Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2844478
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9731499Global Dossier 15.08.2017B2
US2015107471 23.04.2015A1
Priority number Date
DE102012103850 02.05.2012
WO2013EP56139 22.03.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2844478Global Dossier 18.05.2016B1
EP2844478 11.03.2015A1
Priority number Date
DE102012103850 02.05.2012
WO2013EP56139 22.03.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
ES2586563T 17.10.2016T3
Priority number Date
DE102012103850 02.05.2012
WO2013EP56139 22.03.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2013164133Global Dossier 07.11.2013A1
Priority number Date
DE102012103850 02.05.2012
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE102012103850 25.07.2013B3
Priority number Date
DE102012103850 02.05.2012