Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2828632 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2828632



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 169
18.03.2013 Drawings PCT receiving Office 4
18.03.2013 Document concerning representation PCT receiving Office 1
18.03.2013 Description PCT receiving Office 11
18.03.2013 Claims PCT receiving Office 4
18.03.2013 Abstract PCT receiving Office 1
18.03.2013 (Electronic) Receipt PCT receiving Office 2
07.05.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 3
07.05.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
07.05.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
26.09.2013 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 21
26.09.2013 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
26.09.2013 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
05.11.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 37
30.07.2014 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
30.09.2014 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
30.09.2014 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
30.09.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
08.10.2014 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 7
21.10.2014 Priority search results copy provided by EPO Search / examination 7
24.10.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
24.10.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
24.10.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
28.10.2014 Communication regarding comments on written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 3
08.01.2015 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
13.07.2015 Examination started Search / examination 1
07.09.2015 Text intended for grant Search / examination 18
07.09.2015 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
07.09.2015 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
07.09.2015 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
07.01.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
07.01.2016 German translation of the claims Search / examination 4
07.01.2016 English translation of the claims Search / examination 3
07.01.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
18.02.2016 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
16.03.2016 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
17.03.2016 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
20.01.2017 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1