Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2828995

EP2828995 - CHANNEL STATE INFORMATION REFERENCE SIGNAL CONFIGURING AND REPORTING FOR A COORDINATED MULTI-POINT TRANSMISSION SCHEME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  28.09.2018
Database last updated on 16.11.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  20.10.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  24.08.2017
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  28.06.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  16.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip15.02.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BE, CH, LI
published on 20.03.2019  [2019/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Qualcomm Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121 / US
[2015/05]
Inventor(s)01 / GEIRHOFER, Stefan
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121 / US
02 / CHEN, Wanshi
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121 / US
03 / XU, Hao
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121 / US
04 / GAAL, Peter
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121 / US
 [2015/05]
Representative(s)Dunlop, Hugh Christopher , et al
Maucher Jenkins
26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
[2017/47]
Former [2015/05]Dunlop, Hugh Christopher , et al
RGC Jenkins & Co.
26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
Application number, filing date13712623.107.03.2013
[2017/47]
WO2013US29697
Priority number, dateUS201261612944P19.03.2012         Original published format: US 201261612944 P
US201261659923P14.06.2012         Original published format: US 201261659923 P
US20131378745406.03.2013         Original published format: US201313787454
[2015/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013142089
Date:26.09.2013
Language:EN
[2013/39]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2828995
Date:28.01.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.09.2013
[2015/05]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2828995
Date:22.11.2017
Language:EN
[2017/47]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP26.09.2013
ClassificationInternational:H04L1/00, H04W72/08, H04L5/00
[2015/05]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/05]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:KONFIGURATION UND MELDUNG VON KANALSTATUSINFORMATIONSREFERENZSIGNALEN FÜR EIN KOORDINIERTES MEHRPUNKTÜBERTRAGUNGSSCHEMA[2015/05]
English:CHANNEL STATE INFORMATION REFERENCE SIGNAL CONFIGURING AND REPORTING FOR A COORDINATED MULTI-POINT TRANSMISSION SCHEME[2015/05]
French:CONFIGURATION ET RAPPORT DE SIGNAL DE RÉFÉRENCE D'INFORMATIONS D'ÉTAT DE CANAL POUR UN SCHÉMA DE TRANSMISSION COORDONNÉE MULTIPOINT[2015/05]
Entry into regional phase01.08.2014National basic fee paid 
01.08.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
01.08.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.01.2014Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
01.08.2014Examination requested  [2015/05]
23.04.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
17.02.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.06.2017Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
22.06.2017Fee for grant paid
22.06.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
25.08.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.10.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  17.02.2017
Opposition(s)23.08.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/44]
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
08.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
07.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT22.11.2017
CY22.11.2017
CZ22.11.2017
DK22.11.2017
EE22.11.2017
ES22.11.2017
FI22.11.2017
HR22.11.2017
IT22.11.2017
LT22.11.2017
LV22.11.2017
MC22.11.2017
NL22.11.2017
PL22.11.2017
RO22.11.2017
RS22.11.2017
SE22.11.2017
SI22.11.2017
SK22.11.2017
SM22.11.2017
BG22.02.2018
NO22.02.2018
GR23.02.2018
IE07.03.2018
LU07.03.2018
BE31.03.2018
CH31.03.2018
LI31.03.2018
[2019/12]
Former [2019/09]AT22.11.2017
CY22.11.2017
CZ22.11.2017
DK22.11.2017
EE22.11.2017
ES22.11.2017
FI22.11.2017
HR22.11.2017
IT22.11.2017
LT22.11.2017
LV22.11.2017
MC22.11.2017
NL22.11.2017
PL22.11.2017
RO22.11.2017
RS22.11.2017
SE22.11.2017
SI22.11.2017
SK22.11.2017
SM22.11.2017
BG22.02.2018
NO22.02.2018
GR23.02.2018
IE07.03.2018
LU07.03.2018
Former [2019/04]AT22.11.2017
CY22.11.2017
CZ22.11.2017
DK22.11.2017
EE22.11.2017
ES22.11.2017
FI22.11.2017
HR22.11.2017
IT22.11.2017
LT22.11.2017
LV22.11.2017
MC22.11.2017
NL22.11.2017
PL22.11.2017
RO22.11.2017
RS22.11.2017
SE22.11.2017
SI22.11.2017
SK22.11.2017
SM22.11.2017
BG22.02.2018
NO22.02.2018
GR23.02.2018
LU07.03.2018
Former [2018/52]AT22.11.2017
CY22.11.2017
CZ22.11.2017
DK22.11.2017
EE22.11.2017
ES22.11.2017
FI22.11.2017
HR22.11.2017
IT22.11.2017
LT22.11.2017
LV22.11.2017
MC22.11.2017
NL22.11.2017
PL22.11.2017
RO22.11.2017
RS22.11.2017
SE22.11.2017
SI22.11.2017
SK22.11.2017
SM22.11.2017
BG22.02.2018
NO22.02.2018
GR23.02.2018
Former [2018/40]AT22.11.2017
CY22.11.2017
CZ22.11.2017
DK22.11.2017
EE22.11.2017
ES22.11.2017
FI22.11.2017
HR22.11.2017
IT22.11.2017
LT22.11.2017
LV22.11.2017
NL22.11.2017
PL22.11.2017
RO22.11.2017
RS22.11.2017
SE22.11.2017
SK22.11.2017
SM22.11.2017
BG22.02.2018
NO22.02.2018
GR23.02.2018
Former [2018/39]AT22.11.2017
CY22.11.2017
CZ22.11.2017
DK22.11.2017
EE22.11.2017
ES22.11.2017
FI22.11.2017
HR22.11.2017
IT22.11.2017
LT22.11.2017
LV22.11.2017
NL22.11.2017
PL22.11.2017
RS22.11.2017
SE22.11.2017
SK22.11.2017
SM22.11.2017
BG22.02.2018
NO22.02.2018
GR23.02.2018
Former [2018/37]AT22.11.2017
CY22.11.2017
CZ22.11.2017
DK22.11.2017
EE22.11.2017
ES22.11.2017
FI22.11.2017
HR22.11.2017
LT22.11.2017
LV22.11.2017
NL22.11.2017
PL22.11.2017
RS22.11.2017
SE22.11.2017
SK22.11.2017
SM22.11.2017
BG22.02.2018
NO22.02.2018
GR23.02.2018
Former [2018/35]AT22.11.2017
CY22.11.2017
CZ22.11.2017
DK22.11.2017
EE22.11.2017
ES22.11.2017
FI22.11.2017
HR22.11.2017
LT22.11.2017
LV22.11.2017
NL22.11.2017
RS22.11.2017
SE22.11.2017
SK22.11.2017
BG22.02.2018
NO22.02.2018
GR23.02.2018
Former [2018/24]AT22.11.2017
ES22.11.2017
FI22.11.2017
HR22.11.2017
LT22.11.2017
LV22.11.2017
NL22.11.2017
RS22.11.2017
SE22.11.2017
BG22.02.2018
NO22.02.2018
GR23.02.2018
Former [2018/22]ES22.11.2017
FI22.11.2017
LT22.11.2017
NL22.11.2017
NO22.02.2018
Cited inInternational search[A]WO2011100672  (RESEARCH IN MOTION LTD [CA], et al) [A] 1-7,14-20,27,30 * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0018] * * paragraphs [0046] - [0048] * * paragraphs [0057] , [0114] - [0120] *;
 [A]US2011170435  (KIM YOUN SUN [KR], et al) [A] 1-7,14-20,27,30 * paragraphs [0002] - [0010] * * paragraphs [0017] - [0022] * * paragraphs [0068] - [0072] * * paragraphs [0080] - [0083] *;
 [XI]WO2011115421  (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR], et al) [X] 8,9,21,22,28,29,31,32 * page 27, line 5 - page 29, line 11 * * page 30, line 7 - page 32, line 5 * * page 36, line 1 - page 39, line 12 * * page 42, line 7 - page 48, line 9 * * page 62, line 11 - page 63, line 13 * [I] 10-13,23-26;
 [A]  - HUAWEI ET AL, "Management of CoMP Measurement Set", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-120033, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20120131), vol. RAN WG1, no. Dresden, Germany; 20120206 - 20120210, XP050562620 [A] 1-7,14-20,27,30 * the whole document *
 [A]  - HUAWEI ET AL, "CSI-RS configuration and signalling", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-112902 CSI-RS CONFIGURATION AND SIGNALING, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20111004), vol. RAN WG1, no. Zhuhai; 20111010, XP050538114 [A] 8-13,21-26,28,29,31,32 * the whole document *