Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2844478 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2844478



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 403
24.03.2017 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
19.05.2016 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
26.04.2016 Notification of termination of representative's authorisation Search / examination 1
25.04.2016 Confirmation of revocation of automatic debit order Search / examination 1
21.04.2016 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
16.04.2016 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
16.04.2016 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
17.03.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
17.03.2016 English translation of the claims Search / examination 4
17.03.2016 French translation of claims Search / examination 5
17.03.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
17.03.2016 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
26.02.2016 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
26.02.2016 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
26.02.2016 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
26.02.2016 Text intended for grant Search / examination 21
26.02.2016 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 21
23.02.2016 Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations (from 01-04-2012) Search / examination 2
18.02.2016 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
18.02.2016 Consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
18.02.2016 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
15.02.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
15.02.2016 English translation of the claims Search / examination 4
15.02.2016 French translation of claims Search / examination 5
15.02.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
13.02.2016 Abstract Search / examination 1
13.02.2016 Abstract Search / examination 1
13.02.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
13.02.2016 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 15
13.02.2016 Claims Search / examination 4
13.02.2016 Description Search / examination 15
13.02.2016 Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 Search / examination 2
10.02.2016 Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations (from 01-04-2012) Search / examination 2
08.02.2016 Abstract Search / examination 1
08.02.2016 Abstract Search / examination 1
08.02.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
08.02.2016 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 15
08.02.2016 Claims Search / examination 4
08.02.2016 Description Search / examination 15
08.02.2016 Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 Search / examination 2
19.10.2015 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
19.10.2015 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
19.10.2015 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
19.10.2015 Text intended for grant Search / examination 21
15.09.2015 Examination started Search / examination 1
22.08.2015 Priority search results Search / examination 4
22.08.2015 Reply to invitation to file a copy of priority search results Search / examination 1
06.08.2015 Invitation to file a copy of search results(priority) Search / examination 1
11.02.2015 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
17.12.2014 Communication regarding comments on written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
15.12.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
15.12.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
15.12.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
12.11.2014 Annexes to the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 4
12.11.2014 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 11
30.10.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
30.10.2014 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
12.09.2014 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
19.05.2014 Free text PCT Chapter 2 procedure 16
19.05.2014 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
24.04.2014 Annex to International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 9
24.04.2014 International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
24.04.2014 International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
24.04.2014 International preliminary examination report - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
24.04.2014 International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
24.04.2014 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
24.04.2014 Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
08.04.2014 Notification of election of EPO Search / examination 1
10.03.2014 Document concerning fees and payments PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
10.03.2014 Letter regarding PCTII procedure PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
10.03.2014 Notification of receipt of demand PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
10.03.2014 PCT demand form PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
10.03.2014 PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims PCT Chapter 2 procedure 5
10.03.2014 PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims PCT Chapter 2 procedure 4
10.03.2014 Reply to International Search Opinion PCT Chapter 2 procedure 5
28.02.2014 Document concerning fees and payments PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
28.02.2014 PCT demand form PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
28.02.2014 PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims PCT Chapter 2 procedure 5
28.02.2014 PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims PCT Chapter 2 procedure 4
28.02.2014 Payment of fees and costs PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
28.02.2014 Reply to International Search Opinion PCT Chapter 2 procedure 5
06.12.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 25
07.11.2013 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
07.11.2013 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
07.11.2013 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 24
15.07.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
15.07.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
15.07.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 3
22.03.2013 (Electronic) Receipt PCT receiving Office 2
22.03.2013 Abstract PCT receiving Office 1
22.03.2013 Claims PCT receiving Office 5
22.03.2013 Description PCT receiving Office 15
22.03.2013 Drawings PCT receiving Office 2