Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2844478

EP2844478 - DEVICE FOR SETTING AN OPERATING PARAMETER OF INK FOR A PRINTING PROCESS OF A ROTARY PRINTING PRESS AND METHOD THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.03.2017
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.11.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 18.12.2019 [2019/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Windmöller & Hölscher KG
Münsterstrasse 50
49525 Lengerich/Westf. / DE
[2015/11]
Inventor(s)01 / TELLJOHANN, Lutz
Aldruper Damm 108
49525 Lengerich / DE
02 / HASSELMANN, Frank
Brinkstraße 114b
49080 Osnabrück / DE
03 / IHME, Andreas
Mörikestraße 5
49525 Lengerich / DE
 [2015/11]
Representative(s)(deleted)
...
[N/P]
Former [2015/11]Vogel, Andreas , et al
Bals & Vogel Universitätsstrasse 142
44799 Bochum / DE
Application number, filing date13712531.622.03.2013
[2016/20]
WO2013EP56139
Priority number, dateDE20121010385002.05.2012         Original published format: DE102012103850
[2015/11]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013164133
Date:07.11.2013
Language:DE
[2013/45]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2844478
Date:11.03.2015
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.11.2013
[2015/11]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2844478
Date:18.05.2016
Language:DE
[2016/20]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP07.11.2013
ClassificationInternational:B41F31/00, B41F31/02, B41F31/06, B41F31/08
[2015/43]
Former International [2015/11]B41F31/00, B41F31/02, B41F31/08
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/11]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG ZUR EINSTELLUNG EINES BETRIEBSPARAMETERS EINER FARBE FÜR EINEN DRUCKPROZESS EINER ROTATIONSDRUCKMASCHINE SOWIE VERFAHREN HIERZU[2015/11]
English:DEVICE FOR SETTING AN OPERATING PARAMETER OF INK FOR A PRINTING PROCESS OF A ROTARY PRINTING PRESS AND METHOD THEREFOR[2015/11]
French:DISPOSITIF POUR RÉGLER UN PARAMÈTRE DE FONCTIONNEMENT D'UNE ENCRE POUR UN PROCESSUS D'IMPRESSION D'UNE PRESSE ROTATIVE AINSI QUE PROCÉDÉ À CET EFFET[2015/11]
Entry into regional phase02.12.2014National basic fee paid 
02.12.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
02.12.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.02.2014Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
02.12.2014Examination requested  [2015/11]
19.10.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.02.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.03.2016Fee for grant paid
17.03.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
17.03.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  19.10.2015
Opposition(s)21.02.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
31.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU22.03.2013
AL18.05.2016
BG18.05.2016
CY18.05.2016
CZ18.05.2016
DK18.05.2016
EE18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
MC18.05.2016
MK18.05.2016
MT18.05.2016
NL18.05.2016
PL18.05.2016
RO18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
SE18.05.2016
SI18.05.2016
SK18.05.2016
SM18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
[2019/51]
Former [2019/47]HU22.03.2013
AL18.05.2016
BG18.05.2016
CY18.05.2016
CZ18.05.2016
DK18.05.2016
EE18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
MC18.05.2016
MT18.05.2016
NL18.05.2016
PL18.05.2016
RO18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
SE18.05.2016
SI18.05.2016
SK18.05.2016
SM18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
Former [2019/39]HU22.03.2013
AL18.05.2016
BG18.05.2016
CZ18.05.2016
DK18.05.2016
EE18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
MC18.05.2016
MT18.05.2016
NL18.05.2016
PL18.05.2016
RO18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
SE18.05.2016
SI18.05.2016
SK18.05.2016
SM18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
Former [2019/31]HU22.03.2013
AL18.05.2016
CZ18.05.2016
DK18.05.2016
EE18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
MC18.05.2016
MT18.05.2016
NL18.05.2016
PL18.05.2016
RO18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
SE18.05.2016
SI18.05.2016
SK18.05.2016
SM18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
Former [2018/46]AL18.05.2016
CZ18.05.2016
DK18.05.2016
EE18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
MC18.05.2016
MT18.05.2016
NL18.05.2016
PL18.05.2016
RO18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
SE18.05.2016
SI18.05.2016
SK18.05.2016
SM18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
Former [2018/43]CZ18.05.2016
DK18.05.2016
EE18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
MC18.05.2016
MT18.05.2016
NL18.05.2016
PL18.05.2016
RO18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
SE18.05.2016
SI18.05.2016
SK18.05.2016
SM18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
Former [2018/01]CZ18.05.2016
DK18.05.2016
EE18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
MC18.05.2016
NL18.05.2016
PL18.05.2016
RO18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
SE18.05.2016
SI18.05.2016
SK18.05.2016
SM18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
Former [2017/37]CZ18.05.2016
DK18.05.2016
EE18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
NL18.05.2016
PL18.05.2016
RO18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
SE18.05.2016
SI18.05.2016
SK18.05.2016
SM18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
Former [2017/11]CZ18.05.2016
DK18.05.2016
EE18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
NL18.05.2016
PL18.05.2016
RO18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
SE18.05.2016
SK18.05.2016
SM18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
Former [2017/10]CZ18.05.2016
DK18.05.2016
EE18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
NL18.05.2016
PL18.05.2016
RO18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
SE18.05.2016
SK18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
Former [2017/09]CZ18.05.2016
DK18.05.2016
EE18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
NL18.05.2016
RO18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
SE18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
Former [2017/07]DK18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
NL18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
SE18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
Former [2016/52]FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
NL18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
SE18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
Former [2016/51]FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
NL18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
Former [2016/50]FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
NL18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
Former [2016/49]FI18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
NL18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
Former [2016/46]LT18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
Cited inInternational search[IY]EP1932669  (COMEXI SA [ES]) [I] 1,7-11,13-15,17-19 * paragraphs [0011] - [0012] - [0017] - [0018] - [0023] - [0026] - [0029] - [0035] - [0036] * * figures 1-4 * [Y] 2-6,12,16;
 [Y]GB1057749  (BRITISH VISQUEEN LTD) [Y] 2-6,12,16 * page 1, lines 13-74 * * page 2, lines 19-112 * * figure 2 *;
 [Y]GB2084079  (BALDWIN GEGENHEIMER CORP) [Y] 2-6,12,16 * page 1, lines 5-47 * * page 3, line 14 - page 6, line 2 * * figures 1-4 *;
 [A]WO9911459  (GOSS GRAPHIC SYST INC [US]) [A] 1-19 * abstract * * pages 1-8 * * figures 1-2 *
by applicantDE19548535