Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2828632


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
12.10.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.11.2018  [2018/46]
05.10.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  07.11.2018  [2018/45]
20.07.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.08.2018  [2018/34]
06.07.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  08.08.2018  [2018/32]
22.06.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  25.07.2018  [2018/30]
20.10.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.11.2017  [2017/47]
11.08.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.09.2017  [2017/37]
07.04.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  10.05.2017  [2017/19]
20.01.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.02.2017  [2017/08]
20.01.2017 No opposition filed within time limit published on  22.02.2017  [2017/08]
13.01.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.02.2017  [2017/07]
16.12.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.01.2017  [2017/03]
25.11.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.12.2016  [2016/52]
18.11.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.12.2016  [2016/51]
11.11.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.12.2016  [2016/50]
04.11.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  07.12.2016  [2016/49]
28.10.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  30.11.2016  [2016/48]
02.09.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  05.10.2016  [2016/40]
26.08.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.09.2016  [2016/39]
12.08.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.09.2016  [2016/37]
05.08.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  07.09.2016  [2016/36]
29.07.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  31.08.2016  [2016/35]
12.02.2016 (Expected) grant published on  16.03.2016  [2016/11]
18.01.2016 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
08.01.2016 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
06.09.2015 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
17.07.2015 Change - classification published on  19.08.2015  [2015/34]
17.07.2015 Change - classification published on  19.08.2015  [2015/34]
22.05.2015 Change - extension states published on  24.06.2015  [2015/26]
27.02.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
26.12.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  28.01.2015  [2015/05]
26.12.2014 Request for examination filed published on  28.01.2015  [2015/05]
23.10.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
07.10.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
02.10.2014 Amendment by applicant
01.10.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
08.10.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
27.09.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
09.04.2013 PCT data prior to European publication