI18.05.2016
SK18.05.2016
SM18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
Former [2019/31]HU22.03.2013
AL18.05.2016
CZ18.05.2016
DK18.05.2016
EE18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
MC18.05.2016
MT18.05.2016
NL18.05.2016
PL18.05.2016
RO18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
SE18.05.2016
SI18.05.2016
SK18.05.2016
SM18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
Former [2018/46]AL18.05.2016
CZ18.05.2016
DK18.05.2016
EE18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
MC18.05.2016
MT18.05.2016
NL18.05.2016
PL18.05.2016
RO18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
SE18.05.2016
SI18.05.2016
SK18.05.2016
SM18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
Former [2018/43]CZ18.05.2016
DK18.05.2016
EE18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
MC18.05.2016
MT18.05.2016
NL18.05.2016
PL18.05.2016
RO18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
SE18.05.2016
SI18.05.2016
SK18.05.2016
SM18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
Former [2018/01]CZ18.05.2016
DK18.05.2016
EE18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
MC18.05.2016
NL18.05.2016
PL18.05.2016
RO18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
SE18.05.2016
SI18.05.2016
SK18.05.2016
SM18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
Former [2017/37]CZ18.05.2016
DK18.05.2016
EE18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
NL18.05.2016
PL18.05.2016
RO18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
SE18.05.2016
SI18.05.2016
SK18.05.2016
SM18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
Former [2017/11]CZ18.05.2016
DK18.05.2016
EE18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
NL18.05.2016
PL18.05.2016
RO18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
SE18.05.2016
SK18.05.2016
SM18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
Former [2017/10]CZ18.05.2016
DK18.05.2016
EE18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
NL18.05.2016
PL18.05.2016
RO18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
SE18.05.2016
SK18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
Former [2017/09]CZ18.05.2016
DK18.05.2016
EE18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
NL18.05.2016
RO18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
SE18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
Former [2017/07]DK18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
NL18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
SE18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
Former [2016/52]FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
NL18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
SE18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
Former [2016/51]FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
NL18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
Former [2016/50]FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
NL18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
Former [2016/49]FI18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
NL18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
Former [2016/46]LT18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
Cited inInternational search[XYI]WO2010142405  (WINDMOELLER & HOELSCHER [DE]; WESTHOF FRANK [DE]; HOEWELMEYER UWE [DE]) [X] 1,2,7,9,10 * abstract * * pages 1-7 * * figures 1-5 * [Y] 4,5,8 [I] 3,6,11-15;
 [Y]EP2085223  (COMEXI SA [ES] COMEXI GROUP IND S A [ES]) [Y] 4,5,8 * abstract * * paragraphs [0011] , [0014] , [0018] - [0021] - [0037] - [0039] - [0044] * * figures 1-4b *;
 [A]EP2100732  (BOBST BIELEFELD GMBH [DE]) [A] 3,11-15 * the whole document *