Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2828632
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9765802Global Dossier 19.09.2017B2
US2015107351 23.04.2015A1
Priority number Date
WO2013EP55515 18.03.2013
FR1252522 21.03.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR20150010715Global Dossier 28.01.2015A
Priority number Date
WO2013EP55515 18.03.2013
FR1252522 21.03.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP2015516567Global Dossier 11.06.2015A
Priority number Date
WO2013EP55515 18.03.2013
FR1252522 21.03.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2828632Global Dossier 16.03.2016B1
EP2828632 28.01.2015A1
Priority number Date
WO2013EP55515 18.03.2013
FR1252522 21.03.2012
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2013139722Global Dossier 26.09.2013A1
Priority number Date
FR1252522 21.03.2012
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
FR2988471 09.05.2014B1
FR2988471 27.09.2013A1
Priority number Date
FR1252522 21.03.2012