Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2828632

EP2828632 - DEVICE FOR OPTIMIZED PRESSURE SENSING FOR HEATING CHANNELS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.01.2017
Database last updated on 12.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Commissariat à l'Énergie Atomique et aux Énergies Alternatives
25, Rue Leblanc
Bâtiment "Le Ponant D"
75015 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2016/11]For all designated states
Commissariat à l'Énergie Atomique et aux Énergies Alternatives
25 Rue Leblanc
Bâtiment "Le Ponant D"
75015 Paris / FR
Former [2015/05]For all designated states
Commissariat à l'Énergie Atomique et aux Énergies Alternatives
25, rue Leblanc
Bâtiment "Le Ponant D"
75015 Paris / FR
Inventor(s)01 / GROS D'AILLON, Luc
785 chemin des Bourins
F-38320 Brie et Angonnes / FR
02 / GUEGUEN, Jil
6 rue de Bourgogne
F-38000 Grenoble / FR
03 / FRANCOIS, Fabrice
241 chemin de Molarot
F-38850 Chirens / FR
 [2015/05]
Representative(s)Brevalex
95, rue d'Amsterdam
75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR
[2015/05]
Application number, filing date13712734.618.03.2013
[2016/11]
WO2013EP55515
Priority number, dateFR2012005252221.03.2012         Original published format: FR 1252522
[2015/05]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013139722
Date:26.09.2013
Language:FR
[2013/39]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2828632
Date:28.01.2015
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.09.2013
[2015/05]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2828632
Date:16.03.2016
Language:FR
[2016/11]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP26.09.2013
ClassificationInternational:F15B19/00, G01L19/00, F16L41/00
[2015/34]
Former International [2015/05]G01L19/00, F16L41/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/05]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG ZUR OPTIMIERTEN DRUCKMESSUNG FÜR ERWÄRMUNGSKANÄLE[2015/05]
English:DEVICE FOR OPTIMIZED PRESSURE SENSING FOR HEATING CHANNELS[2015/05]
French:DISPOSITIF DE PRISE DE PRESSION OPTIMISEE POUR CANAUX CHAUFFANTS[2015/05]
Entry into regional phase30.09.2014National basic fee paid 
30.09.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
30.09.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.09.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
30.09.2014Examination requested  [2015/05]
07.09.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.01.2016Fee for grant paid
07.01.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
07.01.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  07.09.2015
Opposition(s)19.12.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2017/08]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU18.03.2013
AL16.03.2016
AT16.03.2016
CY16.03.2016
CZ16.03.2016
DK16.03.2016
EE16.03.2016
ES16.03.2016
FI16.03.2016
HR16.03.2016
IT16.03.2016
LT16.03.2016
LV16.03.2016
MC16.03.2016
MK16.03.2016
MT16.03.2016
NL16.03.2016
PL16.03.2016
RO16.03.2016
RS16.03.2016
SE16.03.2016
SI16.03.2016
SK16.03.2016
SM16.03.2016
TR16.03.2016
IE18.03.2016
LU18.03.2016
BE31.03.2016
CH31.03.2016
LI31.03.2016
BG16.06.2016
NO16.06.2016
GR17.06.2016
IS16.07.2016
PT18.07.2016
DE01.10.2016
[2018/46]
Former [2018/45]HU18.03.2013
AT16.03.2016
CY16.03.2016
CZ16.03.2016
DK16.03.2016
EE16.03.2016
ES16.03.2016
FI16.03.2016
HR16.03.2016
IT16.03.2016
LT16.03.2016
LV16.03.2016
MC16.03.2016
MK16.03.2016
MT16.03.2016
NL16.03.2016
PL16.03.2016
RO16.03.2016
RS16.03.2016
SE16.03.2016
SI16.03.2016
SK16.03.2016
SM16.03.2016
TR16.03.2016
IE18.03.2016
LU18.03.2016
BE31.03.2016
CH31.03.2016
LI31.03.2016
BG16.06.2016
NO16.06.2016
GR17.06.2016
IS16.07.2016
PT18.07.2016
DE01.10.2016
Former [2018/30]HU18.03.2013
AT16.03.2016
CY16.03.2016
CZ16.03.2016
DK16.03.2016
EE16.03.2016
ES16.03.2016
FI16.03.2016
HR16.03.2016
IT16.03.2016
LT16.03.2016
LV16.03.2016
MC16.03.2016
MK16.03.2016
MT16.03.2016
NL16.03.2016
PL16.03.2016
RO16.03.2016
RS16.03.2016
SE16.03.2016
SI16.03.2016
SK16.03.2016
SM16.03.2016
IE18.03.2016
LU18.03.2016
BE31.03.2016
CH31.03.2016
LI31.03.2016
BG16.06.2016
NO16.06.2016
GR17.06.2016
IS16.07.2016
PT18.07.2016
DE01.10.2016
Former [2017/47]AT16.03.2016
CZ16.03.2016
DK16.03.2016
EE16.03.2016
ES16.03.2016
FI16.03.2016
HR16.03.2016
IT16.03.2016
LT16.03.2016
LV16.03.2016
MT16.03.2016
NL16.03.2016
PL16.03.2016
RO16.03.2016
RS16.03.2016
SE16.03.2016
SI16.03.2016
SK16.03.2016
SM16.03.2016
IE18.03.2016
BE31.03.2016
CH31.03.2016
LI31.03.2016
BG16.06.2016
NO16.06.2016
GR17.06.2016
IS16.07.2016
PT18.07.2016
DE01.10.2016
Former [2017/37]AT16.03.2016
CZ16.03.2016
DK16.03.2016
EE16.03.2016
ES16.03.2016
FI16.03.2016
HR16.03.2016
IT16.03.2016
LT16.03.2016
LV16.03.2016
NL16.03.2016
PL16.03.2016
RO16.03.2016
RS16.03.2016
SE16.03.2016
SI16.03.2016
SK16.03.2016
SM16.03.2016
IE18.03.2016
BE31.03.2016
CH31.03.2016
LI31.03.2016
BG16.06.2016
NO16.06.2016
GR17.06.2016
IS16.07.2016
PT18.07.2016
DE01.10.2016
Former [2017/19]AT16.03.2016
CZ16.03.2016
DK16.03.2016
EE16.03.2016
ES16.03.2016
FI16.03.2016
HR16.03.2016
IT16.03.2016
LT16.03.2016
LV16.03.2016
NL16.03.2016
PL16.03.2016
RO16.03.2016
RS16.03.2016
SE16.03.2016
SK16.03.2016
SM16.03.2016
IE18.03.2016
BE31.03.2016
CH31.03.2016
LI31.03.2016
BG16.06.2016
NO16.06.2016
GR17.06.2016
IS16.07.2016
PT18.07.2016
DE01.10.2016
Former [2017/08]AT16.03.2016
CZ16.03.2016
DK16.03.2016
EE16.03.2016
ES16.03.2016
FI16.03.2016
HR16.03.2016
IT16.03.2016
LT16.03.2016
LV16.03.2016
NL16.03.2016
PL16.03.2016
RO16.03.2016
RS16.03.2016
SE16.03.2016
SK16.03.2016
SM16.03.2016
IE18.03.2016
BE31.03.2016
CH31.03.2016
LI31.03.2016
NO16.06.2016
GR17.06.2016
IS16.07.2016
PT18.07.2016
DE01.10.2016
Former [2017/07]AT16.03.2016
CZ16.03.2016
DK16.03.2016
EE16.03.2016
ES16.03.2016
FI16.03.2016
HR16.03.2016
IT16.03.2016
LT16.03.2016
LV16.03.2016
NL16.03.2016
PL16.03.2016
RO16.03.2016
RS16.03.2016
SE16.03.2016
SK16.03.2016
SM16.03.2016
IE18.03.2016
BE31.03.2016
CH31.03.2016
LI31.03.2016
NO16.06.2016
GR17.06.2016
IS16.07.2016
PT18.07.2016
Former [2017/03]AT16.03.2016
CZ16.03.2016
EE16.03.2016
ES16.03.2016
FI16.03.2016
HR16.03.2016
IT16.03.2016
LT16.03.2016
LV16.03.2016
NL16.03.2016
PL16.03.2016
RO16.03.2016
RS16.03.2016
SE16.03.2016
SK16.03.2016
SM16.03.2016
BE31.03.2016
NO16.06.2016
GR17.06.2016
IS16.07.2016
PT18.07.2016
Former [2016/51]AT16.03.2016
CZ16.03.2016
EE16.03.2016
ES16.03.2016
FI16.03.2016
HR16.03.2016
LT16.03.2016
LV16.03.2016
NL16.03.2016
PL16.03.2016
RO16.03.2016
RS16.03.2016
SE16.03.2016
SK16.03.2016
SM16.03.2016
BE31.03.2016
NO16.06.2016
GR17.06.2016
IS16.07.2016
PT18.07.2016
Former [2016/50]AT16.03.2016
CZ16.03.2016
EE16.03.2016
ES16.03.2016
FI16.03.2016
HR16.03.2016
LT16.03.2016
LV16.03.2016
NL16.03.2016
PL16.03.2016
RO16.03.2016
RS16.03.2016
SE16.03.2016
SK16.03.2016
SM16.03.2016
BE31.03.2016
NO16.06.2016
GR17.06.2016
IS16.07.2016
Former [2016/49]EE16.03.2016
FI16.03.2016
HR16.03.2016
LT16.03.2016
LV16.03.2016
NL16.03.2016
PL16.03.2016
RS16.03.2016
SE16.03.2016
BE31.03.2016
NO16.06.2016
GR17.06.2016
IS16.07.2016
Former [2016/48]FI16.03.2016
HR16.03.2016
LT16.03.2016
LV16.03.2016
NL16.03.2016
RS16.03.2016
SE16.03.2016
BE31.03.2016
NO16.06.2016
GR17.06.2016
IS16.07.2016
Former [2016/40]FI16.03.2016
HR16.03.2016
LT16.03.2016
LV16.03.2016
NL16.03.2016
RS16.03.2016
SE16.03.2016
BE31.03.2016
NO16.06.2016
GR17.06.2016
Former [2016/39]FI16.03.2016
HR16.03.2016
LT16.03.2016
LV16.03.2016
RS16.03.2016
SE16.03.2016
BE31.03.2016
NO16.06.2016
GR17.06.2016
Former [2016/36]FI16.03.2016
HR16.03.2016
LT16.03.2016
BE31.03.2016
NO16.06.2016
GR17.06.2016
Former [2016/35]FI16.03.2016
HR16.03.2016
NO16.06.2016
GR17.06.2016
Cited inInternational search[A]US5199297  (LIN ELLEN Y [US] ET AL) [A] 1-24 * the whole document *;
 [AD]WO8707374  (BOLENDER, KLAUS (DE)) [AD] 1-24 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2004237277  (GREGORY CHRISTOPHER IAN [GB]) [A] 1-24 * the whole document *;
 [A]FR2678350  (SETHA [FR]) [A] 1-24 * the whole document *
by applicantWO8707374