Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2844478


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
15.11.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.12.2019  [2019/51]
18.10.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.11.2019  [2019/47]
23.08.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  25.09.2019  [2019/39]
28.06.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  31.07.2019  [2019/31]
12.10.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.11.2018  [2018/46]
21.09.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  24.10.2018  [2018/43]
01.12.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  03.01.2018  [2018/01]
11.08.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.09.2017  [2017/37]
24.03.2017 No opposition filed within time limit published on  26.04.2017  [2017/17]
24.02.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  29.03.2017  [2017/13]
17.02.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.03.2017  [2017/12]
10.02.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.03.2017  [2017/11]
03.02.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  08.03.2017  [2017/10]
27.01.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  01.03.2017  [2017/09]
13.01.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.02.2017  [2017/07]
25.11.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.12.2016  [2016/52]
18.11.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.12.2016  [2016/51]
11.11.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.12.2016  [2016/50]
04.11.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  07.12.2016  [2016/49]
14.10.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  16.11.2016  [2016/46]
04.05.2016 Deletion: Renewal fee paid
04.05.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
22.04.2016 Change - representative
15.04.2016 (Expected) grant published on  18.05.2016  [2016/20]
06.04.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
22.03.2016 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
22.03.2016 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
22.03.2016 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
18.10.2015 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
18.09.2015 Change - classification published on  21.10.2015  [2015/43]
18.09.2015 Change - classification published on  21.10.2015  [2015/43]
03.07.2015 Change - extension states published on  05.08.2015  [2015/32]
05.04.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
06.02.2015 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  11.03.2015  [2015/11]
06.02.2015 Request for examination filed published on  11.03.2015  [2015/11]
10.12.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
31.10.2014 Change - representative
31.10.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
02.04.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
21.11.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
08.11.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
08.04.2013 PCT data prior to European publication